United States of America v. August Bohanec et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-04347

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 8:16 PM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Pribe +1 213 894 6551 +1 213 894 0115 andrew.t.pribe@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo August Bohanec, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hochman Salkin Rettig Toscher & Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S Horwitz +1 310 281 3200 +1 310 859 1430 horwitz@taxlitigator.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hochman Salkin Rettig Toscher&perez P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Morris Robbins, Jr. +1 310 281 3247 +1 310 859 1430 Robbins@Taxlitigator.com
No Logo Maria Bohanec, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hochman Salkin Rettig Toscher&perez P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S Horwitz +1 310 281 3200 +1 310 859 1430 horwitz@taxlitigator.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Morris Robbins, Jr. +1 310 281 3247 +1 310 859 1430 Robbins@Taxlitigator.com
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/01/2016; 9:12 A.M. re Transcript 36 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Bustillos, Maria) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/02/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/01/2016; 9:12 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: MARIA BUSTILLOS, phone number MADAMCOURTREPORTER@GMAIL.COM FOR ALL TRANSCRIPT REQUESTS. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through MARIA BUSTILLOS. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2017. (Bustillos, Maria) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Bench Trial - (ONE Day)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MINUTES OF Court Trial (1st Day) held and completed before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Opening statements waived. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff rests. Defendants Rest. Findings, Conclusions of Law and Judgment to be prepared by defendant. Case Submitted. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (lc) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR:By Judge Dean D. Pregerson; The Minutes of Court Trial filed November 1, 2016 (docket no. 260) was inadvertently filed under the wrong case number and does not pertain to this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jessica Crenshaw at jc@taxlitigator.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Robbins, Edward) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Pretrial Conference Order - Final 25 (Attachments: # 1 United States of America's Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed 11/07/2016 re Pretrial Conference Order - Final 25 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law)(Robbins, Edward) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          TRIAL EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST FILED. (lc) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Pregerson will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9C on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 27 , pdf is a proposed findings of fact etc. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Proposed findings of fact etc was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Conference Order - Final
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. See order for details. (jy) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Court conducts the Final Pretrial Conference. The bench trial remains scheduled Tuesday, November 1, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jy) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Final Pretrial Conference Order)(Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant August Bohanec. (Robbins, Edward) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Witness List filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        STIPULATION for Order Granting Request for Relief from Mandatory Mediation filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Court and counsel confer re case status. Court sets trial dates. (Refer to the SCHEDULING ORDER to be issued hereafter.)Court Reporter: none. (lc) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert S Horwitz counsel for Defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec. Adding Robert S. Horwitz as counsel of record for August Bohanec and Maria Bohanec for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants August Bohanec and Maria Bohanec. (Attorney Robert S Horwitz added to party August Bohanec(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Horwitz added to party Maria Bohanec(pty:dft))(Horwitz, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec.(Attorney Edward M Robbins, Jr added to party August Bohanec(pty:dft), Attorney Edward M Robbins, Jr added to party Maria Bohanec(pty:dft))(Robbins, Edward) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER AND COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants August Bohanec, Maria Bohanec. (jp) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jp) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Andrew Pribe added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 837 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?