Coach, Inc. et al v. KC Clothing et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-00196
District Judge Greg Kays, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Greg Kays
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 11:04 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Davis +8 163 743 2241 +1 816 374 3300 tim.davis@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Kempf +1 314 259 2306 +1 314 552 8306 jason.kempf@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
Space S. Patrick Mckey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050
PRO HAC VICE Mariangela M. Seale +1 312 602 5117 merili.seale@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Davis +8 163 743 2241 +1 816 374 3300 tim.davis@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Kempf +1 314 259 2306 +1 314 552 8306 jason.kempf@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
Space S. Patrick Mckey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050
PRO HAC VICE Mariangela M. Seale +1 312 602 5117 merili.seale@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Amanat Khan, Defendant

Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anna D Simpson +1 816 983 8000 +1 816 983 8080 anna.simpson@huschblackwell.com
No Logo Does 1 through 100, Defendant
No Logo Fakure Habib, Defendant

Represented by Brown & Crouppen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Davis +1 816 756 1801 +1 314 421 0359 tomd@getbc.com

Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey J. Simon +1 816 329 4711 +1 816 983 8080 jeff.simon@huschblackwell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anna D Simpson +1 816 983 8000 +1 816 983 8080 anna.simpson@huschblackwell.com
No Logo KC Clothing, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Brown & Crouppen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas R. Davis +1 816 756 1801 +1 314 421 0359 tomd@getbc.com

Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey J. Simon +1 816 329 4711 +1 816 983 8080 jeff.simon@huschblackwell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anna D Simpson +1 816 983 8000 +1 816 983 8080 anna.simpson@huschblackwell.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Order of Dismissal. Signed on 3/1/12 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc., Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC, Amanat Khan. (Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of settlement by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC, Amanat Khan filed by Anna D Simpson on behalf of Defendants Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC, Amanat Khan.(Simpson, Anna) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint on behalf of Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC, Amanat Khan.(Simpson, Anna) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc.. Waiver sent to Fakure Habib on 10/31/2011, answer due 12/30/2011; KC Clothing, LLC on 10/31/2011, answer due 12/30/2011; Amanat Khan on 10/31/2011, answer due 12/30/2011. (Davis, Timothy) Modified on 11/15/2011 to delete "waiver sent to Does 1-100" and to delete answer due date (Melvin, Greg). (Entered: 11/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
Offer and Acceptance of Judgment by Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC. (Simpson, Anna) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Does 1 through 100, Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC filed by Timothy John Davis on behalf of Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc..(Davis, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 22 motion for leave to file. Plaintiffs shall electronically file their second amended complaint on or before November 3, 2011. Signed on 10/31/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and to Join Additional Party filed by Timothy John Davis on behalf of Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/17/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence)(Davis, Timothy) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of appearance by Anna D Simpson on behalf of Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC (Simpson, Anna) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Thomas R. Davis is withdrawn as counsel for defendants. Signed on 10/31/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Thomas R. Davis on behalf of Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/17/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of appearance by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC (Simon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/30/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2012 10:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by plaintiffs' counsel. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 8/8/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc., Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC. (Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Rule 16 Notice. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/4/2011. Rule 26 conference due by 7/21/2011. Signed on 6/20/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC. Fakure Habib waiver sent on 5/23/2011, answer due 7/22/2011; KC Clothing, LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2011, answer due 7/22/2011. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint on behalf of Fakure Habib, KC Clothing, LLC.(Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jason A. Kempf on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
ORDER granting 9 10 motions to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney Steven Patrick Mckey and Donald A. Cole for Coach Services, Inc., and Coach, Inc., allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Signed on April 19, 2011 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
Motion to allow Donald A. Cole to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number KCMO012153) filed by Timothy John Davis on behalf of Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Wheeler, LaTandra)***filed upon local attorney Timothy Davis's appearance. (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
Motion to allow Steven Patrick McKey to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number KCMO011990) filed by Timothy John Davis on behalf of Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Wheeler, LaTandra)***filed upon local attorney Timothy Davis's appearance. (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of appearance by Timothy John Davis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davis, Timothy) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
ORDER granting 5 motion to appear pro hac vice approved by Clerk of Court. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Signed on March 16, 2011 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc.. KC Clothing, LLC served on 3/3/2011, answer due 3/24/2011. (Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
Motion to allow Mariangela M. Seale to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2652800) filed by Jason A. Kempf on behalf of Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
Notice of EAP assignment to an outside mediator sent via electronic notice to plaintiff's counsel. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order)(Martin, Jan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
***Remark: Notification letter regarding Pro Hac Vice requirements sent via regular mail to plaintiff's counsel S. Patrick McKey and Mariangela M. Seale. (Martin, Jan) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2011, Entered: None
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jason A. Kempf on behalf of Plaintiffs COACH SERVICES, INC., COACH, INC..(Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/19/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jason A. Kempf on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-2629655. Service due by 6/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kempf, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 151 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?