Latasha McLaughlin v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-02904

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 11:02 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (161) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      AMENDED JUDGMENT (approving 192 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/2/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Status Report Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/11/2017. Status Report due by 8/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4) (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Document E-Filed Under Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Proposed Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S 163 166 MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Settlement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF 151 CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/2016. Motions due by 1/12/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER 153 VACATING SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES, SHORTENING TIME FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL, AND CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 151 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settle ment: Responses due by 11/7/2016. Replies due by 11/11/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/23/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER POSTPONING DEADLINES AND REQUIRING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/2016. Responses due by 11/3/2016. Replies due by 11/10/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Replies due by 10/27/2016. Responses due by 10/20/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/6/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION AND DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 141 STIPULATION CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR CLASS NOTICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING JOINT PROPOSAL FOR CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/29/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING 132 MOTION TO STAY AND VACATING HEARING.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 129 STIPULATION TO RESET DEADLINES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 61 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIESFOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ORDER MODIFYING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 100 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO FILE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.S PROPOSED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 71 82 84 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING IN PART 73 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND VACATING HEARINGS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY Responses due by 2/16/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 54 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE 58 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPROVING 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING 40 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING 43 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Appealability
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT TILA REQUIRED INSURANCE PROCEEDS TO BE REFLECTED IN PAYOFF STATEMENT 20 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING 32 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW INSLEY-PRUITT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CMC. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 8/12/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?