YA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LP v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00938

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 12:48 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ya Global Investments, LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Z. Moghadam +1 202 799 4512 +1 202 799 5512 sara.moghadam@dlapiper.com
No Logo Ya Offshore Global Investments Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara Z. Moghadam +1 202 799 4512 +1 202 799 5512 sara.moghadam@dlapiper.com
v.
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald Alan Role +1 202 547 4678 rolelawdc@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew C. Strelka +1 202 637 2200 andrew.strelka@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TREASURY, CHIEF COUNSEL, SW DIST - IRS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RACHAEL J. ZEPEDA +1 602 636 9630 +1 602 636 9601

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith Anna Amorosa +1 215 861 8869 judith.amorosa@usdoj.gov
Space Carmen M. Banerjee +1 202 307 6423 carmen.m.banerjee@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher David Belen +1 202 307 2089 +1 202 514 6866 Christopher.D.Belen@usdoj.gov
Space Kavitha Bondada +1 202 307 6536 kavitha.bondada@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
Space Norah Elizabeth Bringer +1 202 307 6224 +1 202 514 6866 norah.e.bringer@usdoj.gov
Space Kieran O'Neill Carter +1 202 616 1920 +1 202 514 6866 kieran.o.carter@usdoj.gov
Space LINDSEY W. COOPER +1 202 307 6528 +1 202 514 6866 lindsey.w.cooper@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher R Egan +1 214 880 9732 +1 214 880 9741 christopher.r.egan@usdoj.gov
Space NICOLE MARIA ELLIOTT +1 202 616 9785 +1 202 514 6866 nicole.m.elliott@usdoj.gov
Space Jan Meir Geht +1 202 307 6449 jan.m.geht@usdoj.gov
Space Yonatan Gelblum +1 202 305 3136 +1 202 514 6866 yonatan.gelblum@usdoj.gov
Space Richard Jeremy Hagerman +1 202 616 9832 +1 202 514 6866 richard.j.hagerman@usdoj.gov
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Space Grover Hartt, III +1 214 880 9733 +1 214 880 9741 grover.hartt@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen S Ho +1 202 616 8994 +1 202 514 6866 stephen.s.ho@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph E. Hunsader +1 202 514 0472 +1 202 514 6866 joseph.e.hunsader@usdoj.gov
Space MARGARET L. HUTCHINSON +1 215 861 8282 +1 215 861 8618 margaret.hutchinson@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas James Jaworski +1 202 307 6390 +1 202 514 6866 Thomas.j.jaworski@usdoj.gov
Space Geoffrey J. Klimas +1 202 307 6346 geoffrey.j.klimas@usdoj.gov
Space Nishant Kumar +1 202 514 2986 +1 202 514 6886 nishant.kumar@usdoj.gov
Space Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Ryan O'Connor McMonagle +1 202 307 1355 +1 202 514 6866 ryan.mcmonagle@usdoj.gov
Space Ann Elizabeth Nash +1 202 307 6489 +1 202 514 6866 ann.e.nash@usdoj.gov
Space Stephanie Sasarak +1 202 307 2089 +1 202 514 6866 Stephanie.A.Sasarak@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Andrew Sergi +1 202 305 0868 +1 202 307 0054 Joseph.A.Sergi@usdoj.gov
Space Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
Space CLAIRE H. TAYLOR +1 202 307 1427 +1 202 514 6866 claire.h.taylor@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
Space Katherine Walsh +1 202 353 7205 +1 202 514 9868 katherine.walsh@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Permit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Motion for Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Meet and Confer Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by YA OFFSHORE GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LTD. (Moghadam, Sara)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET by YA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LP, YA OFFSHORE GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LTD filed by YA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LP, YA OFFSHORE GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LTD.(Moghadam, Sara)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                      COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4142289) filed by YA GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LP, YA OFFSHORE GLOBAL INVESTMENTS, LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit II, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit III, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit IV, # 5 Summons Summons 1, # 6 Summons Summons 2, # 7 Summons Summons 3, # 8 Summons Summons 4, # 9 Summons Summons 5, # 10 Summons Summons 6)(Moghadam, Sara)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?