Morrison v. USA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00176-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alyssa Joy Morrison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerard William Wittstadt, Jr +14102 849 600 x202
v.
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States of America United States Postal Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/19/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $49000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 9/25/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING Case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 9/25/00) (c/i 9/25/00) (MICROFILMED 9/25/00) ) (das, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (das, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 3/29/00 ) (c/i 3/29/00) (das, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: 3/28/2000 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint by USA (Attorney Andrea Leahy-Fucheck, Lynne A. Battaglia). (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/18/2000 Summons Returned Executed
          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA, Postmaster 2/7/00, AG 2/7/00, and U.S. Attorney 2/4/00; Answer due on 4/4/00 for USA. (das, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000 Summons Issued
            SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000 Complaint
              COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1163575 (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/24/2000
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 37 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?