Thomas v. Hayden
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00390-MJG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Orrin E. Thomas, Sr., Plaintiff
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lt. General Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M Schenning +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 209 3124 stephen.schenning@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 2/9/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 6/22/2001
Origin 4
Reopened 10/13/2000
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT ENTERED in favor of defendant, Lt. General Michael V. Hayden against plaintiff, Orrin E. Thomas Sr.; DISMISSING all claims with prejudice without costs. ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/21/01) (c/i & microfilmed 6/25/01) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [24-1] motion of Hayden to Dismiss, denying as moot [24-2] motion of Hayden for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Complaint with prejudice. signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/21/01) (c/i & microfilmed 6/25/01) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001 Terminated Case
      Case closed (eg, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Response in Support of Motion
        REPLY BRIEF by Lt. General Michael V. Hayden in support of his [24-1] motion to Dismiss and his [24-2] motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 Response in Opposition to Motion
          BRIEF by Orrin E. Thomas Sr. in opposition to [24-1] motion of Lt. General Michael V. Hayden to Dismiss, [24-2] motion of Lt. General Michael V. Hayden for Summary Judgment nunc pro tunc (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [25-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment to 4/2/01 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/13/01) (c/m 2/13/01 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001, Terminated: 2/13/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              MOTION by Orrin E. Thomas Sr. to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001, Terminated: 6/22/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION with memorandum in support by Lt. General Michael V. Hayden to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment nunc pro tunc and Exhibits A through X (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [22-1] motion of Hayden for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment Nunc pro tunc ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/5/01) (c/m 2/7/01 jw) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001, Terminated: 2/7/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                    MOTION by Lt. General Michael V. Hayden for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment Nunc pro tunc and proposed Motion to Dismiss and Summary Judgment nunc pro tunc (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion of Defendant to Extend Time to answer the complaint; set Answer deadline to 1/30/01 for Lt. General Michael V. Hayden ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 1/25/01 ) (c/m 1/25/01-jw) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001, Terminated: 1/25/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        MOTION by Lt. General Michael V. Hayden to Extend Time to answer the complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [18-1] motion of defendant for Enlargement of Time to respond to complaint set Answer deadline to 1/23/01 for Lt. General Michael V. Hayden ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 12/18/00 ) (c/m 12/18/00 jw) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000, Terminated: 12/18/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            MOTION by Lt. General Michael V. Hayden for Enlargement of Time to respond to complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Attorney 10/24/00, Lt. General Michael V. Hayden 10/24/00 U.S. Attorney General 10/24/00 Answer due on 12/25/00 for Lt. General Michael V. Hayden (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Summons Issued
                                SUMMONS(ES) 60 days issued for Lt. General Michael V. Hayden (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Reinstate Complaint; DIRECTING that plaintiff, without fail, effect service on defendants by 10/30/00 and; DIRECTING that if, by 10/30/00 the plaintiff does not effect proper service, this case shall be dismissed without prejudice ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/12/00) (c/m 10/13/00 jw) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Case Reopened
                                    Case reopened (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000, Terminated: 10/13/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION by Orrin E. Thomas Sr. to Reinstate Complaint and Exhibits (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 10/3/00) (c/m 10/3/00 jw) (MICROFILMED 10/4/00) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Terminated Case
                                          Case closed (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Lt. General Michael V. Hayden 7/24/00 Answer due on 9/22/00 (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Summons Issued
                                              SECOND SUMMONS(ES) issued (60 days) for Lt. General Michael V. Hayden (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time for service of complaint from 7/1/00 to 7/31/00 ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/30/00 ) (c/m 7/5/00 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/11/2000
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000, Terminated: 7/5/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                  MOTION for leave by Orrin E. Thomas Sr. to Extend Time for service of complaint (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER DIRECTING the plaintiff to show cause within 14 days from the date of this Order why the complaint should not be dismissed for failure to effect service ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 6/20/00 ) (c/m 6/22/00 eg) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/23/2000
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/1/2000 Summons Issued
                                                      SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Lt. General Michael V. Hayden (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to withhold issuance of summons submitted by plaintiff and provide plaintiff with blank summonses; DIRECTING plaintiff to complete the summonses and return to Clerk within 20 days from the date of this order ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/25/00) (c/m 2/28/00 jl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying [4-1] motion of plaintiff for Appointment of Counsel ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/25/00) (c/m 2/25/00 jw) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000, Terminated: 2/25/2000 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                            Letter MOTION by Orrin E. Thomas Sr. for Appointment of Counsel (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying as moot [2-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DIRECTING Clerk to withhold issuance of summons and to provide plaintiff with blank summonses ( signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis 2/15/00) (c/m 2/17/00 jl) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000, Terminated: 2/16/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                MOTION by Orrin E. Thomas Sr. to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and affidavit in support. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 Jury Demand
                                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by Orrin E. Thomas Sr. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 Complaint
                                                                    LETTER/COMPLAINT and attachments filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1164132 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?