Espinosa v. Mess Maid Right NW LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-02261

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2019 at 11:36 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ana Espinosa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Daniel Espinosa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
v.
No Logo Craig M Baker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sandy N. Webb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy N. Webb +1 503 477 7731 +1 503 477 7433 swebb@swebblaw.com
No Logo Denise Vega, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sandy N. Webb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy N. Webb +1 503 477 7731 +1 503 477 7433 swebb@swebblaw.com
No Logo Mess Maid Right NW LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sandy N. Webb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy N. Webb +1 503 477 7731 +1 503 477 7433 swebb@swebblaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, it is Ordered that this action is Dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 1/2/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 01/02/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Joint Status Report . Filed by All Defendants. (Webb, Sandy) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: As the parties continue to explore settlement, another formal Joint Status Report will be due no later than 10/24/2014. (gm) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: As the parties continue to explore settlement, another formal Joint Status Report will be due no later than 10/10/2014. (gm) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held 7/28/14. Order: As the parties are exploring settlement, the current case schedule is Stayed. The parties shall file a formal Joint Status Report no later than 9/26/2014. Corrina Spencer-Scheurich present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sandy Webb present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sss) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Rule 16 Conference held 6/23/14. Order: As the parties are exploring settlement, a further Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 7/28/2014 at 1:30PM in Chambers. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. Corina Spencer-Scheurich present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sandy Webb present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Craig M Baker, Mess Maid Right NW LLC, Denise Vega. (Webb, Sandy) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Ana Espinosa, Daniel Espinosa. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 06/22/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Rule 16 Conference set for 6/23/2014 at 10:00AM in Portland chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. Order: Counsel are reminded to use the judges initials PK following the case number on all future pleadings. (gm) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Webb, Sandy) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Supplement Missing Cert of Service. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint 8 .) (Webb, Sandy) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Answer to 1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Craig M Baker, Mess Maid Right NW LLC, Denise Vega. (Webb, Sandy) (Entered: 06/01/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Affidavit of Service of Complaint, 1 upon Mess Maid Right NW LLC served on 3/3/2014 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Affidavit of Service of Complaint, 1 upon Craig M Baker served on 3/3/2014 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3524919. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Corinna Spencer-Scheurich Related Doc 4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically,. (nd) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Complaint, 1 . Filed by Ana Espinosa, Daniel Espinosa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Payment Made in Error, # 2 Exhibit B - Second Payment Made with Filing of Complaint) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sm) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/21/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/19/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 5/19/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (sm) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3524932 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ana Espinosa, Daniel Espinosa against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Mess Maid Right NW LLC, # 3 Proposed Summons Denise Vega, # 4 Proposed Summons Craig Baker). (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?