Bowles v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-01790
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 5:10 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard Lynn Bowles, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael McGlamry +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 mmcglamry@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal Kirkland Pope +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 kirkpope@pmkm.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corp., Defendant
No Logo Stryker Ireland Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stryker Ireland Limited"
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Richard Lynn Bowles (Civil No. 14-1790 (DWF/FLN), Doc. No. 7 ). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 05/19/2015. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN, 0:14-cv-01790-DWF-FLN(RLB) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Richard Lynn Bowles (McGlamry, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Lynn Bowles. Stryker Ireland Limited served on 8/1/2014, answer due 8/22/2014. (Nemo, Anthony) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
        TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN. Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. (MMP) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
          Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (MMP) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per MDL List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 14-cv-1790 (DWF/FLN). (MMP) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. McGlamry on behalf of Richard Lynn Bowles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing Attachment, # 2 Exhibit(s) Listing of Federal Courts)(McGlamry, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against all defendants. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4004158.) Filed by Richard Lynn Bowles. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons and Complaint) (McGlamry, Michael) Modified text on 6/4/2014 (MMP). (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 56 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?