Data Carriers, LLC v. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01023

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 11:01 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Carriers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon Michael LaPray +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 brandon@thetexaslawoffice.com
v.
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Anthony Baghdassarian +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 mbaghdassarian@kramerlevin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Baghdassarian +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 mbaghdassarian@kramerlevin.com
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 6 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?