Data Carriers, LLC v. Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01024

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 3:26 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Carriers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benton Rain Patterson, III +1 469 587 9776 benton@thetexaslawoffice.com
No Logo Quest Diagnostics, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Quest Diagnostics Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED erin.tanner@bakermckenzie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Forrest Utley +1 214 978 3036 +1 214 978 3099 jay.utley@bakermckenzie.com
v.
No Logo Quest Diagnostics, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Quest Diagnostics Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED erin.tanner@bakermckenzie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Forrest Utley +1 214 978 3036 +1 214 978 3099 jay.utley@bakermckenzie.com
No Logo Data Carriers, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benton Rain Patterson, III +1 469 587 9776 benton@thetexaslawoffice.com
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?