Data Carriers, LLC v. ConocoPhillips Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01018

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 5:23 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Carriers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Michael LaPray +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 brandon@thetexaslawoffice.com
v.
ConocoPhillips Company ConocoPhillips Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jayme Partridge +1 713 623 4844 +1 713 623 4846 JPartridge@pattersonsheridan.com
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?