Alvarez et al v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-09253
District Judge Paul G. Gardephe, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 11:36 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alicia Alvarez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Anthony Sanchez +1 646 657 5345 +1 646 390 3214 janthonysanchez@post.harvard.edu
No Logo Diana Bernal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Anthony Sanchez +1 646 657 5345 +1 646 390 3214 janthonysanchez@post.harvard.edu
No Logo L.B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Anthony Sanchez +1 646 657 5345 +1 646 390 3214 janthonysanchez@post.harvard.edu
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Dr. Juanita Guerra, Defendant
No Logo Gladys Carrion, Defendant
No Logo Maria De La Cruz, Defendant
No Logo The New York City Administration for Children's Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The New York City Family Court, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sanchez, Jay) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Carolyn Kruk dated January 23, 2015. Document filed by City of New York, The New York City Administration for Children's Services.(Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Application is Granted. The Clerk will terminate Dkt. No. 4. SO ORDERED. Gladys Carrion answer due 2/12/2015; City of New York answer due 2/12/2015; Maria De La Cruz answer due 2/12/2015; Juanita Guerra answer due 2/12/2015; The New York City Administration for Children's Services answer due 2/12/2015; The New York City Family Court answer due 2/12/2015. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/22/2014) (ama) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Carolyn E Kruk dated December 18, 2014. Document filed by City of New York.(Kruk, Carolyn) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Court for an initial pretrial conference in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Thursday, February 5, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/5/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/10/2014) (ama) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) (moh). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against Gladys Carrion, City of New York, Maria De La Cruz, Juanita Guerra, The New York City Administration for Children's Services, The New York City Family Court. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 110290)Document filed by L.B., Alicia Alvarez, Diana Bernal.(laq) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2014: # 1 Complaint Part 2, # 2 Complaint Part 3, # 3 Complaint Part 4, # 4 Complaint Part 5, # 5 Complaint Part 6) (moh). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 231 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?