Serrano et al v. Marshal Sunshine, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01977
District Judge Ann L. Aiken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 4:32 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Esteban Ortiz-Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Jaime Cortez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Jose Serrano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
v.
No Logo Harpreet Singh Minhas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEITH BARTON & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Moule +1 541 687 1812 +1 541 485 0866 moulefrank@aol.com
No Logo Kewal Singh, Defendant
No Logo Manjit Singh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEITH BARTON & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Moule +1 541 687 1812 +1 541 485 0866 moulefrank@aol.com
No Logo Marshal Sunshine, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEITH BARTON & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Moule +1 541 687 1812 +1 541 485 0866 moulefrank@aol.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0216
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (rh) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 24 is DENIED. See formal OPINION AND ORDER. Signed on 3/10/2015 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 36 . Dispositive Motions are due by 4/9/2015. Discovery is to be completed by 4/9/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due by 5/11/2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
        Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Motion for Extension of Time of Dispositive Motion Deadline. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 36 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
          Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Dispositive Motions. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
            Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 24 . Filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc., Harpreet Singh Minhas, Manjit Singh. (Moule, David) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 33 . Reply is due by 2/6/2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None
                Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply. Filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc., Harpreet Singh Minhas, Manjit Singh. (Moule, David) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 30 . Dispositive Motions are due by 3/9/2015. Discovery is to be completed by 3/9/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due by 4/9/2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                    Unopposed Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 30 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                      Fourth Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                        Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 28 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Deposition of Harpreet Minhas) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                          Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 24 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 24 filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc., Harpreet Singh Minhas, Manjit Singh, Kewal Singh. Response is due by 1/6/2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion 25 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 24 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                  Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration) (Moule, David) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 22 . Dispositive Motions are due by 12/24/2014. Discovery is to be completed by 12/24/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due by 1/8/2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Moule, David) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 19 . Dispositive Motions are due by 11/24/2014. Discovery is to be completed by 11/24/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due by 1/9/2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 19 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                            Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                              Notice Withrawal of Motion to Withdraw Filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc. (Moule, David) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                **WITHDRAWN** per Notice 18 Motion to Withdraw as attorney. Filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc. (Moule, David) Modified on 9/24/2014 to withdraw. (kf) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Jaime Cortez, Esteban Ortiz-Garcia, Jose Serrano. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                    **STRICKEN**Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Jaime Cortez, Esteban Ortiz-Garcia, Jose Serrano. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) Modified on 8/29/2014 document filed in incorrect case, attorney noticed to refile. (kf) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc.. (Moule, David) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Answer to Complaint . Filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc.. (Moule, David) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Answer to 1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Marshal Sunshine, Inc.. (Moule, David) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 9 . Answer is due by 7/10/2014. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/10/2014. Discovery is to be completed by 10/10/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order is due by 11/10/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 9 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Second Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 3 . Time for service of summons to Defendant Kewal Singh is extended by 45 days. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 5 . Discovery is to be completed by 6/10/2014. Pretrial Order and Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report are due by 7/7/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 5 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time For Service of Kewal Singh. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 3 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Motion for Extension of Time of Time for Service of Summons of Kewal Singh. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Notice of Case Assignment to Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/10/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/7/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 4/7/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued) (kf) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3482369 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jose Serrano, Jaime Cortez, Esteban Ortiz-Garcia against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Marshall Sunshine, # 3 Proposed Summons Harpreet Minhas, # 4 Proposed Summons Manjit Singh, # 5 Proposed Summons Kewal Singh). (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?