USA v. Townsend
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cr-00240-CCB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space John Francis Purcell, Jr +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 3124 Jack.Purcell@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Baltimore
Filed 5/12/2000
County Baltimore City
Terminated 10/5/2000
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 922G.F
Offense Level 4
18922(g) (1) (Possession of a Firearm by a Conviction Felon)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT Keith Townsend (1) count(s) 1. IMPRISONMENT for a total term of 77 months; Supervised Release for a term of 3 years; Assessment $100.00 ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/13/00 ) (c/m 10/13/00) (cc/USM-10/13/00) (MICROFILMED 10/13/00) (jb) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Exhibit
    Exhibit list by USA as to Keith Townsend (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Sentencing
      Sentencing Keith Townsend (1) count(s) 1 held before Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/5/00 (Court Reporter: Prince) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Arraignment
        Rearraignment as to Keith Townsend, Guilty: Keith Townsend (1) count(s) 1 held before Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/5/00. (Court Reporter: Prince) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER EXCLUDING the delay in the trial between 7/18/00 and the date upon which the parties receive the revised pre-sentence criminal history report from the U.S. Probation Office as to Keith Townsend ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 8/24/00) (c/m 8/24/00 bc) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000, Terminated: 10/13/2000 Motion for Speedy Trial
            MOTION by USA as to Keith Townsend to Exclude Time from Speedy Trial Computation (c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Sealed Document +
              SEALED DOCUMENT (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Sealed Document +
                SEALED DOCUMENT (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Jury Instructions
                  Requested Jury instructions (32) of Government as to Keith Townsend (c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Voir Dire Questions
                    Requested Voir Dire Questions (20) by USA as to Keith Townsend (c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 ~Notice (other)
                      SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE/Information of USA's Intention to Seek Enhanced Penalties (c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Transcript
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Held as to Keith Townsend for dates of July 18, 2000 (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE/Information of Intention by USA as to Keith Townsend to Seek Enhanced Penalties (c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER as to Keith Townsend, ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake ) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Exhibit
                              Motions Hearing Exhibit list by Keith Townsend (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Exhibit
                                Motion Hearing Exhibit list by USA as to Keith Townsend (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Oral Order
                                  ORAL ORDER mooting [11-1] motion to Suppress Statements as to Keith Townsend. ( Judge Catherine C. Blake ) (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Oral Order
                                    ORAL ORDER denying [10-1] motion to Suppress Tangible Evidence as to Keith Townsend. ( Judge Catherine C. Blake) (Reporter: Bankins) (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Motion Hearing
                                      Motion hearing held before (Blake, J.) as to Keith Townsend re: [10-1] motion to Suppress Tangible Evidence by Keith Townsend. (Court Reporter: Bankins) (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Response to Motion
                                        RESPONSE by USA as to Keith Townsend re [10-1] motion to Suppress Tangible Evidence, [11-1] motion to Suppress Statements (c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000, Terminated: 6/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER as to Keith Townsend granting [13-1] motion that U.S. Probation Office prepare a preliminary report regarding Defendant's criminal history as to Keith Townsend (1) ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 06/20/00) (c/m 6/21/00 by chambers) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000, Terminated: 6/21/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Letter MOTION by Keith Townsend that U.S. Probation Office prepare a preliminary report regarding Defendant's criminal history (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER as to Keith Townsend ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 06/19/00) (cm by chambers) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000, Terminated: 7/18/2000 Motion to Suppress
                                                MOTION by Keith Townsend to Suppress Statements Memorandum and Request for Hearing (2c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000, Terminated: 7/18/2000 Motion to Suppress
                                                  MOTION by Keith Townsend to Suppress Tangible Evidence Memorandum and Request for Hearing (2c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Warrant Returned Unexecuted
                                                    Bench WARRANT Returned Executed as to Keith Townsend on 5/17/00 (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER OF DETENTION as to Keith Townsend ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner 05/22/00) (c/h/d 5/22/00) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 Arraignment
                                                        Arraignment as to Keith Townsend, Not Guilty: Keith Townsend (1) count(s) 1 held before Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner (ER: Roberts) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER OF DETENTION as to Keith Townsend ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar ) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER as to Keith Townsend, for Medical Treatment ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 05/17/00) (c/h/d 5/17/00 jas) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER as to Keith Townsend, Appointing Federal Public Defender ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 05/17/00) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Keith Townsend (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 Initial Appearance
                                                                  Initial appearance as to Keith Townsend held before Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar (ER: Smith) (Defendant informed of rights.) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Warrant Issued
                                                                    BENCH WARRANT issued as to Keith Townsend (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER as to Keith Townsend, for issuance of Bench warrant ( Signed by Magistrate Judge James K. Bredar 5/11/00) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Indictment
                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Keith Townsend (1) count(s) 1 (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?