USA v. Londonio et al
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00340
District Judge Victor Marrero, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 11:26 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Londonio, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Richard S. Matesic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Robert Blossner +1 212 571 0805 +1 212 571 0938 robertblossner1@verizon.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
INDICTMENT FILED as to Christopher Londonio (1) count(s) 1, Pasquale Maiorino (2) count(s) 2. (jm) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck: Initial Appearance as to Christopher Londonio held on 5/11/2015., Deft Appears with Retained Attorney Robert Blossner by Vik Pawar and AUSA Scott Hartman for the government. Detention on Consent w/o Prejudice; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 6/10/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif) [1:15-mj-01599-UA] (Entered: 05/11/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Robert Blossner appearing for Christopher Londonio. (dif) [1:15-mj-01599-UA] (Entered: 05/11/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        COMPLAINT as to Christopher Londonio, Pasquale Maiorino. In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 922 (g), 924 (c) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck) (dif) [1:15-mj-01599-UA] (Entered: 05/11/2015)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 735 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?