Crescendo Maritime Co. v. Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-04481

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 1:44 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Crescendo Maritime Co., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
Space Lonnie Ellis Klein +1 212 549 0276 +1 212 521 5450 lklein@reedsmith.com
v.
No Logo Bank of Communications Co. Ltd., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Warren Beebe +1 212 415 9304 beebe.daniel@dorsey.com
Space Lanier Saperstein +1 212 756 1136 +1 212 610 6399 saperstein.lanier@dorsey.com
Space David C. Singer +1 212 415 9200 +1 212 953 7201 singer.david@dorsey.com
Citation M 22-1 Designation by U.S. Attorney of individual to accept service of summons and complaint
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Writ of Execution served on Bank of Communications Co. Ltd. on 7/20/16. Service was accepted by Lu Gao, Officer. **I hereby certify and return that I have not received any funds for case number 15 Civ. 4481, but please see attached Satisfaction of Judgment filed by counsel. JUDGMENT SATISFIED PER COUNSEL. Michael Greco, United States Marshal. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co. (sc) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 56 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: 55 Amended Judgment, 49 Amended Judgment, 48 Clerk's Judgment, entered in favor of Crescendo Maritime Co. and against Bank of Communications Co. Ltd. Judgment wholly satisfied by stipulation of the parties on 9/9/2016.(km) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CORRECTED AMENDED JUDGMENT: amending 49 Amended Judgment, That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated February 22, 2016, the petition to confirm the awards is granted; consistent with the awards, judgment is hereby entered in Petitioner's favor in the amount of:(a)the principal amount under the awards, totaling $18.6 million; plus(b)simple interest calculated at 6% per annum from the date of payment of the relevant installment until December 30, 2014, on the basis of a year of 360 days, totaling $7,056,610.56; plus(c)simple interest on the principal sum of $18.6 million calculated at 6% per annum from the date of the awards, December 31, 2014, through the date of the Clerk's Judgment dated February 25, 2016, on the basis of a year of 360 days, totaling $1,308,200.00; plus(d) the Tribunal's costs in the amount of $177,180.69 (113,750.00) converted to USD based on the exchange rate of 1 USD to.6420 GBP as of December 31, 2014); plus(e)interest on the Tribunal's costs calculated at 4% per annum and compounded at three monthly rests from January 5, 2015, through the date of the Clerks Judgment dated February 25, 2016, totaling $8,234.46; plus(f)Petitioner's arbitration costs, plus interest on those costs calculated at 4% per annum and compounded at three monthly rests from December 31, 2014, through the date of Clerk's Judgment dated February 25, 2016, plus(g)post-judgment interest calculated at the rate of 0.51%, as prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, accruing from February 26, 2016; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/23/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Main Document 55 replaced on 4/14/2016) (dt). Modified on 4/14/2016 (dt). (Entered: 03/23/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER: that the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to (1) correct the spelling of Petitioner's name in the caption and the first sentence of the Amended Judgment and (2) correct part (c) of the Amended Judgment to accurately reflect that interest on the principal amount of the awards for the period December 31, 2014, through February 25, 2016, was to be calculated on the basis of a year of 360 days, and totals $1,308,200.00. Respondent's application to modify the exchange rate used in the Amended Judgment is denied. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 3/21/2016) (tn) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver K. Beiersdorf dated 3/18/2016 re: Request to correct clerical errors. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Klein, Lonnie) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 03/15/2016 re: Response to Crescendo's 03/10/2016 letter (Dkt. No. 51); and request to correct errors in Amended Judgment (Dkt. No. 49). Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf dated 3/10/2016 re: Request to correct clerical errors. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION to Reopen re: 49 Amended Judgment to correct clerical errors addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf dated 3/10/2016. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) Modified on 3/11/2016 (db). (Entered: 03/10/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AMENDED JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated February 22, 2016, the petition to confirm the awards is granted; consistent with the awards, judgment is hereby entered in Petitioner's favor in the amount of:(a)the principal amount under the awards, totaling $18.6 million; plus(b)simple interest calculated at 6% per annum from the date of payment of the relevant installment until December 30, 2014, on the basis of a year of 360 days, totaling $7,056,610.56; plus(c)simple interest on the principal sum of $18.6 million calculated at 6% per annum from the date of the awards, December 31, 2014, through the date of the Clerk's judgment dated February 25, 2016, totaling $1,287,221.91; plus(d) the Tribunal's costs in the amount of $177,180.69 (113,750.00 converted to USD based on the exchange rate of 1 USD to.6420 GBP as of December 31, 2014); plus(e)interest on the Tribunal's costs calculated at 4% per annum and compounded at three monthly rests from January 5, 2015, through the date of the Clerk's judgment dated February 25, 2016, totaling $8,234.46; plus(f)Petitioner's arbitration costs, plus interest on those costs calculated at 4% per annum and compounded at three monthly rests from December 31, 2014, through the date of Clerk's Judgment dated February 25, 2016, plus(g)post-judgment interest calculated at the rate of 0.51%, as prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, accruing from February 26, 2016; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/2/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                    CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated February 22, 2016, the petition to confirm the awards is granted; judgment is hereby entered in Petitioner's favor in the Shipbuilding Arbitration in the amount of $18.6 million under the Shipbuilding Contract, along with costs, accrued interest, and post-award interest and in the three Refund Arbitration awards in the amount of $18.6 million under the Refund Guarantees plus costs and interest; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/25/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lanier Saperstein on behalf of Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. New Address: Dorsey & Whitney LLP, 51 West 52nd Street, New York, New York, USA 10019, (212)-415-9200. (Saperstein, Lanier) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lonnie Ellis Klein on behalf of Crescendo Maritime Co.. New Address: Reed Smith LLP, 599 Lexington Avenue, New York, NY, US 10022, 212-549-0276. (Klein, Lonnie) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          OPINION & ORDER #106221 re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award filed by Crescendo Maritime Co. For the foregoing reasons, the petition to confirm the awards is granted. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment in Petitioner's favor and close this case. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 2/22/2016) (tro) Modified on 2/23/2016 (ca). (Main Document 45 replaced on 2/24/2016) (tn). (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/9/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/9/2015 before Judge John F. Keenan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 12/08/15 re: response to Supplemental Declaration of Angeliki Kalapodi (Dkt. No. 41). Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd..(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DECLARATION of ANGELIKI KALAPODI in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 12/04/2015 re: response to Crescendo Maritime Co.'s 12/02/15 letter (Dkt. No. 39). Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd..(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf, Esq. dated December 2, 2015 re: Updating the Court about a recent ruling by English High Court. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B - Final Orders)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf, Esq. dated November 24, 2015 re: In Response to Bocom's November 16, 2015 letter. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 11/16/2015 re: update about recent developments in BOCOM-QD's two appeals in England. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER. The oral argument is adjourned from November 18, 2015 to December 9, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. Granting 35 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf dated November 3, 2015. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co. (Oral Argument set for 12/9/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge John F. Keenan). (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 11/5/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf dated November 3, 2015. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Klein dated November 3, 2015 re: Corrected Exhibits. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit C to Kalapodi Declaration (corrected), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit E to Kalapodi Declaration (corrected))(Klein, Lonnie) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lonnie Ellis Klein on behalf of Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Klein, Lonnie) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from OLIVER BEIERSDORF dated 10/15/2015 re: Response to BOCOM's 10/15/15 Letter. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: Oral Argument set for 11/18/2015 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/15/2015) (tn) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 10/15/2015 re: supplement to October 9, 2015 letter (Dkt. No. 23). Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Declaration of Randall Peerenboom)(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DECLARATION of Randall Peerenboom in Opposition re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY AFFIRMATION of YUAN HUI in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REPLY AFFIRMATION of CHARLES GRAINGER WELLER in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D, # 2 Exhibits E-G, # 3 Exhibits H-J)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY AFFIRMATION of OLIVER BEIERSDORF in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award. . Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award. . Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Lanier Saperstein dated October 9, 2015 re: Request for oral argument. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd..(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Daniel W. Beebe in Opposition re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (See #29) DECLARATION of Randall Peerenboom in Opposition re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Beebe, Daniel) Modified on 10/13/2015 (kj). (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award. . Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf, Esq. dated October 7, 2015 re: Update on Status of Appeals/Challenges Pending in England in relation to the Arbitration Awards. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Final Order, # 2 Final Order, # 3 Final Order)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 10/05/2015 re: Appeals pending before the High Court of Justice in England. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd..(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 15 Letter, filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: As requested, the court will hold a pre-motion conference on July 21, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. The deadlines set in the Court's June 30, 2015 Order are suspended. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/21/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 7/13/2015) (tn) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Oliver Beiersdorf dated July 13, 2015 re: Response to Respondent's Request for Pre-Motion Conference for a Stay of the Proceedings. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 7/10/2015 re: request for a pre-motion conference for a stay of the proceedings, or alternatively, for an extension. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of CIVIL COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF MOTION, PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD, DECLARATIONS OF ANGELIKI KALAPODI AND YUAN HUI, RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT served on BANK OF COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY LIMITED on 06/11/2015. Service was accepted by DEREK YANG. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER withdrawing 9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File: Crescendo shall serve its Memorandum of Law in support of the Petition by June 30, 2015. BOCOM must serve its opposition papers to the Petition and Notice of Motion by no later than Tuesday, July 14, 2015; Crescendo must serve its reply papers by no later than Tuesday, July 28, 2015; Pursuant to the Court's individual practices, paragraph 2(E), no papers shall be filed until the Petition has been fully briefed; each party shall file its papers on the date the last memorandum is due; and Crescendo, as the moving party, is obligated to furnish to chambers a full set of courtesy copies of the papers. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/30/2015) (tn) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from L. Saperstein dated 6/26/2015 re: briefing schedule for Petition (Dkt. No. 1) and Notice of Motion (Dkt. No. 2). Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Warren Beebe on behalf of Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Beebe, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David C. Singer on behalf of Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Singer, David) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition papers addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Lanier Saperstein dated June 25, 2015. Document filed by Bank of Communications Co. Ltd..(Saperstein, Lanier) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lanier Saperstein on behalf of Bank of Communications Co. Ltd.. (Saperstein, Lanier) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition, Notice of Motion, Supporting Declarations, Rule 7.1 Statement, Civil Cover Sheet, Judge's Rules served on BANK OF COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY LIMITED on 06/11/2015. Service was accepted by Derek Yang, Compliance Dept.. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of YUAN HUI in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of ANGELIKI KALAPODI in Support re: 2 MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award.. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-H, # 5 Exhibit I-P, # 6 Exhibit Q-V, # 7 Exhibit W-Z)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment on Petition to Confirm Foreign Arbitration Award. Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  PETITION TO CONFIRM FOREIGN ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT ARBITRATION..Document filed by Crescendo Maritime Co..(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?