Denoyer v. United States of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-00185

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 3:10 PM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dale Ernest DeNoyer, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale Ernest DeNoyer
v.
No Logo U.s. Marshals Service, Respondent
No Logo U.S. Parole Commission, Respondent
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Respondent
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Returned Mail
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Response
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Response
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Letter by Clerk Requesting Trust Account Statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Pro Se Docket assigned. (GJG) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                New Case LETTER with enclosed copy of the docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent by Clerk's Office to Dale Ernest DeNoyer. (JLS) [Transferred from South Dakota on 5/27/2015.] (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dale Ernest DeNoyer. (JLS) [Transferred from South Dakota on 5/27/2015.] (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241, filed by Dale Ernest DeNoyer. (Attachments: # 1 Misc Attachments, # 2 Institutional Account Inquiry, # 3 Thorston County Defendant's Arguments, # 4 Letter to Judge Schreier dated 4/30/15, # 5 Envelope Postmarked 5/5/15) (JLS). [Transferred from South Dakota on 5/27/2015.] (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?