Ward v. Summers
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00258-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Ward, Plaintiff
v.
Summers Lawrence Henry Summers Lawrence Henry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lawrence H. Summers"
Unknown Role, LendingClub CORP
Square, Inc. Unknown Role, Square, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Space Melissa Danielle Hart +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/27/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 10/26/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00-2447[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Order
ORDER of USCA "AWARDING" appellee costs in amount $21.00. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 USCA Mandate
    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court Re: [29-1] appeal by David Ward, copy of opinion attached hereto. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Appeal Record Returned
      Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [29-1] appeal by David Ward (sls, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number Re: [29-1] appeal by David Ward USCA NUMBER: 00-2447 (Case Manager: Wilma Upshur) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
          Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [29-1] appeal by David Ward (Volumes 1 & 2) (ko, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/07/2000
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [29-1] appeal by David Ward (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by David Ward . Fee Status: (filing fee paid) (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 CorrespondenceCourt Filing
                CORRESPONDENCE by Court re: REASSIGNMENT of case from Judge Legg to Chief Judge Motz mailed to all parties. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [12-1] Motion of Defendant to Dismiss, granting [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment and JUDGMENT IS ENTERED in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/26/00) (c/i & microfilmed 10/26/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/26/2000
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/26/00) (c/i & microfilmed 10/26/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Terminated Case
                      Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                        CASE reassigned from Judge Legg to Chf Judge J. F. Motz (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Response in Support
                          RESPONSE by David Ward in further support of his [16-1] opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1-7 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            MARGINAL ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to Provide Evidence to Support Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 8/4/00) (c/i 8/7/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/7/2000, Terminated: 8/4/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MOTION by David Ward to Extend Time to Provide Evidence to Support Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Response in Support
                                RESPONSE by Lawrence H. Summers in support of his [12-1] motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, [12-2] motion for Judgment with Attachment 1 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to File Reply in further support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 7/5/00) (c/i 7/6/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000, Terminated: 7/6/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    SECOND MOTION by Lawrence H. Summers to Extend Time to File Reply in further support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or for Summary Judgment (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [19-1] motion of Defendant to Extend Time to file its Reply in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/28/00) (c/m 6/28/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000, Terminated: 6/28/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by Lawrence H. Summers to Extend Time (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Lawrence H. Summers 6/15/00 on Attorney General of U.S. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Lawrence H. Summers 6/15/00 Answer due on 8/15/00 for Lawrence H. Summers (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Response in Opposition
                                              RESPONSE by David Ward in opposition to [12-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss by Lawrence H. Summers, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Lawrence H. Summers (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Lawrence H. Summers 5/24/00 Answer due on 7/24/00 for Lawrence H. Summers; US Attorney General 5/23/00 (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000, Terminated: 5/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [14-1] Motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 5/18/00) (c/m 5/19/00 chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000, Terminated: 5/19/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                    MOTION by David Ward to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Rule
                                                      Rule 12/56 Letter sent/mailed to all parties. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Lawrence H. Summers to Dismiss or, in the Alternative for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1-19 (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint reset Answer deadline to 5/12/00 for Lawrence H. Summers (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 5/2/00) (c/m 5/3/00 chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000, Terminated: 5/3/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                            MOTION by Lawrence H. Summers to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000, Terminated: 4/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint reset Answer deadline to 5/2/00 for Lawrence H. Summers (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 4/3/00) (c/m 4/4/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/4/2000, Terminated: 4/4/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                MOTION by Lawrence H. Summers to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Lawrence H. Summers by Melissa Danielle Hart, Lynne A. Battaglia (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Lawrence H. Summers 2/7/00 Answer due on 4/7/00 for Lawrence H. Summers (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                      SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Lawrence H. Summers (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Correspondence
                                                                        CORRESPONDENCE by David Ward requesting reissuance of summons due to service on defendant in error by plaintiff. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 Correspondence
                                                                          CORRESPONDENCE to Plaintiff attaching a copy of rule 4 of FRCP. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/3/2000, Entered: 2/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Notify the Court, through an affidavit that he or she has served defendant, pursuant to FRCP 4(l) (signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/2/00) (c/m 2/3/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Lawrence H. Summers. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Jury Demand
                                                                                DEMAND for jury trial by David Ward. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: 1/28/2000 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT, exhibits and attachments filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1163695 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?