Data Carriers, LLC v. Encana Oil & Gas (USA) Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01022

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 5:03 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Carriers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Michael LaPray +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 brandon@thetexaslawoffice.com
v.
No Logo EnCana Oil & Gas (USA), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?