Perales v. U. S. Internal Revenue Service et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-02621
District Judge Jane J Boyle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 3:47 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Azael Dythian Perales, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 501

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Azael Dythian Perales +1 714 507 9318
v.
No Logo A. Gragera, Defendant
No Logo Alberto R. Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo Alex Kozinski, Defendant
No Logo Alice M. Batchelder, Defendant
No Logo Alissandra Geliga, Defendant
No Logo Andre Birotte, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Andrew A. Connell, Defendant
No Logo Annie Wing, Defendant
No Logo Anthony M. Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Antonin Gregory Scalia, Defendant
No Logo Arlen Specter, Defendant
No Logo Arnold Schwarzenegger, Defendant
No Logo Art Brown, Defendant
No Logo Audrey B. Collins, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack H Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Barbara Boxer, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Pisaro, Defendant
No Logo Barney Frank, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben S. Bernanke"
No Logo Bill Canepa, Defendant
No Logo Bob Sasser, Defendant
No Logo Bradley DeBerg, Defendant
No Logo Brian Cornell, Defendant
No Logo Byron L. Dorgan, Defendant
No Logo Cathryn Lovely, Defendant
No Logo Charles B. Rangel, Defendant
No Logo Charles E. Schumer, Defendant
No Logo Chris Norby, Defendant
No Logo Christina Reiss, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Cox, Defendant
No Logo Christopher J. Dodd, Defendant
No Logo Chuck Grassley, Defendant
No Logo Clarence Maddox, Defendant
No Logo Clarence Thomas, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo Curt Pringle, Defendant
No Logo Curtis L. Collier, Defendant
No Logo Dale E. Kildee, Defendant
No Logo Dale M. Cundiff, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Inouye, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Daniel VanHorn, Defendant
No Logo David Drier, Defendant
No Logo David M. Singer, Defendant
No Logo David R. Obey, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Bowen, Defendant
No Logo Dianne Feinstein, Defendant
No Logo Dick Durban, Defendant
No Logo Doc Hastings, Defendant
No Logo Don Bankhead, Defendant
No Logo Don Chang, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Shulman, Defendant
No Logo Dr. William Frisk, Defendant
No Logo Duncan Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Ed Royce, Defendant
No Logo Edmund G. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Edolphus Towns, Defendant
No Logo Edward M. Kennedy , Defendant
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Elaine L. Chao"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
Unknown Role, News Corp
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc
No Logo Elena Kagan, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Dole, Defendant
No Logo Elvi de Quiroz, Defendant
No Logo Emily C. Hewitt, Defendant
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H Holder, Jr"
No Logo Fernando M. Olguin, Defendant
No Logo G De la Torre, Defendant
No Logo Gene Green, Defendant
No Logo George Miller, Defendant
No Logo George V. Voinovich, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo Gerald E. Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Greg L. Prickett, Defendant
No Logo Greg M. Conger, Defendant
No Logo Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo Hazel Cash, Defendant
No Logo Henry A. Waxman, Defendant
No Logo Henry Waxman, Defendant
No Logo Hilda L. Solis, Defendant
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary R. Clinton"
No Logo J. Dennis Hastert, Defendant
No Logo J. Douglas Steere, Defendant
No Logo James E Clyburn, Defendant
No Logo James F. Bellot, Defendant
No Logo James V. Selna, Defendant
No Logo Jan Horbaly, Defendant
No Logo Jane Harman, Defendant
No Logo Janet Napolitano, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jefferson B. Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo Jerry Lewis, Defendant
No Logo John A Perez, Defendant
No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant
No Logo John Boehner, Defendant
No Logo John Chiang, Defendant
No Logo John Conyers, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John D. Rockefeller, IV, Defendant
No Logo John E. Potter, Defendant
No Logo John Edwards, Defendant
No Logo John G. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo John M. Spratt, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John O'Colvin, Defendant
No Logo John P. Murtha, Defendant
No Logo JOHN S. PRATT, Defendant
No Logo John Warner, Defendant
No Logo Office of the Delaware Attorney General, Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph Biden, III"
No Logo Joseph I. Lieberman, Defendant
No Logo Karl Rove, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo Kizito Namulandan, Defendant
No Logo Leon Edward Panetta, Defendant
No Logo Leonard Green, Defendant
No Logo Linn Dyk, Defendant
No Logo Loretta Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Louise M. Slaughter, Defendant
No Logo Lyle W. Cayce, Defendant
No Logo Lynn C. Woosley, Defendant
No Logo Marian B. Horn, Defendant
No Logo Mark Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Matthew S. Petersen, Defendant
No Logo Maxine Waters, Defendant
No Logo Michael B. Enzi, Defendant
No Logo Michael Courlander, Defendant
No Logo Michael Sellers, Defendant
No Logo Michael Steele, Defendant
No Logo Micheal DeWine, Defendant
No Logo Micheal Seto, Defendant
No Logo Mike Duke, Defendant
No Logo Mimi Walters, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitch McConnell"
No Logo Nancy Mayer Whittington, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Pelosi"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
No Logo NFN Alexander, Defendant
No Logo NFN Lamar, Defendant
No Logo Norman Y. Mineta, Defendant
No Logo Olympia J. Snowe, Defendant
No Logo Orrin Hatch, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Leahy, Defendant
No Logo Patty Murray, Defendant
No Logo Paul H. Dobson, Defendant
No Logo Paul Micheal, Defendant
No Logo Paul, Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Pete V. Domenici, Defendant
No Logo Peter Hoekstra, Defendant
No Logo Peter Stark, Defendant
No Logo R. N. Armen, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Rahm Emanuel, Defendant
No Logo Ralph C. Conte, Defendant
No Logo Ralph C. Dawson, Defendant
No Logo Randall Radar, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B. Cheney"
No Logo Robert Brady, Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Byrd, Defendant
No Logo Robert Gates, Defendant
No Logo Robert R. Di Trolio, Defendant
No Logo Robert S. Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Meisburg, Defendant
No Logo Rose E. Chavez, Defendant
No Logo Roy Blunt, Defendant
No Logo Russ Hayden, Defendant
No Logo Russell G. Weiner, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Jones, Defendant
No Logo Samuel A. Alito, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Sandra Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Shawn Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Shelly E. Saltzman, Defendant
No Logo Sonia M. Sotomayer, Defendant
No Logo Spencer Bachus, Defendant
No Logo Steny Hoyner, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Bryer, Defendant
No Logo Steve Cooley, Defendant
No Logo Steve Scalise, Defendant
No Logo Steven J. McAuliffee, Defendant
No Logo Susan K. Lee, Defendant
No Logo Susan Stoker, Defendant
No Logo Thad Cochran, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Davis, Defendant
No Logo Tim Kaine, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Geithner, Defendant
No Logo Tom Daly, Defendant
No Logo Tom Daschle, Defendant
No Logo Tom Monson, Defendant
No Logo Tom Tait, Defendant
No Logo Tony Rackauckas, Defendant
No Logo Trent Lott, Defendant
United States Department of Labor United States Department of Labor, Defendant
Officially listed as "U. S. Department of Labor"
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "U. S. Internal Revenue Service"
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
No Logo Vernon Ehlers, Defendant
No Logo Yvonne T. Dixon, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT: The habeas corpus action is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/27/2011) (dnc) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ACCEPTING 4 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/27/2011) (tln) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The District Court should DISMISS the habeas corpus petition for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and WARN Petitioner that if he persists in filing frivolous civil actions, that the Court may impose monetary sanctions and/or bar him from bringing any further action of any kind in forma pauperis and/or without prior court approval. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/6/2011) (mfw) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (See Order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/6/2011) (mfw) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Azael Dythian Perales. (skt) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
            PETITION for Appeal, for Writ of Habeas Corpus & Maladministration Proceeding Under 28 USCA § 2241 Power to Grant Wit filed by Azael Dythian Perales. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s), # 2 Additional Page(s)) (skt) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 98 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?