Paul Chan v. American Psychiatric Association Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-01073
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 30, 2017 at 12:04 AM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Anna Chan, Plaintiff
No Logo Current Clinical Strategies Publishing Inc, Plaintiff
No Logo MD Paul Chan, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Chan +1 949 500 5375 cmhome@gmail.com
No Logo American Psychiatric Association Inc, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Franco +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 nancy.franco@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 rachel.matteo-boehm@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Rex Myers +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 roger.myers@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo American Psychiatric Association Inc, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Franco +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 nancy.franco@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 rachel.matteo-boehm@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Rex Myers +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 roger.myers@bryancave.com
No Logo Anna Chan, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Current Clinical Strategies Publishing Inc, Counter-Defendant
No Logo MD Paul Chan, Counter-Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Virginia A. Phillips related to: Stipulated Final Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction, 19 . The Enjoined Parties are hereby permanently enjoined and restrained from directly or indirectly doing any of the following. (See document for specifics.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iva) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER JOINING ANNA CHAN AND CURRENT CLINICAL STRATEGIES PUBLISHING, INC. AS PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTER-DEFENDANTS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips re: Stipulation for Joinder, 18 . (Anna Chan, Anna Chan, Current Clinical Strategies Publishing Inc and Current Clinical Strategies Publishing Inc added.) (iva) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Stipulated Final Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction re Counterclaim, Complaint - (Discovery), 1 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Final Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction)(Myers, Roger) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION for Joinder in Counterclaim, Complaint - (Discovery), 1 to Join Anna Chan and Current Clinical Strategies Publishing, Inc. as Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants filed by Defendant and Counter-claimant American Psychiatric Association Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Myers, Roger) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from October 5, 2015 to October 26, 2015 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant American Psychiatric Association Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Roger Myers ISO Continuing Scheduling Conference, # 2 Proposed Order Continuing Scheduling Conference)(Myers, Roger) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION to Defendant's Special MOTION to Strike Complaint under Anti-SLATT Statute Complaint - (Discovery), 1 9 filed by Plaintiff Paul Chan. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by counter-defendant Paul Chan.(mrgo) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant American Psychiatric Association Inc of book. (Myers, Roger) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), 1 filed by Defendant American Psychiatric Association Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H 1 of 4, # 9 Exhibit H 2 of 4, # 10 Exhibit H 3 of 4, # 11 Exhibit H 4 of 4, # 12 Exhibit I 1 of 2, # 13 Exhibit I 2 of 2)(Attorney Roger R Myers added to party American Psychiatric Association Inc(pty:dft))(Myers, Roger) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by defendant American Psychiatric Association Inc. upon American Psychiatric Association Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/8/2015, answer due 8/7/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Roger Myers. (Myers, Roger) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to defendant American Psychiatric Association Inc. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Paul Chan. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
COMPLAINT against defendant American Psychiatric Association Inc. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge David T Bristow.(Filing fee $ 400.00 paid) Jury Demand., filed by plaintiff Paul Chan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 6 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?