James, et al v. Meow Media Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Western District Court, Case No. 5:99-cv-00096
District Judge Edward H. Johnstone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:22 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gwen Hadley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breen & Morgan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Breen +1 270 782 3030 +1 270 782 3855 mike@breenandmorgan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David A. Strauss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Strauss

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John B. Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Thompson +1 305 666 4366
No Logo Joe James, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breen & Morgan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Breen +1 270 782 3030 +1 270 782 3855 mike@breenandmorgan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David A. Strauss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Strauss

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John B. Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Thompson +1 305 666 4366
No Logo Judy James, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breen & Morgan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Breen +1 270 782 3030 +1 270 782 3855 mike@breenandmorgan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David A. Strauss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Strauss

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John B. Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Thompson +1 305 666 4366
No Logo Sabrina Collins Steger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breen & Morgan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Breen +1 270 782 3030 +1 270 782 3855 mike@breenandmorgan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David A. Strauss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Strauss

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John B. Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Thompson +1 305 666 4366
No Logo Thomas Wayne Steger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breen & Morgan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Breen +1 270 782 3030 +1 270 782 3855 mike@breenandmorgan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David A. Strauss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Strauss

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John B. Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Thompson +1 305 666 4366
v.
No Logo Acclaim Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Activision, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Apogee Software Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Atari, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Atari Corporation"
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Eidos Interactive, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/01/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
TERMINATED: 07/01/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
TERMINATED: 07/01/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/01/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo G.t. Interactive Software Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Id Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by coleloneypogue.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John David Cole, Jr. +1 270 282 2491 +1 270 282 7250 dcole@coleloneypogue.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD H.C. CLAY +1 502 581 8005 +1 502 581 8111 richard.clay@dinslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiersche, Hayward, Drakeley & Urbach, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Wade Cloud, Jr. +1 972 701 7000 +7018 701 701 8765
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T. Drakeley +1 972 701 7000 +7018 701 701 8765
No Logo Interplay Productions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Island Pictures, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ASSISTANT JEFFERSON COUNTY ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/12/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED I. G. Spencer, Jr. +1 502 574 6312 +1 502 574 4215 i.g.spencer@louisvilleky.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Conliffe Sandmann & Sullivan PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/12/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Bohnert +1 502 587 7711 +1 502 587 7756 kbohnert@cssattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SHEFFER LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald G. Sheffer +1 502 582 1600 +1 502 582 1193 rsheffer@kylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elizabeth McGarry +1 212 455 2574 +1 212 455 2502 mmcgarry@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Robert Ostrager +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 bostrager@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITLOW, ROBERTS, HOUSTON & STRAUB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Sigler +1 270 443 4516 +1 270 443 4571 jsigler@whitlow-law.com
No Logo Lasersoft, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meow Media, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryant Law Center, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark P. Bryant +1 270 442 1422 +1 270 443 8788 mark.bryant@bryantpsc.com
No Logo Midway Home Entertainment, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Denton & Keuler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Kelly +1 270 443 8253 +1 270 442 6000 dkelly@dklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HINKHOUSE WILLIAMS WALSH LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Thomas Williams +1 312 443 0371 +1 312 896 6591 jwilliams@hww-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lord Bisell & Brook LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerold O. Sweeney, Jr. +1 312 443 0700 +4430 443 443 0336
No Logo Network Authentication Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Evans, Osborne & Kreizman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel N. Kreizman

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson & King, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven C. Jackson +1 270 442 3551 +4446 444 444 6288
No Logo New Line Cinema, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Riddle +1 502 587 3623 +1 502 540 2194 mriddle@bgdlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenebaum Doll & McDonald

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED V. Thomas Fryman, Jr. +1 502 589 4200 +5873 587 587 3695

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Genster +1 202 434 5000 +4345 434 434 5029
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole K. Seligman +1 202 434 5000 +4345 434 434 5029
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Nintendo of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Palm Pictures, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Administrative Office of the United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/01/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda Gail Lowe +1 502 564 5576 +1 502 564 6131 kywd_ecf_deadletter@kywd.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by ASSISTANT JEFFERSON COUNTY ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/12/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED I. G. Spencer, Jr. +1 502 574 6312 +1 502 574 4215 i.g.spencer@louisvilleky.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Conliffe Sandmann & Sullivan PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/12/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Bohnert +1 502 587 7711 +1 502 587 7756 kbohnert@cssattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SHEFFER LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald G. Sheffer +1 502 582 1600 +1 502 582 1193 rsheffer@kylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elizabeth McGarry +1 212 455 2574 +1 212 455 2502 mmcgarry@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Robert Ostrager +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 bostrager@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITLOW, ROBERTS, HOUSTON & STRAUB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Sigler +1 270 443 4516 +1 270 443 4571 jsigler@whitlow-law.com
No Logo Polygram Film Entertainment Distribution, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by SHEFFER LAW FIRM LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald G. Sheffer +1 502 582 1600 +1 502 582 1193 rsheffer@kylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elizabeth McGarry +1 212 455 2574 +1 212 455 2502 mmcgarry@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Robert Ostrager +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 bostrager@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITLOW, ROBERTS, HOUSTON & STRAUB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Sigler +1 270 443 4516 +1 270 443 4571 jsigler@whitlow-law.com
Sega Of America, Inc. Sega Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Sony Computer Entertainment"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Square Soft, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
TERMINATED: 07/19/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
TERMINATED: 07/19/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stites & Harbison, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Connolly +1 502 587 3400 +1 502 687 6391 rconnolly@stites.com
Time Warner, Inc. Time Warner, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Riddle +1 502 587 3623 +1 502 540 2194 mriddle@bgdlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenebaum Doll & McDonald

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED V. Thomas Fryman, Jr. +1 502 589 4200 +5873 587 587 3695

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane E. Genster +1 202 434 5000 +4345 434 434 5029
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole K. Seligman +1 202 434 5000 +4345 434 434 5029
No Logo Virgin Interactive Media, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Belt
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Cavanagh
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRUCE J. ENNIS, JR.
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McMurry & Livingston, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Smith, Jr. +1 270 443 6511 +1 270 443 6548 sonny@ml-lawfirm.com
No Logo Virtus Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Williams Entertainment Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
MANDATE from USCA affirming the decision of the District Court [100-1] (CSD) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: None
    SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF RECORD by defendant ID Software Inc re pla's designation of record on appeal [101-1] (CSD) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
      SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF RECORD by defendant Time Warner Inc, defendant New Line Cinema re document appeal [101-1] to pla's designation of record (CSD) (Entered: 07/17/2000)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None
        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by plaintiff re [100-1]; transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes (CSD) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None
          DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re [100-1] (CSD) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Joe James, plaintiff Judy James, plaintiff Thomas Wayne Steger, plaintiff Sabrina Collins Steger, plaintiff Gwen Hadley to USCA, decision [85-1], [86-2], [99-1] (cc: all counsel) receipt # 007923 (filed in Bowling Green & rec'd in Paducah 6/29/00) (CSD) (Entered: 06/29/2000)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone denying motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] ; final & appealable order w/no just cause for delay. (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 6/16/00]{474} (CSD) (Entered: 06/16/2000)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
                RESPONSE by defendant Meow Media Inc to motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] ; order tendered (JCD) (Entered: 05/08/2000)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
                  JOINDER by defendant Network Authenticati in Midway Home Entertainment's opposition to motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] (JCD) (Entered: 05/08/2000)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: None
                    OPPOSITION of defendant New Line Cinema, defendant Time Warner Inc to motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] ; order tendered (filed LV) (JCD) (Entered: 05/08/2000)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re tendered order w/DN 94 ; response to notice of deficiency due 5/10/00 (cc: counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE by defendant ID Software Inc to motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] (filed in LV & rec'd in Paducah 5/04/00) (CSD) Modified on 05/04/2000 (Entered: 05/04/2000)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re tendered order w/DN 92 response to notice of deficiency due 5/9/00 (cc: counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 05/03/2000)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE by defendant Polygram Film Entert, defendant Palm Pictures, defendant Island Pictures to motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] (CSD) (Entered: 05/03/2000)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re tendered order w/DN 90 ; response to notice of deficiency due 5/8/00 (cc: counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 05/02/2000)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: None
                                RESPONSE by defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Capcom Entertainment, defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Interplay Prod Inc, defendant Virgin Interactive, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Sony Computer Entert to motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 05/02/2000)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re tendered order w/DN 88 ; response to notice of deficiency due 5/5/00 (cc: counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 04/28/2000)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE by defendant Midway Home Entertai to motion to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] [87-1] (CSD) (Entered: 04/28/2000)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
                                      MOTION by plaintiff Joe James, plaintiff Judy James, plaintiff Gwen Hadley, plaintiff Sabrina Collins Steger, plaintiff Thomas Wayne Steger to alter, amend or vacate order [85-1], order [86-2] ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 04/19/2000)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion to dismiss [53-1], granting motion to dismiss [52-1], granting motion to dismiss [50-1], granting motion to dismiss [49-1], granting motion to dismiss [48-1], granting motion to dismiss [47-1], granting motion to dismiss [10-1] dismissing case ; final & app order (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 4/6/00] {177} (KJI) Modified on 04/06/2000 (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone separate order entered this date dism case re [53-1], re [52-1], re [50-1], re [49-1], re [48-1], re [47-1], re [10-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 4/6/00] {176} (KJI) Modified on 04/06/2000 (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney David C. Belt to appear pro hac vice [80-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 12/29/99] (CSD) (Entered: 12/29/1999)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: None
                                              REPLY by defendant Time Warner Inc, defendant New Line Cinema to response to motion to dismiss [53-1] (filed in LV & rec'd in Paducah 12/27/99) (CSD) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                REPLY by defendant ID Software Inc to response to motion to dismiss [47-1] w/envelop marked Exhibit 1 (FILED IN LV & REC'D IN PADUCAH 12/27/99) (IN SEPARATE FOLDER) (CSD) (Entered: 12/27/1999)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY by defendant Polygram Film Entert, defendant Island Pictures, defendant Palm Pictures to response to motion to dismiss [49-1] (in separate folder) (CSD) (Entered: 12/23/1999)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Capcom Entertainment, defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Interplay Prod Inc, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Sony Computer Entert for attorney David C. Belt to appear pro hac vice (CSD) (Entered: 12/22/1999)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY by defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Interplay Prod Inc, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Virgin Interactive, defendant Capcom Entertainment, defendant Sony Computer Entert to response to motion to dismiss [52-1] (in separate folder) (CSD) (Entered: 12/22/1999)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/22/1999, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY by defendant Meow Media Inc to response to motion to dismiss [48-1] (CSD) (Entered: 12/22/1999)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY by defendant Network Authenticati to response to motion to dismiss [50-1] (CSD) (Entered: 12/21/1999)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for leave to file reply brief of 25 pages [74-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 12/17/99] (CSD) (Entered: 12/17/1999)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting amended motion for leave to file responsive brief in excess [71-1] (cc: counsel) [Entry Date: 12/17/99] (CSD) (Entered: 12/17/1999)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION by defendant ID Software Inc for leave to file reply brief of 25 pages ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (filed in LV 11/24/99 and received in Paducah 12/15/99) (CSD) (Entered: 12/15/1999)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY by defendant Midway Home Entertai to response to motion to dismiss [10-1] (KJI) (Entered: 12/09/1999)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of filing amended certificate of service for combined response by plaintiffs (filed in Bowling Green & rec'd in Paducah 11/18/99) (CSD) (Entered: 11/18/1999)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to file responsive brief in excess ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 11/18/1999)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion to extend time to file resp to mot to dism [61-1], granting motion to extend time to file resp to dfts' mot to dism until 11/15/99 [64-1] ; reply pldgs extended to 12/23/99 (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 11/17/99] (CSD) (Entered: 11/17/1999)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for leave to file resp brief in excess of 7.1(d) page restrictions [62-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 11/17/99] (CSD) (Entered: 11/17/1999)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE by plaintiffs to motion to dismiss [10-1], to motion to dismiss [47-1], to motion to dismiss [48-1], to motion dismiss [49-1], to motion to dismiss [50-1], to motion to dismiss [52-1], to motion to dismiss [53-1] ; order tendered (filed in Bowling Green & rec'd in Paducah 11/17/99) (CSD) (Entered: 11/17/1999)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE by defendant ID Software Inc to motion for leave to file resp brief in excess of 7.1(d) page restrictions [62-1] ; order tendered (filed in LV & rec'd in Paducah 11/10/99) (CSD) (Entered: 11/10/1999)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE by defendant ID Software Inc to motion to extend time to file resp to dfts' mot to dism until 11/15/99 [64-1], to motion to extend time to file resp to mot to dism [61-1] ; order tendered (filed in LV & rec'd in Paducah 11/10/99) (CSD) (Entered: 11/10/1999)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/4/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE by defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Capcom Entertainment, defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Interplay Prod Inc, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Sony Computer Entert to motion for leave to file resp brief in excess of 7.1(d) page restrictions [62-1] ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 11/05/1999)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                    FIRST AMENDED MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to file resp to dfts' mot to dism until 11/15/99 (filed in BG) (KJI) (Entered: 11/03/1999)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE by defendant Midway Home Entertai to motion for leave to file resp brief in excess of 7.1(d) page restrictions [62-1], to motion to extend time to file resp to mot to dism [61-1] ; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 11/02/1999)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file resp brief in excess of 7.1(d) page restrictions ; order tendered (filed in BG) (KJI) (Entered: 11/02/1999)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff to extend time to file resp to mot to dism ; order tendered (filed in BG) (KJI) (Entered: 11/02/1999)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Elizabeth A. Cavanagh to appear pro hac vice [51-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 10/12/99] (CSD) (Entered: 10/12/1999)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney David A. Strauss to appear pro hac vice [57-1] (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 10/12/99] (CSD) (Entered: 10/12/1999)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion to withdraw attorneys Kenneth A. Bohnert and I.G. Spencer, Jr. [55-1] attorney Kenneth A. Bohnert for Palm Pictures, attorney I. G. Spencer Jr. for Palm Pictures, attorney Kenneth A. Bohnert for Island Pictures, attorney I. G. Spencer Jr. for Island Pictures (cc: all counsel) [Entry Date: 10/12/99] (CSD) (Entered: 10/12/1999)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Joe James, plaintiff Judy James, plaintiff Thomas Wayne Steger, plaintiff Sabrina Collins Steger, plaintiff Gwen Hadley for attorney David A. Strauss to appear pro hac vice ; Affidavit in Support; order tendered FEE PAID RECEIPT #7354 (KJI) (Entered: 10/05/1999)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney James A. Sigler for Palm Pictures, attorney James A. Sigler for Island Pictures, attorney James A. Sigler for Polygram Film Entert and substituting attorney (KJI) (Entered: 09/14/1999)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Island Pictures, defendant Palm Pictures to withdraw attorneys Kenneth A. Bohnert and I.G. Spencer, Jr. ; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 09/10/1999)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING VIDEOTAPE EXHIBIT by defendant Time Warner Inc, defendant New Line Cinema w/ tape (filed in LV) (KJI) (Entered: 09/02/1999)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Time Warner Inc, defendant New Line Cinema to dismiss ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 09/02/1999)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Interplay Prod Inc, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Virgin Interactive, defendant Sony Computer Entert to dismiss ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 09/02/1999)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Capcom Entertainment, defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Interplay Prod Inc, defendant Virgin Interactive, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Sony Computer Entert for attorney Elizabeth A. Cavanagh to appear pro hac vice ; order tendered FEE PAID RECEIPT #007264 (KJI) (Entered: 09/02/1999)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant Network Authenticati to dismiss ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 09/02/1999)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Polygram Film Entert, defendant Island Pictures, defendant Palm Pictures to dismiss ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 09/02/1999)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Rule 12(b)(6)MOTION by defendant Meow Media Inc to dismiss ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 08/31/1999)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant ID Software Inc to dismiss ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered;attachments (filed in LV) (KJI) (Entered: 08/31/1999)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone ; scheduling conference held on 7/19/99 dfts shall file any Rule 12(b)(6) mots no later than 9/1/99; plas shall file a resp no later than 11/1/99, rply briefs shall be file no later than 11/23/99; the Ct will set oral argument, if necessary (cc: all counsel) (KJI) (Entered: 07/23/1999)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff as to party Atari Corporation (CSD) (Entered: 07/19/1999)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff as to party Square Soft Inc (CSD) (Entered: 07/19/1999)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Island Pictures, defendant Palm Pictures by I. G. Spencer Jr., Kenneth A. Bohnert (CSD) (Entered: 07/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone for clarification, all preliminary reports should be exchanged among opposing counsel. (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 07/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff as to party Eidos Interactive (filed in LV 7/1/99 & rec'd in Paducah 7/6/99) (CSD) (Entered: 07/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Kevin T. Baine, Nicole K. Seligman, and Jane E. Genster to appear pro hac vice [35-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 07/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Bruce J. Ennis, Jr., Deanne E. Maynard, and Paul M. Smith to appear pro hac vice [33-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 07/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion to withdraw attorney [30-1] attorney Charles S. Cassis for Palm Pictures (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 07/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Barry R. Ostrager to appear pro hac vice [28-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 07/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Mary Elizabeth McGarry to appear pro hac vice [27-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 07/01/1999)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Time Warner Inc, defendant New Line Cinema for attorney Kevin T. Baine, Nicole K. Seligman, and Jane E. Genster to appear pro hac vice ; order tendered (filed in LV) (KJI) Modified on 06/28/1999 (Entered: 06/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff Joe James, plaintiff Judy James, plaintiff Thomas Wayne Steger, plaintiff Sabrina Collins Steger, plaintiff Gwen Hadley, defendant Virtus Corporation as to party Virtus Corporation (KJI) (Entered: 06/25/1999)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Capcom Entertainment, defendant Interplay Prod Inc, defendant Virgin Interactive, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Sony Computer Entert, defendant Eidos Interactive, defendant Square Soft Inc for attorney Bruce J. Ennis, Jr., Deanne E. Maynard, and Paul M. Smith to appear pro hac vice ; order tendered PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID rec #7139 (KJI) (Entered: 06/25/1999)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Meow Media Inc by Mark P. Bryant (KJI) (Entered: 06/24/1999)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Time Warner Inc, defendant New Line Cinema by V. Thomas Fryman Jr., Mark S. Riddle (filed in LV) (KJI) (Entered: 06/23/1999)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Palm Pictures to withdraw attorney , and to substitute attorney ; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 06/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Polygram Film Entert, defendant Palm Pictures by Mary Elizabeth McGarry, Barry R. Ostrager (KJI) (Entered: 06/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Polygram Film Entert, defendant Palm Pictures for attorney Barry R. Ostrager to appear pro hac vice ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered fee paid 7129 (KJI) (Entered: 06/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Polygram Film Entert, defendant Palm Pictures for attorney Mary Elizabeth McGarry to appear pro hac vice ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered fee paid #7129 (KJI) (Entered: 06/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Square Soft Inc by Robert M. Connolly (KJI) (Entered: 06/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Virgin Interactive by Stephen E. Smith Jr. (KJI) (Entered: 06/17/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Joel N. Kreizman to appear pro hac vice [23-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 06/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Network Authenticati for attorney Joel N. Kreizman to appear pro hac vice ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 06/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney John B. Thompson to appear pro hac vice [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 06/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/4/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone finding the motion to extend time to respond to mtn/dism [20-1] moot., re [10-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 06/04/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff to extend time to respond to mtn/dism ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 05/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for sua sponte case management order [5-1] ; counsel for named defts shall enter app on or before 6/25/99; scheduling conf. set for 1:00 7/19/99 before Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone ; counsel shall submit brief preliminary report by 7/12/99 (see ord for spcfs re complex litigation) (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 05/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re PHV FEE w/DN 17 response to notice of deficiency due 6/3/99 (cc: cnsl for plas) (CSD) (Entered: 05/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff for attorney John B. Thompson to appear pro hac vice ; Affidavit in Support ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 05/26/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney James T. Drakeley & D. Wade Cloud, Jr. to appear pro hac vice [6-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 05/24/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Palm Pictures by Charles S. Cassis (filed in LV & rec'd in Paducah 5/21/99) (CSD) (Entered: 05/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Interplay Prod Inc by Stephen E. Smith Jr. (CSD) (Entered: 05/21/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Acclaim Entertainmen, defendant GT Interactive Softw, defendant Nintendo of America, defendant Sega of America Inc, defendant Activision Inc, defendant Capcom Entertainment, defendant Sony Computer Entert, defendant Eidos Interactive, defendant Square Soft Inc by Stephen E. Smith Jr. (CSD) (Entered: 05/19/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof of Service by overnight mail and facsimile (filed in BG) (KJI) (Entered: 05/18/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone; conf held 5/12/99;Mr. Breen & Mr. Cole shall subm to the ct an appropriate order directing that cnsl for the dfts shall file ntc of their appearance and suggest dates for a preliminary meeting of cnsl by close of business on Monday 5/17/99 (cc: all counsel) (KJI) (Entered: 05/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant Midway Home Entertai to dismiss ; Memorandum in Support; order tendered (KJI) (Entered: 05/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone granting motion for attorney Gerold O. Sweeney, Jr., John T. Williams to appear pro hac vice [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 04/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re PHV fee for James T. Drakeley (DN 6) ; response to notice of deficiency due 5/7/99 (cc: counsel) (CSD) (Entered: 04/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant ID Software Inc by James T. Drakely, D. Wade Cloud, Richard H.C. Clay, John David Cole (CSD) (Entered: 04/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant ID Software Inc for attorney James T. Drakeley to appear pro hac vice ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 04/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant ID Software Inc for sua sponte case management order ; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 04/30/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Midway Home Entertai for attorney Gerold O. Sweeney, Jr., John T. Williams to appear pro hac vice ; Affidavit in Support; order tendered (CSD) (Entered: 04/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Midway Home Entertai by David L. Kelly (CSD) (Entered: 04/27/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Thomas B. Russell Case reassigned to Senior Judge Edward H. Johnstone for all further proceedings (cc: all counsel) (KJI) (Entered: 04/15/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed. (KJI) (Entered: 04/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?