Deming v. Daiichi Sankyo, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-00542
District Judge David S. Doty, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 6:20 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carol Deming, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J Becker +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 tbecker@johnsonbecker.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Johnson +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 mjohnson@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Snowdon +1 612 436 1902 +1 612 436 1801 psnowdon@johnsonbecker.com
No Logo Roger Deming, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J Becker +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 tbecker@johnsonbecker.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Johnson +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 mjohnson@johnsonbecker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter C Snowdon +1 612 436 1902 +1 612 436 1801 psnowdon@johnsonbecker.com
v.
No Logo Daiichi Medical Research Institute, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Daiichi Pharma Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Daiichi Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Daiichi Sankyo Pharma Development, Defendant
No Logo Daiichi Sankyo U.S. Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Forest Laboratories, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Forest Research Institute, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sankyo Pharma Development, Defendant
No Logo Sankyo Pharma Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1), transferring case to the District of New Jersey per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Robert B. Kugler. (JDF) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
    Summons Issued as to Forest Research Institute, Inc. (LPH) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
      Summons Issued as to Daiichi Medical Research Institute, Inc., Daiichi Pharma Holdings, Inc., Daiichi Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Daiichi Sankyo Pharma Development, Daiichi Sankyo U.S. Holdings, Inc., Daiichi Sankyo, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sankyo Pharma Development, Sankyo Pharma, Inc. (LPH) Modified text on 2/19/2015 (LPH). (Entered: 02/19/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S Doty per Master list referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel. Please use case number 15-cv-542 DSD/FLN. (LPH) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4308388.) Filed by Roger Lee Deming. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: DOCUMENTS FILED IN ERROR -# 1 Summons and Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Michael) Modified text on 2/19/2015 (LPH). (Entered: 02/18/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 124 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?