ADP, LLC v. YourPeople, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cv-02560-DMR
Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 10:03 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

ADP, LLC ADP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
A Delaware Limited Liability Company Robert Arthur Lewis +1 415 393 2328 +1 415 393 2286 robert.lewis@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
A Delaware Limited Liability Company Zachary Hill +1 415 393 2033 zachary.hill@morganlewis.com
A Delaware Limited Liability Company Frank Kennamer +1 415 393 2210 +1 415 393 2286 frank.kennamer@morganlewis.com
Space Kristen A. Palumbo +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 kristen.palumbo@morganlewis.com
v.
No Logo Conrad, Parker, Defendant
Officially listed as "Parker Conrad"

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
An Individual Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com
An Individual Jeremy Peterman +1 202 339 8473 jpeterman@orrick.com
An Individual Joshua Rosenkranz +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151 jrosenkranz@orrick.com
No Logo YourPeople, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
A Delaware Corporation

doing business asZenefits Insurance Services Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com
A Delaware Corporation

doing business asZenefits Insurance Services Jeremy Peterman +1 202 339 8473 jpeterman@orrick.com
A Delaware Corporation

doing business asZenefits Insurance Services Joshua Rosenkranz +1 212 506 5000 +1 212 506 5151 jrosenkranz@orrick.com
Office Oakland
Filed 6/9/2015
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
    AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 51 Motion Hearing ), by YourPeople, Inc.. Court will send to Carl Fleetwood at cfleetwood@orrick.com a link to the files requested in this order. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
          ** CANCELLED AT PARTY'S REQUEST. **AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 51 Motion Hearing ), by ADP, LLC. Court will send to Jennifer Behlmer at jennifer.behlmer@morganlewis.com a link to the files requested in this order. (Lewis, Robert) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/29/2015 (djc, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 10/27/2015. Case settled. Terms of settlement placed on the record. (Court Reporter: Joann Bryce) (3.30 hours)Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Annette Hurst. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 10/21/2015 and 10/23/2015. (Not reported)Plaintiff Attorney: Robert Lewis. Defendant Attorney: Annette L. Hurst. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2015) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Settlement Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that due to Hurricane Joaquin, the case settlement conference scheduled for October 5, 2015 is continued to October 27, 2015 at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The settlement conference order (Dkt. No. 56 ) issued on September 29, 2015 shall remain in effect. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Settlement Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a settlement conference is scheduled for October 5, 2015 at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The Court will issue a settlement conference order after the telephone conference that is scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on September 29, 2015. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                              CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2015. FTR Time 10:12 a.m. - 11:34 a.m. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2015) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Statement of Recent Decision
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE MOTION HEARING RE 17 MOTION to Strike Special ANTI-SLAPP Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Cod. Civ. Proc. 425.16, 15 MOTION to Dismiss (based on counsel availability) AND THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE MOTION HEARINGS RE 17 MOTION to Strike Special ANTI-SLAPP Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Cod. Civ. Proc. 425.16, 15 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Objection
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                            OBJECTIONS to re 36 Declaration in Support, 35 Declaration in Support, 34 Declaration in Support, Objections to ADP's Declarations re: Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike by Parker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 7/28/2015) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                Declaration of Robert L. Uriarte in Support of 38 Reply to Opposition/Response, Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike filed byParker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 7/28/2015) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY (re 17 MOTION to Strike Special ANTI-SLAPP Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Cod. Civ. Proc. 425.16 ) to Plaintiff's Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike filed byParker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 7/28/2015) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY (re 15 MOTION to Dismiss ) to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byParker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 7/28/2015) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            Declaration of DAVID KWON in Support of 33 Opposition/Response to Motion, Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Special Motion to Strike First Through Third Claims for Relief filed byADP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 33 ) (Lewis, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Declaration of SHANNON MCGINNESS in Support of 33 Opposition/Response to Motion, Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Special Motion to Strike First Through Third Claims for Relief filed byADP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 33 ) (Lewis, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Declaration of RICHARD ANDERSON in Support of 33 Opposition/Response to Motion, Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Special Motion to Strike First Through Third Claims for Relief filed byADP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 33 ) (Lewis, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 17 MOTION to Strike Special ANTI-SLAPP Motion to Strike Pursuant to Cal. Cod. Civ. Proc. 425.16 ) Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Special Motion to Strike First Through Third Claims for Relief filed byADP, LLC. (Lewis, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 15 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed byADP, LLC. (Lewis, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re 15 MOTION to Dismiss And Anti-SLAPP Motion filed byParker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss filed by Parker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/20/2015. Replies due by 7/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9656453.) filed by Parker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. (Rosenkranz, E. Joshua) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9656449.) filed by Parker Conrad, YourPeople, Inc.. (Peterman, Jeremy) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 01:30 PM. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by ADP, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Automatic Data Processing, Inc., Other Affiliate ADP Atlantic, LLC for ADP, LLC. (Palumbo, Kristen) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Palumbo, Kristen) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9584643.). Filed byADP, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Palumbo, Kristen) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 798 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?