Hurwitz v. Gunja
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00304-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Theodore M. Hurwitz, Petitioner
v.
No Logo J. E. Gunja, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 2/1/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Allegany
Terminated 1/22/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 01-6226[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) affirming the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto Re: [15-1] appeal by Theodore M. Hurwitz (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Appeal Record Returned
    Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [15-1] appeal by Theodore M. Hurwitz (vols. 1 & 2) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
      Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [15-1] appeal by Theodore M. Hurwitz (vols. 1 and 2) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 USCA Appeal Fees
        USCA appeal fees received $ 105.00 Receipt #1173762 (ko, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 USCA Case Number
          USCA Case Number Re: [15-1] appeal by Theodore M. Hurwitz USCA NUMBER: 01-6226 (Case Manager: Yevone Jeffreys) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [15-1] appeal by Theodore M. Hurwitz (sls, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Theodore M. Hurwitz . Fee Status: (Filing Fee Not Paid) (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/02/2001
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER "denying" the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; "denying" [12-1] motion of Petitioner to Quash Government's Response and Supplemental Response to Order to Show Cause; "directing" Clerk to mail copies; and "closing" this file. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 1/19/01 ) (c/m & microfilmed 1/22/01 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 1/19/01 ). (c/m 1/22/01 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Terminated Case
                    Case closed. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/30/2000, Terminated: 1/22/2001 Motion to Quash
                      MOTION by Theodore M. Hurwitz to Quash Government's Response and Supplemental Response to Order to Show Cause (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000 Supplemental
                        SUPPLEMENTAL [7-1] response to Order to Show Cause by J. E. Gunja. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000, Terminated: 1/22/2001 Response
                          REPLY by Theodore M. Hurwitz to [7-1] response by J. E. Gunja to Response to Show Cause Order; and Exhibit 1. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER "granting" [8-1] motion of Petitioner to Extend Time to File a Reply to the Government's Response to His Habeas Motion For an Additional Thirty (30) Days; and "directing" Petitioner that if he wished to file a reply to the answer to the petition, he should do so no later than August 11, 2000. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/26/00 ) (c/m 7/27/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000, Terminated: 7/26/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MOTION by Theodore M. Hurwitz to Extend Time to File a Reply to the Government's Response to His Habeas Motion For an Additional Thirty (30) Days . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Response
                                RESPONSE by respondent J. E. Gunja to [2-1] order to show cause; and Exhibits 1-7. (Filed Separately) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/19/2000 Order
                                  ORDER "granting" [5-1] motion of Respondent to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Petition for Habeas Corpus reset Answer deadline to 5/29/00 for J. E. Gunja . ( signed by Clerk Felicia C. Cannon 5/18/00 ) (c/m 5/19/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000, Terminated: 5/18/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by Respondent J. E. Gunja to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Petition for Habeas Corpus . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER DIRECTING respondents to file a response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 45 days. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 3/23/00) (c/m: 3/23/00 bj) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/21/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by Respondent J. E. Gunja to Extend Time to Respond to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: DIRECTING respondents to show cause on or before 3/30/00 why the writ should not be granted ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 2/11/00 ) (c/m: 2/11/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                            CASE reassigned from Judge Legg to Chf Judge J. F. Motz (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Filing Fee Paid
                                              Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 5.00 RECEIPT # 1163899 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                PETITION for writ of habeas corpus. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?