ADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY v. FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00920

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 12:48 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advocates For Highway & Auto Safety, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Lee Einspanier +1 202 588 7728 +1 202 588 7795 keinspanier@citizen.org
v.
No Logo Federal Highway Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick D. Davis +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.davis2@usdoj.gov
Space Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
Space Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Order on motion for relief from judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Relief from Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY. (Einspanier, Kathryn)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      COMPLAINT against FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4138107) filed by ADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons to FHWA, # 5 Summons to Attorney General)(Einspanier, Kathryn)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?