Duffy v. IsoRay Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cv-05046
District Judge Lonny R. Suko, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 7, 2017 at 1:38 AM EST (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JM Zulueta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com
No Logo Patrick Duffy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Dov Berger +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 cdberger@pomlaw.com
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Alan Lieberman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 jalieberman@pomlaw.com
No Logo Tim Yuen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com
v.
No Logo Brien Ragle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
Space John C. Roberts +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 jroberts@wsgr.com
Space Gregory Lewis Watts +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100 gwatts@wsgr.com
No Logo Dwight Babcock, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
Space John C. Roberts +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 jroberts@wsgr.com
Space Gregory Lewis Watts +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100 gwatts@wsgr.com
No Logo Isoray, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry M. Kaplan +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 bkaplan@wsgr.com
Space John C. Roberts +1 206 883 2500 +1 206 883 2699 jroberts@wsgr.com
Space Gregory Lewis Watts +1 650 493 9300 +5655 565 565 5100 gwatts@wsgr.com
No Logo Arturo V. Cervantes, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com
No Logo Bogdan Ostrowski, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cheung, Yang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Esther Fuks +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sfuks@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachele R. Rickert +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 rickert@whafh.com
No Logo Edward Cross, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Phillip Barth +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 karlb@hbsslaw.com
No Logo Jason Huang, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com
No Logo Joseph Kavanagh, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cheung, Yang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Esther Fuks +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sfuks@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachele R. Rickert +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 rickert@whafh.com
No Logo Patrick McNamara, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cheung, Yang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip C. Kim +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 pkim@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Esther Fuks +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sfuks@rosenlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachele R. Rickert +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 rickert@whafh.com
No Logo Sudhendu Dasgupta, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Allen Cantor +1 425 868 7813 +1 425 868 7870 cliff.cantor@outlook.com
No Logo Hana Sakamoto, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Ann Kruse +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jakruse@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Zuchetto +1 509 455 3966 +1 509 455 3906 scottgroup@me.com
No Logo James Ewing, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Ann Kruse +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jakruse@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Zuchetto +1 509 455 3966 +1 509 455 3906 scottgroup@me.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 97 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND PLAINTIFF AWARDS - granting 90 Motion Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs and Settlement Class Members pursuant to Order and Final Judgment at ECF No. 95 . (VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 95 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(VR, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2017 re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, Patrick McNamara, JM Zulueta, 90 MOTION Pls.' motion for award of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and awards to lead plaintiffs re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPO filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, Patrick McNamara, JM Zulueta. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DECLARATION by Supplemental declaration of Josephine Bravata in Support re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures , 90 MOTION Pls.' motion for award of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and awards to lead plaintiffs re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPO filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY MEMORANDUM re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures , 90 MOTION Pls.' motion for award of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and awards to lead plaintiffs re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPO filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            NOTICE resetting Hearing on Motions - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re 90 MOTION Pls.' motion for award of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and awards to lead plaintiffs re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPO, 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures : Motion Hearing reset for 3/7/2017 at 10:30 AM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. CHANGE IN LOCATION ONLY. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              MOTION Pls.' motion for award of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and awards to lead plaintiffs re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures , 89 Declaration in Support of Motion,, by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2017 at 10:30 AM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DECLARATION by Matthew M. Guiney & Philip Kim in Support re 88 MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D, # 5 Ex. E, # 6 Ex. F, # 7 Ex. G, # 8 Ex. H, # 9 Ex. I, # 10 Ex. J)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MOTION Pls.' motion for final approval of class action settlement and plan of allocation re 86 MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2017 at 10:30 AM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 87 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice Procedures. Final Settlement Hearing set for 3/7/2017 at 10:30 AM in Yakima, Washington, Courtroom 203, before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Proof of Claim Forms)(PL, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MOTION (UNOPPOSED) for entry of order preliminarily approving settlement and establishing notice procedures by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2016 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Settlement (including its exhibits), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER Granting 84 Motion to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Stipulated MOTION Stipulation to exceed page limits by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2016 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          PROTECTIVE ORDER; granting ECF No. 80 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER GOVERNING EXPERT DISCOVERY; granting ECF No. 81 Stipulated Motion for Discovery Stipulation Governing Expert Discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (TR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Stipulated MOTION for Discovery Stipulation Governing Expert Discovery by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2016 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Stipulated MOTION for Discovery , Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2016 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/17/2018 09:00 AM via Telephonic Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Final Telephonic Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2018 at 09:00 AM via Telephonic Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Jury Trial set for 6/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko: Scheduling Conference held on 7/19/2016. (Reported/Recorded by: Not Reported) (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski re 75 Scheduling Conference Notice Joint Rule 26(f) Status Certificate and Discovery Plan (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc.(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2016 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS, INTER ALIA - denying 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. Proceedings held on May 12, 2016, in Yakima, Washington, before Judge Lonny R. Suko. Page Numbers: 1 - 58 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber Dorene Boyle at 509-457-6741 . Redaction Request due 6/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2016 re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc.; 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc.; and 67 MOTION Pls' request for judicial notice re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, Patrick McNamara, JM Zulueta. (Reported/Recorded by: Dorene Boyle) (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM re 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE RESETTING Hearing on Motions - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document; due to a conflict with the Court calendar, the hearings Re 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 67 MOTION Pls' request for judicial notice re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 66 MOTION Pls' opposition to Defs' request for judicial notice re 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal S, and 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim are RESET for 5/12/2016 at 2:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. CHANGE IN DATE AND TIME. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        DECLARATION by Sara Fuks in Support re 66 MOTION Pls' opposition to Defs' request for judicial notice re 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal S, 67 MOTION Pls' request for judicial notice re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          MOTION Pls' request for judicial notice re 65 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 02:30 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice regarding 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 02:30 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) Modified on 9/13/2016 (CC, Case Administrator). (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE RESETTING Hearing on Motions - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re 63 MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Motion Hearings RESET to clarify hearing location on 4/21/2016 at 2:30 PM Yakima Courtroom 203 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  MOTION Defendants Request for Judicial Notice and Notice of Incorporation by Reference in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 02:30 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    DECLARATION by Christopher Petroni in Support re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 02:30 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER EXTENDING THE PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DUE DECEMBER 15) AND SUBSUQUENT BRIEFING - granting 57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion to Expedite Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Stipulated Motion to Expedite Hearing of Stipulated Motion to Extend the Page Limits for Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Due December 15) and Subsequent Briefing by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc, Brien Ragle. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Stipulated Motion to Extend the Page Limits for Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Due December 15) and Subsequent Briefing by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc, Brien Ragle. Motion Hearing set for 12/30/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Sealed Document. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc. Jury Demand. Filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Bogdan Ostrowski, Patrick McNamara, Tim Yuen, JM Zulueta.(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Sealed Document. (CC, Case Administrator) (CV, Case Administrator). Modified on 10/15/2015 (CV, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Sealed Document. (CC, Case Administrator) (CV, Case Administrator). Modified on 10/15/2015 (CV, Case Administrator). (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM TO ALL COUNSEL signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Sara Fuks for Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, and Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c)(1) of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Washington. Counsel of record, Cliff Cantor, shall sign all pleadings, motions and other papers prior to filing and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty Brian O. O'Mara and Laurie L. Largent) by Edward Cross. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barth, Karl) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Sara Fuks. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2144829. by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 32 Joint Stipulation and an order is entered pursuant thereto (ECF No. 46); finding as moot 12 , 16 , 18 , 20 and 22 pursuant to the Joint Stipulation and the order entered pursuant thereto; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 14 Motion of Arturo V. Cervantes-GRANTED to the extent it seeks consolidation of cases and DENIED to the extent it seeks appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of selection of counsel. All of the consolidated cases, including ECF No. CV-15-5046-LRS, are subject to the terms of the Order Extending Time To Respond To Complaint filed at ECF No. 13 in CV-15-5047-LRS. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS, AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Joy A. Kruse for James Ewing and Hana Sakamoto. Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c)(1) of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Washington. Counsel of record, Darrell W. Scott, shall sign all pleadings, motions and other papers prior to filing and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Phillip Kim for Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, and Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c)(1) of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Washington. Counsel of record, Cliff Cantor, shall sign all pleadings, motions and other papers prior to filing and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Phillip Kim. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2142568. by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Rachele R Rickert for Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, and Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c)(1) of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Washington. Counsel of record, Clifford A. Cantor, shall sign all pleadings, motions and other papers prior to filing and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joy A. Kruse. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2141693. by Hana Sakamoto. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Darrell) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Matthew Guiney in Support re 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 18 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1, # 2 Ex 2, # 3 Ex 3, # 4 Ex 4, # 5 Ex 5, # 6 Ex 6)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM re 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 18 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM re 14 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Arturo V. Cervantes. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Rachele R. Rickert. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2139364. by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by C Dov Berger on behalf of Movants Sudhendu Dasgupta, Jason Huang, Plaintiff Patrick Duffy (Berger, C) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Submission of Proposed Order Re 32 MOTION joint stip (except Cervantes) and order re appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of selection of counsel re 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 18 MOTION consolida filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Bogdan Ostrowski, Patrick McNamara ; filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Matthew M. Guiney for Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, and Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c)(1) of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Washington. Counsel of record, Cliff Cantor, shall sign all pleadings, motions and other papers prior to filing and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 18 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Arturo V. Cervantes. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MOTION joint stip (except Cervantes) and order re appointment of lead plaintiff and approval of selection of counsel re 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 18 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Patrick McNamara, Bogdan Ostrowski. (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, approval of selection of counsel , 14 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 22 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel , 18 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel Defendants Response to Lead Plaintiff Motions filed by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc, Brien Ragle. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Matthew M. Guiney. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2134780. by Joseph Kavanagh, Bogdan Ostrowski. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Sudhendu Dasgupta, Jason Huang re 12 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, approval of selection of counsel (Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT re 12 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, approval of selection of counsel , 14 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 22 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel , 18 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel , 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel, 24 Order by All Plaintiffs. (Scott, Darrell) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc, Brien Ragle. (Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER RE: Bourbaki v. IsoRay, Inc., et al., CV-15-03890-BRO-AS, having now been transferred to this district from the Central District of California (ECF No. 33 in E.D. of Washington Cause No. CV-15-5076-LRS), this court's previous orders entered in CV-15-5046-LRS (ECF No. 24) and CV-15-5047-LRS (ECF No. 26 ) are deemed moot and are hereby VACATED. Movants need not respond to those orders. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION AND APPOINTMENT AS LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (RG, Ops Supervisor) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Karl P. Barth in Support re 22 MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Edward Cross. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Barth, Karl) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel by Edward Cross. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barth, Karl) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Phillip Kim in Support re 20 MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Patrick McNamara. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1, # 2 Ex 2, # 3 Ex 3, # 4 Ex 4, # 5 Ex 5)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION consolidation, appointment of lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel by Patrick McNamara. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Rachele R. Rickert in Support re 18 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Joseph Kavanagh, Bogdan Ostrowski. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A, # 2 Ex B, # 3 Ex C, # 4 Ex D)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel by Bogdan Ostrowski, Joseph Kavanagh. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION by Darrell W. Scott in Support re 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Scott, Darrell) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Darrell) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Adam M. Apton in Support re 14 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel filed by Arturo V. Cervantes. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A, # 2 Ex B, # 3 Ex C, # 4 Ex D)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and approval of selection of counsel by Arturo V. Cervantes. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support re 12 MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, approval of selection of counsel filed by Sudhendu Dasgupta, Jason Huang. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A, # 2 Ex B, # 3 Ex C, # 4 Ex D)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, approval of selection of counsel by Jason Huang, Sudhendu Dasgupta. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2015 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Duffy re Brien Ragle. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Duffy re Dwight Babcock. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Duffy re IsoRay Inc. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John C Roberts, Jr on behalf of Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc, Brien Ragle (Attorney John C Roberts, Jr added to party Dwight Babcock(pty:dft), Attorney John C Roberts, Jr added to party IsoRay Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John C Roberts, Jr added to party Brien Ragle(pty:dft))(Roberts, John) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory L Watts on behalf of Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc, Brien Ragle (Attorney Gregory L Watts added to party Dwight Babcock(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L Watts added to party IsoRay Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory L Watts added to party Brien Ragle(pty:dft))(Watts, Gregory) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M Kaplan on behalf of Dwight Babcock, IsoRay Inc, Brien Ragle (Attorney Barry M Kaplan added to party Dwight Babcock(pty:dft), Attorney Barry M Kaplan added to party IsoRay Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Barry M Kaplan added to party Brien Ragle(pty:dft))(Kaplan, Barry) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 3 and 4 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorneys C. Dov Berger and Jeremy A. Lieberman for Patrick Duffy. Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c)(1) of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Washington. Counsel of record, Cliff Cantor, shall sign all pleadings, motions and other papers prior to filing and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. Text-only entry; no PDF will follow. This text-only entry constitutes the Court order or notice on the matter. (GT, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jeremy A. Lieberman. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2093438. by Patrick Duffy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: C. Dov Berger. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-2093392. by Patrick Duffy. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2, # 2 Summons 3)(MF, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Dwight Babcock, IsoRay, Inc., Brien Ragle ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2087302) Jury Demand. Filed by Patrick Duffy. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons - IsoRay, Inc., # 3 Summons - Babcock, # 4 Summons - Ragle)(Cantor, Clifford) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,042 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?