Rondon v. Napolitano et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-21811-UU
District Judge Ursula Ungaro, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 10:54 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gianfranco Rondon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julisse Jimenez +1 305 371 8064 +1 305 371 4967 julissejimenez@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by gvazquez.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerardo Alvaro Vazquez +1 305 371 8064 +1 305 371 4967 la@gvazquez.com
v.
No Logo Doral News TV, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto +1 305 381 9188 +3819 381 381 9194 jorgediazcueto@bellsouth.net
No Logo Doral Newspaper LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto +1 305 381 9188 +3819 381 381 9194 jorgediazcueto@bellsouth.net
No Logo Gianfranco Napolitano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto +1 305 381 9188 +3819 381 381 9194 jorgediazcueto@bellsouth.net
No Logo Jonathan Leon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto +1 305 381 9188 +3819 381 381 9194 jorgediazcueto@bellsouth.net
No Logo Patricia Poleo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto +1 305 381 9188 +3819 381 381 9194 jorgediazcueto@bellsouth.net
Office Miami
Filed 5/13/2015
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Miami-Dade
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag AOR
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [18] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint due by 9/8/2015. Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 10/9/2015. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference Reset for 10/23/2015 before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/31/2015. (jua)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
        RESPONSE in Opposition re [37] Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 (Rule 11) filed by Gianfranco Rondon. Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Jimenez, Julisse)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Filing by Gianfranco Rondon re [29] Statement, [20] Initial Disclosure(s) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Disclosure, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit M, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit N) (Jimenez, Julisse) Modified text on 8/25/2015 (jua).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Sanctions
            Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 (Rule 11) by Doral News TV, Inc., Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo. (Diaz-Cueto, Jorge)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
              ORDER denying as moot [30] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Rule 26 Disclosure Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/6/2015. (eno)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 35 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2015 (4:00 P.M. - 4:15 P.M.) re [30] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Rule 26 Disclosure Documents filed by Gianfranco Rondon. APPEARANCES: FOR THE PLAINTIFFS - JULISSE JIMENEZ, ESQ. AND GERARDO VAZQUEZ, ESQ.; FOR THE DEFENDANTS - JORGE ORESTES DIAZ-CUETO, ESQ. (Digital 16:02:53.) (sl)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerardo Alvaro Vazquez on behalf of Gianfranco Rondon. Attorney Gerardo Alvaro Vazquez added to party Gianfranco Rondon(pty:pla). (Vazquez, Gerardo)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                    PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on [30] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Rule 26 Disclosure Documents for 8/6/2015 at 4:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Counsel for Plaintiff shall be responsible for placing a conference call to (305) 523-5740 at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/4/2015. (eno)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                      ORDER REFERRING [30] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Rule 26 Disclosure Documents filed by Gianfranco Rondon. Motion referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/4/2015. (jua)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 9/4/2015 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/4/2015. (jua)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015, Terminated: 8/6/2015 Compel
                          Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Rule 26 Disclosure Documents by Gianfranco Rondon. Responses due by 8/17/2015 (Jimenez, Julisse)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 Statement
                            Statement of: RICO Case by Gianfranco Rondon re [23] Order (Jimenez, Julisse)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 Notice of Unavailability
                              NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Doral News TV, Inc., Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo for dates of 07/23/2015-07/31/2015 (Diaz-Cueto, Jorge)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER Re-Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference for 8/14/2015 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/20/2015. (jua)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Initial Disclosures
                                  Initial Disclosure(s) by Doral News TV, Inc., Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo (Diaz-Cueto, Jorge)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re [24] Response/Reply (Other). Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jua)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Response/Reply (Other)
                                      REPLY TO [21] PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Doral News TV, Inc., Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo. (Diaz-Cueto, Jorge) Modified to add link on 7/17/2015 (jua).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER Requiring RICO Case Statement. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/15/2015. (jua)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: 7/10/2015 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                          JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Gianfranco Rondon (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Julisse) Modified text on 7/13/2015 (yar).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [18] Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss [12] Amended Complaint filed by Gianfranco Rondon. Replies due by 7/16/2015. (Jimenez, Julisse)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Initial Disclosures
                                              Initial Disclosure(s) by Gianfranco Rondon (Jimenez, Julisse) Modified text on 7/6/2015 (jua).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default
                                                ORDER by Clerk of Non-Entry of Default re [16] Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Doral News TV, Inc., Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/19/2015. (jua)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015, Terminated: 9/2/2015 Dismiss
                                                  Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss [12] Amended Complaint by Doral News TV, Inc., Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo. Attorney Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto added to party Doral News TV, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto added to party Doral Newspaper LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto added to party Jonathan Leon(pty:dft), Attorney Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto added to party Gianfranco Napolitano(pty:dft), Attorney Jorge Orestes Diaz-Cueto added to party Patricia Poleo(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/6/2015 (Diaz-Cueto, Jorge)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Notice of Compliance
                                                    NOTICE of Compliance by Gianfranco Rondon re [15] Order to Show Cause (Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015, Terminated: 6/19/2015 Clerks Entry of Default
                                                      MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to All Defendants by Gianfranco Rondon. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the Plaintiff Has Not Moved for a Clerk's Entry of Default. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2015. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/17/2015. (jua)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference. ( Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 7/10/2015, Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2015 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/9/2015. (jua)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of Filing by Gianfranco Rondon re [12] Amended Complaint (Jimenez, Julisse) Modified text on 6/1/2015 (jua).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Amended Complaint
                                                              First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gianfranco Rondon.(Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gianfranco Rondon. Doral Newspaper LLC served on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015 (Jimenez, Julisse) Modified text on 5/15/2015 (jua).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gianfranco Rondon. Doral News TV, Inc. served on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gianfranco Rondon. Patricia Poleo served on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gianfranco Rondon. Gianfranco Napolitano served on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gianfranco Rondon. Jonathan Leon served on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on [1] Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Gianfranco Rondon. Jonathan Leon served on 5/14/2015, answer due 6/4/2015. (Jimenez, Julisse) Modified to correct the party that was served on 5/15/2015 (jua).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case
                                                                            Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jua)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Summons Issued
                                                                              Summons Issued as to Doral News TV, Inc., Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo. (jua)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (jua)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro (jua)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Doral News TV Inc, Doral Newspaper LLC, Jonathan Leon, Gianfranco Napolitano, Patricia Poleo. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-7731024, filed by Gianfranco Rondon. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summon(s) Summon for Napolitano, # (3) Summon(s) Summons for Poleo, # (4) Summon(s) Summons for Leon, # (5) Summon(s) Summons for Doral Newspaper LLC, # (6) Summon(s) Summons for Doral News TV)(Jimenez, Julisse)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 481 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?