Booth v. Blue World Pools, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Western District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00454

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 1:04 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441nr
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Evidentiary Hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers granting 11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. cc: Counsel(CDR)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Response
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Leave to
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Case Assignment
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?