Data Carriers, LLC v. Sasol (USA) Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01014

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 1:00 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Carriers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Austin Hansley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Hansley +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 Austin@TheTexasLawOffice.com
v.
No Logo Sasol (usa) Corporation, Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 47 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?