USA v. Wurl
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00306

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 2:15 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Administrative Office of the United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Probation Department +4085 408 408 5197 Intake_Docket_ILNP@ilnp.uscourts.gov
Space Pretrial Services +4355 435 435 5545 ilnptdb_Court_Action_Notice@ilnpt.uscourts.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kaarina Salovaara +1 312 353 5300 kaarina.salovaara@usdoj.gov
Space Jacqueline O. Stern +1 312 353 5300 jacqueline.stern@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph A. Stewart +1 312 469 6008 +1 312 886 3501 joseph.stewart@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Nick Wurl, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kent R. Carlson & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent R. Carlson +1 312 663 9601 +1 312 427 1788 kentrcarlson@sbcglobal.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Chicago
Filed 6/23/2015
County Cook
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 10s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
Count 3s-8s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
Count 9s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags BROWN,PROTO
  Entries (106) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None CJA Order Appointing Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None CJA Order Appointing Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Judgment (Sentencing Order)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None order on motion for forfeiture
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Forfeiture
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Revoke
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 12/1/2016 order on motion in limine
                                  ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Change of plea hearing held on 11/30/16. Defendant was informed of his rights. Defendant withdrew his plea of not guilty to count one of the superseding indictment and entered a plea of guilty as to count one. Judgment of guilty is entered as to count one in the superseding indictment. The cause is referred to the probation department for the preparation of a pre-sentence investigation report. Defendant's sentencing memorandum and objections to the report are to be filed by 3/6/17, and the government's response by 3/20/17. Sentencing is set for 4/5/17 at 2:00 p.m. In the event that the government is seeking an order of forfeiture in this matter, a motion for entry of a preliminary order of forfeiture should be filed by 2/20/17. Any objections or responses to the motion should be filed by 3/6/17. The Probation Office is directed to provide the parties with a copy of its sentencing recommendation. Defendant's motion in limine [68] is stricken. The government's motion regarding bond shall be due by 12/7/16; response due by 12/14/16. The government reports (and Defendant acknowledges and agrees) that the government will not dismiss the remaining counts in the superseding indictment at this time, but will make its determination known at time of sentencing. The government requested that time be excluded with respect to these remaining counts until after the sentencing hearing in the interests of justice in light of Defendant's plea and upcoming sentencing. Defendant has no objection to the request. The request is granted, and time is excluded from 11/30/16 through 12/14/16 in interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/30/2016.Mailed notice (yap, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 response
                                      RESPONSE by Nick Wurl to sur-reply[75] (Carlson, Kent)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Revoke
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 sur-reply
                                          SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff USA to reply[74] GOVERNMENT'S SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS REPLY REGARDING THE SOURCE OF VICTIMS FUNDS (Stern, Jacqueline)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: 11/16/2016 reply
                                            REPLY by Nick Wurl to response[73] by Government to Defendant's Motion in Limine (Carlson, Kent)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 response
                                                RESPONSE by USA to MOTION by Nick Wurl in limine [68] GOVERNMENT'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING THE SOURCE OF VICTIMS FUNDS (Stern, Jacqueline)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                  ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Defendant Nick Wurl has been indicted for executing a scheme to defraud individuals to invest in his business, Ludiera Capital, LLC in violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1343. On October 27, 2016, this Court denied his pro se motion to dismiss the indictment based upon theories of selective prosecution and prosecutorial misconduct. Wurl now moves the Court to reconsider [66]. For the reasons discussed below, the motion is denied. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/14/16. [For further details see order.]Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/9/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:As to Nick Wurl. The government's response to Defendant's motion in limine regarding source of victims funds lost and effect of alleged fraud and loss upon victims [68] shall be due by 11/14/16. No appearance is required on the motion. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: 11/8/2016 notice of motion
                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Kent R. Carlson for presentment of motion in limine[68] before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/16/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Carlson, Kent)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Modify
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016 notice of motion
                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Kent R. Carlson for presentment of motion in limine[68] before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/9/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Carlson, Kent)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: 11/4/2016, Terminated: 11/30/2016 Motion in Limine
                                                              MOTION by Nick Wurl in limine (Carlson, Kent)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 response
                                                                RESPONSE by USA to miscellaneous other[66] GOVERNMENT'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S PRO SE MOTION TO RECONSIDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE INDICTMENT (Stern, Jacqueline)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 miscellaneous other
                                                                  SUPPORTING Arguments and documents for defendant's pro se motion to reconsider filed by Nick Wurl (Attachments)(Poor Quality Original - Paper Document on file). (yap, ).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 order on motion in limine
                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: As to Nick Wurl. Pretrial conference hearing held on 10/28/16. The government's pretrial motion in limine requesting that the defendant be barred from providing testimony in support of a good faith defense [63] is granted. The governments pretrial motion in limine concerning Rule 404(b) and 608(b) evidence [63] is entered and continued. Mr. Wurl's pro se motion for reconsideration is due by 10/31/16; the government's response is due by 11/7/16. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Defendant Nick Wurl has been indicted for executing a scheme to defraud individuals to invest in his business, Ludiera Capital, LLC in violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1343. Although represented by counsel, Wurl filed a pro se motion to dismiss the indictment, arguing selective prosecution and prosecutorial misconduct on the part of the government [44]. For the reasons discussed below, the motion is denied. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/27/16. [For further details see order.]Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 Motion in Limine
                                                                        MOTION by USA in limine as to Nick Wurl Government's Pretrial Motion in Limine Concerning Rule 404(b) and 608(b) Evidence (Salovaara, Kaarina)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016, Terminated: 10/28/2016 Motion in Limine
                                                                          MOTION by USA in limine as to Nick Wurl Government's Pretrial Motion in Limine Requesting that the Defendant be Barred from Providing Testimony in Support of a Good Faith Defense (Salovaara, Kaarina)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:As to Nick Wurl. The status hearing set for 9/22/16 is stricken. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byKaarina Salovaara (Salovaara, Kaarina)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: 8/25/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Motion and arraignment hearing held on the superseding indictment. Defendant waives formal reading of the superseding indictment. Defendant entered a plea of not guilty as to the counts in the superseding incitement. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion for appointment of legal assistant [57] is denied without prejudice. Defense counsel should submit a proposed budget to chambers. Status hearing set for 9/22/16 at 9:30 a.m. In light of the filing of the superseding indictment, the governments motion to exclude time through the trial date of 12/5/16 is granted without objection in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/25/2016. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Kent R. Carlson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief[57] before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/25/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Carlson, Kent)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016, Terminated: 8/25/2016 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                    MOTION by Nick Wurl Appointment of Legal Assistant (Carlson, Kent)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/11/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                      CJA ORDER Appointing Counsel Kent R. Carlson for Nick Wurl Under the Criminal Justice Act. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/10/2016. (yap, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez as to Nick Wurl: Bond previously issued in 15 cr 306 to stand as bond in this instance. (yap, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 designation form
                                                                                          DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 3). (yap, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 indictment
                                                                                            SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Nick Wurl (1) count(s) 1s-2s, 3s-8s, 9s, 10s (yap, ).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: 7/20/2016 order on motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 7/20/16. Defendant's motion to withdraw as attorneys of record [49] granted. James Tunick and Sami Azhari are granted leave to withdraw their appearance. The Court will appoint an attorney to represent the Defendant. The trial date will stand. Status hearing set for 8/25/16 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by James D. Tunick for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney[49] before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/20/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Tunick, James)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016, Terminated: 7/20/2016 motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                  MOTION to withdraw as attorney as to Nick Wurl James Tunick (Tunick, James)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 order on motion to exclude
                                                                                                    ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Status hearing held on 6/15/16. A jury trial is scheduled for 12/5/16 at 9:00 a.m. The final pretrial conference is scheduled for 10/28/16 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are to submit a joint proposed final pretrial order to the Court's proposed order inbox by 9/30/16. The proposed final pretrial order should contain: (l) a brief joint statement of the case to be used during voir dire; (2) a list of witnesses who will be called and those who may be called; (3) any stipulations of uncontested facts; ( 4) a list of exhibits from each party and any objections thereto (a courtesy copy of the exhibits should be provided to the Court at least one week prior to the final pretrial conference); and (4) proposed jury instructions from each party and any objections thereto. Any and all motions in limine should be filed and served at the time that the final pretrial order is due by 9/30/16; any responses thereto should be filed fourteen calendar days thereafter by 10/14/16. Any motion filed must be accompanied by a statement that the party has conferred with the opposing party. Each motion in limine (as well as any response thereto) should be filed separately and not be combined in a single filing. Courtesy copies of motions and responses should be provided to chambers in hard copy format. The government's oral motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 6/15/16 through 12/5/16 in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3 161 (h)(7) (A)-(B) in light of the pending motion and for trial preparation. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/15/2016. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  motion to exclude
                                                                                                      ORAL MOTION by USA to exclude time as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: 5/27/2016 response to motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA as to Nick Wurl regarding MOTION by Nick Wurl to dismiss[44] Government's Response to Defendant's Pro Se Motion to Dismiss the Indictment (Stern, Jacqueline)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/16/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Nick Wurl by James D. Tunick (yap, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                            ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Status hearing held on 5/13/16. The government's response to Defendant's pro se motion to dismiss indictment for selective prosecution [44] is due by 5/27/16. Status hearing set for 6/15/16 at 9:30 a.m. The government's motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 5/13/16 through 6/15/16 in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7)(A)-(B) in light of the pending motion. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 5/13/2016. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: 5/9/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION by Nick Wurl to dismiss indictment for selective prosecution, egregious prosecutorial misconduct (Exhibits). (ym, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2016: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) (ym, ).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                              ORDER as to Nick Wurl: Status hearing held on 4/7/16. Defendant states that he wishes to file a motion with the Court without the assistance of his attorney. Defense counsel has discussed this with his client. Defendant was informed of his rights and the possible implications of such a motion. Plaintiff's pro se motion is due by 5/6/16. Status hearing is set for 5/13/16 at 9:30 a.m. The government's motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 4/7/16 through 5/13/16 in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7)(A)-(B) due to the complexity of the case and to allow the Defendant's new counsel time to review the voluminous discovery and for the defendant to consider and file his pro se motion. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/7/2016. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Nick Wurl by Sami Ziad Azhari (Azhari, Sami)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 order on motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 3/8/16. For the reasons stated on the record, Counsel Imani Chiphe's motion to withdraw as counsel is [39] is granted. Defendant Nick Wurl acknowledges that a change of counsel may result in a postponement of the trial date and nevertheless agrees with the motion. Federal Defender will arrange for new counsel. Status is set for 4/7/16 at 9:30 a.m. In order to provide new counsel adequate time to review this case, the trial date of 5/23/16, the pretrial conference date of 5/13/16, and all related dates are stricken. The government's motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 3/8/16 through 4/7/16 in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7)(A)-(B) due to the complexity of the case and to allow the Defendant's new counsel time to review the voluminous discovery and consult with Defendant. Mailed notice (lcw, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Imani Chiphe for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney[39] before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Chiphe, Imani)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016, Terminated: 3/8/2016 motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                      MOTION to withdraw as attorney as to Nick Wurl Imani Chiphe (Chiphe, Imani)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:As to Nick Wurl. At the request of counsel, the change of plea scheduled for 2/25/16 is stricken. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:As to Nick Wurl, Change of Plea Hearing set for 2/25/16 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Nick Wurl: Status hearing held on 1/21/16. The government reports that the parties wish to proceed to trial. A pretrial conference is scheduled for 5/13/16 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are to file a joint proposed final pretrial order by 4/22/16. The proposed final pretrial order should contain: (1) a brief statement of the case to be used during voir dire; (2) a list of witnesses who will be called and who may be called; (3) any stipulations and uncontested facts; (4) a list of exhibits and any objections thereto (a courtesy copy of the exhibits should be provided to the Court at least one week prior to the final pretrial conference); and (4) proposed jury instructions. An electronic copy of the proposed pretrial order should be provided to the Court in.doc format via email to the Court's proposed order email box. Any and all motions in limine should be filed and served at the time that the final pretrial order is due by 4/22/16; any responses thereto should be filed seven calendar days thereafter by 4/29/16. Any motion filed must be accompanied by a statement that the party has conferred with the opposing party. Each motion in limine (as well as any response thereto) should be filed separately and not be combined in a single filing. Courtesy copies of motions and responses should be provided to chambers in hard copy format. Defendant's oral motion for early return of trial subpoenas is granted. The government's oral motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 1/21/16 through 5/16/16 in the interests of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7)(A)-(B) for continuity of counsel and for trial preparation. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/21/2016. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                              ORAL MOTION by USA to exclude time as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                ORAL MOTION by Nick Wurl for early return of trial subpoenas (yap, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 order on motion to continue
                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Nick Wurl (1): Status and motion hearing held on 12/18/15. Defense counsel waived the appearance of the Defendant. The parties request another change of plea date. A change of plea hearing is set for 1/21/16 at 10:00 a.m. Defendant's unopposed motion to continue the trial date [34] is granted. The jury trial set for 2/22/16 is reset to 5/23/16 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will set deadlines at the next status hearing. The defendant should be present at the next status. The government's oral motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 12/18/15 through 1/21/16 in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3161 (h)(7)(A)-(B) to allow the Defendant's counsel time to review discovery and for plea discussions. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/18/2015. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                    ORAL MOTION by USA to exclude time as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015, Terminated: 12/18/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Nick Wurl to continue trial date (UNOPPOSED): Notice (Chiphe, Imani) Modified title by Clerk's office on 12/18/2015 (yap, ).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015
                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Nick Wurl: Status hearing held on 11/10/15. The defense counsel reports that the government has provided the discovery and a draft plea agreement and he needs time to review the discovery. The parties request a change of plea date and a trial date. A change of plea is scheduled for 12/18/15 at 10:00 a.m. A jury trial is set for 2/22/16 at 9:00 a.m. The proposed final pretrial order should contain: (1) a brief statement of the case to be used during voir dire; (2) a list of witnesses who will be called and who may be called; (3) any stipulations and uncontested facts; (4) a list of exhibits and any objections thereto (a courtesy copy of the exhibits should be provided to the Court at least one week prior to the final pretrial conference); and (4) proposed jury instructions. An electronic copy of the proposed pretrial order should be provided to the Court in.doc format via email to the Court's proposed order email box. Any and all motions in limine should be filed and served at the time that the final pretrial order is due; any responses thereto should be filed seven calendar days thereafter. Any motion filed must be accompanied by a statement that the party has conferred with the opposing party. Each motion in limine (as well as any response thereto) should be filed separately and not be combined in a single filing. Courtesy copies of motions and responses should be provided to chambers in hard copy format. Time is excluded from 11/10/15 through 2/22/16 in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A)-(B) for plea discussions and trial preparation. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/10/2015. Mailed notice. (ym, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 order on motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Nick Wurl: Status hearing held on 9/9/15. The government reports that it has provided discovery to the Defendant, and the parties request a change of plea date. A change of plea is scheduled for 11/10/15 at 11:00 a.m. The government's oral motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 9/9/15 through 11/10/15 in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3161 (h)(7)(A)-(B) for the complexity of the case, to allow the Defendant's counsel time to review discovery and for plea discussions. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/9/2015. Mailed notice (yap, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                            ORAL MOTION by USA to exclude time as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Status hearing held on 7/28/15. Defendant's appearance is waived for today's hearing. Defendant counsel reports that he received discovery from the government. Pretrial motions are due by 8/17/15 and should be noticed up for presentment. The government's oral motion for early return of trial subpoenas and the government's oral motion to modify the conditions to reflect that the defendant should not participate in any trading of financial instruments, including stocks and bonds, are granted without objection. Status hearing set for 9/9/15 at 9:30 a.m. The government's oral motion to exclude time is granted without objection. Time is excluded from 7/28/15 through 9/9/15 in the interest of justice pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3161(h)(7)(A)-(B) for possible plea discussions and to provide defendant with additional time to review the discovery. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/28/2015. Mailed notices (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                ORAL MOTION by USA to exclude time as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                  ORAL MOTION by USA to modify the conditions to reflect that defendant Nick Wurl should not participate in any trading of financial instruments, including stocks and bonds (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                    ORAL MOTION by USA for early return of trial subpoenas as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 order on motion to excludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Nick Wurl : Arraignment proceedings held. Defendant waives formal reading of the Indictment. Defendant enters plea of not guilty to all counts in the Indictment. Rule 16. l (A) conference to be held by 7/7/2015. Pretrial motions shall be filed by 7/14/2015. Responses to pretrial motions shall be filed by 7/21/2015. Status hearing before Judge Lee is set for 7/28/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Government moves to exclude time. Government and defendant agree that the time until the status hearing before District Judge Lee shall be excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 316l(h)(7) (A). The government's oral motion to exclude time until that status hearing is granted. The court finds, based on the agreement of the government and defendant and for the reasons stated on the record, that the ends of justice served by excluding time outweigh the best interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Bloate v. US., 559 U.S. 196 (2010); US. v. O'Connor, 656 F.3d 630, (7th Cir. 2011). Defendant's conditions of release are modified as follows: Defendant shall maintain or actively seek employment. Travel restrictions are modified to allow travel within the state of Illinois and St. Louis, Missouri. Defendant will participate in a program of mental health counseling and treatment if and as directed by Pretrial Services. Government's oral motion to dismiss the complaint without prejudice is granted. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/30/2015. (yap, ) .
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                        ORAL MOTION by USA to dismiss complaint without prejudice as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                          ORAL MOTION by USA to exclude time as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 notice of arraignment
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Arraignment as to Nick Wurl before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (ym, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez as to Nick Wurl: Bond set by Magistrate Judge to stand as bond as this instance. (ym, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 designation form
                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category 3). (ym, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Nick Wurl (1) count(s) 1. (ym, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                    Answer of Garnishee filed on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. by USA as to Nick Wurl (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                      Answer of Garnishee filed on behalf of Interactive Brokers, LLC by USA as to Nick Wurl (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                        Answer of Garnishee filed on behalf of Charles Schwab & Co, Inc. (d/b/a OptionsXpress) by USA as to Nick Wurl (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 reply
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Ari Glass, the managing member of the General Partner of garnishee, Boothbay Absolute Return Strategies, LP regarding defendant by Nick Wurl [19]. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 PRETRIAL Bail Report
                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL Bail Report as to Nick Wurl (SEALED) (jw, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Nick Wurl: This matter is before the Court on the ex parte application of the United States for a writ of prejudgment garnishment to be issued to Boothbay Absolute Return Strategies LP. The Court has reviewed the application, which is not opposed by the defendant or Boothbay and it is therefore ORDERED he Clerk's Office is directed to issue a prejudgment writ of garnishment to Boothbay Absolute Return Strategies LP. for $6.5 million dollars. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/1/2015. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED APPLICATION by USA for prejudgment writ of garnishment as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 warrant returned executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT returned executed as to Nick Wurl on 5/27/2015. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 miscellaneous other
                                                                                                                                                                                    Termination of Garnishment Proceedings Against Bank of America, N.A. by USA as to Nick Wurl (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 notice of attorney designation - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Designation for USA of Joseph A. Stewart (Stewart, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 financial affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                        FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Nick Wurl (SEALED) (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 order on motion for writ
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Nick Wurl: Motion hearing held on Government's Application and Declaration for Writs of Garnishment. For the reasons stated on the record, and with no objection from the defendant at this time, the application [10] is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to issue writs of garnishment to Charles Schwab & Co, Inc. (d/b/a OptionsXpress), Bank of America (f/k/a/ Merrill Lynch), JP Morgan Chase Bank, and Interactive Brokers for $6.5 million dollars. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/27/2015. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 memorandum in support
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of law by USA in support of their motion for writs of garnishment [10] (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 motion for writ
                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION by USA and Declaration for writs of garnishment as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                UNSECURED Bond as to Nick Wurl in the amount of $ 4,500.00. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nick Wurl in amount of $ 4,500.00, UNSECURED Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/27/2015. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Appointing Counsel Imani Chiphe as to defendant Nick Wurl. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/27/2015. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Nick Wurl by Imani Chiphe (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE Order governing discovery as to Nick Wurl Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/27/2015. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 order on motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for protective order [3] is granted as to Nick Wurl (1); as to Nick Wurl ; Initial Appearance held.; ORDER as to Nick Wurl: Initial appearance proceedings held. Defendant Nick Wurl appears in response to his arrest on5/27/2015. The court finds defendant unable to afford counsel. Imani Chiphe of the Federal Defender Program is appointed as counsel for defendant. Defendant informed of his rights and the charges against him. Defendant waives his right to preliminary examination. The Court enters a finding of probable cause and orders the defendant bound to the District Court for further proceedings. Government and defendant agree on certain conditions of release. Enter Order Setting Conditions of Release. Defendant shall be released after processing. Government is authorized to provide Charles Schwab & Co, Inc. (d/b/a OptionsXpress), Bank of America (f/k/a/ Merrill Lynch), JP Morgan Chase Bank, and Interactive Brokers with a copy of the Order Setting Conditions of Release. Government's Motion for Entry of Protective Order Governing Discovery is granted. Enter Protective Order Governing Discovery. Added attorney Imani Chiphe for Nick Wurl. terminated. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 5/27/2015. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA for entry of protective order governing discovery as to Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 warrant issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT issued to U.S. Marshal as to Nick Wurl via e-mail in PDF format. (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT signed by Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown as to defendantNick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST of defendant Nick Wurl (yap, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2,377 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?