New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-03159

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 30, 2019 at 11:43 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Corey Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy E Halpern +1 609 896 3600 +1 609 896 1469 nhalpern@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFFREY M. POLLOCK +1 609 348 4515 +1 609 896 1469 jmpollock@foxrothschild.com
v.
No Logo City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Companion Animal Protection Society, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Terence Maher +1 646 675 8909 +1 212 279 3500 johntmaher@yahoo.com
No Logo Elizabeth S. Crowley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Linda B. Rosenthal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York State Department Of Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Seth J. Farber +1 212 416 8029 +1 212 416 6075 seth.farber@ag.ny.gov
No Logo New York City Council, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark W. Muschenheim +1 212 788 0303 +1 212 791 9714 mmuschen@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld +1 212 788 1035 +1 212 791 9714 sneufeld@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The Humane Society of the United States, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kane Kessler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. REID KAHN +1 201 487 2828 rkahn@kanekessler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M Sabin +1 212 541 6222 +1 212 245 3009 jsabin@kanekessler.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
USCA Statement of Costs as to 37 Notice of Appeal filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that costs are taxed in the amount of $604.32 in favor of the Appellees. Certified Copy Issued 3/28/17. USCA #15-4013. (McGee, Mary Ann)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
    MANDATE of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. It is Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 3/24/17. USCA #15-4013 (Attachments: # 1 USCA Opinion) (McGee, Mary Ann)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
      ORDER of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. Appellees move to dismiss this appeal as untimely filed. Upon due consideration, it is ORDERED that Appellees' motion is DENIED. Certified Copy Issued: 3/16/16. (McGee, Mary Ann)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
        USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 4653096120 re 37 Notice of Appeal filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. (McGee, Mary Ann)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF APPEAL from 35 Judgment and 36 Memo and Order by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. No fee paid. Service done electronically. (Halpern, Nancy) Modified on 12/14/2015 (McGee, Mary Ann).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: On October 30, 2015, I granted the defendants' motion to dismiss 14 in a docket entry that stated this opinion would follow. For the reasons stated herein, the defendants' motion to dismiss was granted and the plaintiff's application for preliminary injunction was denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 11/12/2015. (Fallon, Ethan)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
              CLERK'S JUDGMENT, Defendant's motion to dismiss is granted; and plaintiff's application for preliminary injunction is denied as moot.Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on 11/2/2015. (Piper, Francine)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: 10/28/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 9, 2015, before Judge John Gleeson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sherry Bryant, Telephone number 718-613-2636. Email address: sbryant102@verizon.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 11/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2016. (Bryant, Sherry)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  Letter of CAPS by John T. Maher, Esq. re: Maher Decl., Exhibit G, corrected ECF filing of Exhibit G spreadsheet in PDF format by file size by Companion Animal Protection Society (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of CAPS by John T. Maher re: Maher Decl. Exhibit G pdf attachment filing, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Maher, John)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                    First MOTION to Dismiss Amicus Curiae. Corrected Filing of Maher Decl. Exhibit G Attachments by Companion Animal Protection Society. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Maher, John)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      Letter to Honorable John Gleeson requesting leave to file corrected Reply In Further Support of Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Letter to Honorable John Gleeson) (Halpern, Nancy)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY in Support re 22 Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy E. Halpern, Esq. with attached Exhibit T, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Halpern, Nancy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 22 Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council. (Muschenheim, Mark)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            Letter (Joint) to Honorable John Gleeson by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. (Halpern, Nancy)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              Letter Permission to file Reply Memo; Permission to Participate in Oral Argument; cc of papers by Companion Animal Protection Society (Maher, John)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                REPLY in Support of Motion to Dismiss of City of New York filed by Companion Animal Protection Society. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Affidavit of Service) (Maher, John)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  REPLY in Support re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council. (Muschenheim, Mark)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss by City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council. (Muschenheim, Mark)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 Third Party MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, 13 First MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amicus Curiae filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Stolkey in Support of Plaintiff's Response to the Amicus Briefs of HSUS and CAPS, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Halpern, Nancy) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Declaration of Nancy E. Halpern in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction, # 4 Exhibit A-S to Declaration of Nancy E. Halpern in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction, # 5 Declaration of Donald Hoenig in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction, # 6 Declaration of Frances O. Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction, # 7 Declaration of Larry S. Katz in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction, # 8 Certificate of Service) (Halpern, Nancy)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy E. Halpern in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A-S to Declaration of Nancy E. Halpern in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Declaration of Donald Hoenig in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Declaration of Frances O. Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Declaration of Larry S. Katz in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss, # 6 Certificate of Service) (Halpern, Nancy) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            Letter to Honorable John Gleeson for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. (Halpern, Nancy)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Amicus Brief filed by The Humane Society of the United States. (Sabin, Jonathan)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by S. Reid Kahn on behalf of The Humane Society of the United States (aty to be noticed) (Kahn, S.)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/1/2015, Entered: 8/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Notice of Appearance by Companion Animal Protection Society (Maher, John)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/1/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Third Party MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by The Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) (Sabin, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Sabin on behalf of The Humane Society of the United States (aty to be noticed) (Sabin, Jonathan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G) (Muschenheim, Mark)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                            First MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amicus Curiae by Companion Animal Protection Society. (Attachments: # 1 Memo, # 2 Amicus Brief, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F) (Maher, John)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                              Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss by City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council. (Muschenheim, Mark)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (Verified Second) against City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council, filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy Halpern in support of Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Declaration of Cynthia Daluise in support of Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Declaration of Michael Stolkey in support of Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Declaration of Stuart Goldenberg in support of Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 5 Declaration of Donald Hoenig in support of Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 6 Declaration of Larry Katz in support of Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 7 Declaration of Francis Smith in support of Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 1-4 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 5-10 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 11 (Part 1) to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit 11 (Part 2) to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit 11 (Part 3) to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 13 Exhibit 12-14 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 14 Exhibit 15-31 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 32-56 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 16 Exhibit 57-61 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 17 Certificate of Service of Verified Second Amended Complaint) (Halpern, Nancy)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 7 ; 9 : Plaintiff Ordered to file its Second Amended Complaint by 7/10/15. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/6/2015. (Wiener, Benjamin)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Proposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re 4 Amended Complaint, and response to Docket No. 6 by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order and Stipulation to Amend Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1-4 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 5-10 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 11 (Part 1) to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 11 (Part 2) to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 11 (Part 3) to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 12-14 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 15-31 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 32-56 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 57-61 to Verified Second Amended Complaint, # 11 Certificate of Service) (Halpern, Nancy)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re 4 Amended Complaint, and response to Docket No. 6 by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Halpern, Nancy)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re 4 Amended Complaint, defendant Linda Rosenthal seeks pre-motion conference with respect to motion to dismiss by Linda B. Rosenthal. (Farber, Seth)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sheryl R. Neufeld on behalf of City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council (aty to be noticed) (Neufeld, Sheryl)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT with Declaration and Exhibits in support thereof against All Defendants, filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Declaration, # 11 Declaration, # 12 Declaration, # 13 Certificate of Service) (Pollock, Jeffrey)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Muschenheim on behalf of City of New York, Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council (aty to be noticed) (Muschenheim, Mark)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Unsigned Order to Show Cause by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    COMPLAINT (Exhibits are voluminous with case file) against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Declaration Daluise, # 5 Declaration Glass, # 6 Declaration Goldenberg, # 7 Declaration Hoenig, # 8 Declaration Jacoby, # 9 Declaration Katz, # 10 Declaration Miller, # 11 Declaration O'Leary, # 12 Declaration Smith, # 13 Declaration Stolkey, # 14 Declarations Pursuant to 28 USC 1746) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2015: # 15 Exhibits 1-3, # 16 Exhibits 4-11) (Bowens, Priscilla).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. 37 Notice of Appeal 38 Receipt of Payment for Notice of Appeal. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        APPEAL FILING FEE DUE re 37 Notice of Appeal Please either come to the clerks office or mail the filing fee in the amount of $505.00. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: For the reasons to be stated in the Court's forthcoming memorandum and order, the defendants' motion to dismiss is granted and the plaintiff's application for preliminary injunction is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 10/30/2015. (Fallon, Ethan)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: 32 First MOTION to Dismiss Amicus Curiae. Corrected Filing of Maher Decl. Exhibit G Attachments filed by Companion Animal Protection Society. THIS IS NOT A MOTION, THIS IS AN EXHIBIT. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. Plaintiffs represented by James Lemonedes, Esq. and Nancy E. Halpern, Esq.. Defendants represented by Mark W. Muschenheim, Esq., Serena Longley, Esq. and Jeffrey Campagna, Esq.. Oral Arguments held on 10/9/2015 re 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elizabeth S. Crowley, Corey Johnson, New York City Council, City of New York. The Court's decision is reserved and will be filed via ECF separately. The Court has also taken the 22 Notice of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by New York Pet Welfare Association, Inc. under submission. A decision will be filed via ECF separately. (Court Reporter Sherry Bryant.) (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ORDER: The parties' joint request 28 to argue plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 22 on 10/09/2015 is denied. An argument date will be scheduled, if necessary, on 10/09/2015. Plaintiff's request to submit its reply on 10/02/2015 is granted. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 9/24/2015. (Fallon, Ethan)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ORDER: Companion Animal Protection Society's application to file a Reply Memo 27 in further support of the Motion to Dismiss of the City of New York is granted, and its request to appear and argue the Motion is denied. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 9/22/2015. (Fallon, Ethan)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ORDER: Defendants' request 24 for leave to file a 20-page reply memorandum of law in further support of their motion to dismiss the second amended complaint is granted. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 9/16/2015. (Fallon, Ethan)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER: Plaintiff's request 20 for leave to file a 45-page memorandum of law in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss is granted. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 9/4/2015. (Levin, Sarah)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ORDER: Companion Animal Protection Society's motion for leave to file a brief amicus curiae 13 is granted. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 8/4/2015. (Levin, Sarah)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ORDER: The Humane Society of the United States' motion for leave to file a brief amicus curiae 16 is granted. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 8/4/2015. (Levin, Sarah)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 7/27/2015. (Levin, Sarah)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Incorrect Entry Information. ATTORNEY NANCY HALPERN Document #8 is not An Amended Complaint. Please only use Amended Complaint if you are filing An Amended Complaint. Mag. Pollak's chambers will contact counsel on how to file the appropriate document. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Incorrect Entry Information. Document #8 was removed from the Docket Sheet as per Mag. Pollak's chambers. Document was filed in error. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER: In light of plaintiff's letter 7 advising the court they seek to file an amended complaint that removes Linda Rosenthal as a defendant, the pre-motion conference is cancelled as moot. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend its complaint is respectfully referred to Judge Pollak. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 6/19/2015. (Levin, Sarah)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 6 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is granted. The conference will be held on Tuesday, June 23, 2015, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6C South. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 6/15/2015. (Levin, Sarah)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson on June 1, 2015 at 3:30 pm. Appearances by Jeffrey M. Pollock and Nancy Halpern on behalf of plaintiff; Mark Muschenheim and Serena Longley on behalf of the defendants. Hearing held regarding plaintiff's application for emergency injunctive relief. On behalf of the city defendants (City of New York, New York City Council, Corey Johnson and Elizabeth S. Crowley), there is an agreement to refrain from enforcing the challenged legislation until October 31, 2015. The Court has set the following briefing schedule: plaintiff shall file its amended complaint on or before June 9, 2015; defendants shall file their motion to dismiss/motion for summary judgment on or before July 31, 2015; plaintiff's opposition papers are due on or before September 9, 2015; defendants' reply papers are due on or before September 18, 2015. Oral argument is scheduled on October 9, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge John Gleeson. (Court reporter Marie Foley) (Ross, Peter)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653088811 (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson:Show Cause Hearing held June 1, 2015 at 12:30 pm: Plaintiffs were heard ex parte in connection with the application for emergency injunctive relief. Plaintiffs were directed to call NYC Corporation Counsel to appear in Courtroom 6C South today, June 1, 2015 at 3:30 pm, at which time the court will hear them on the issue of interim injunctive relief. (Court Reporter Marie Foley.) (Ross, Peter)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?