Patent Asset Licensing, LLC v. Birch Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00746

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2019 at 10:40 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Patent Asset Licensing, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P Griffin +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 rgriffin@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Vecchione +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 anthony@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siber Law LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andres Felipe Arrubla +1 212 858 9945 +1 646 417 7045 aarrubla@siberlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanna Madbak +1 212 858 9942
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Siber +1 212 858 9942

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Hulsey & Busey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Arthur Bolling +1 904 359 7700 +1 904 359 7708 jbolling@smithhulsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Busey +1 904 359 7700 +1 904 359 7708 busey@smithhulsey.com
No Logo Birch Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Sneddon Trupp +1 813 769 7020 +1 813 426 8580 Robin.trupp@gmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Sneddon Trupp +1 813 769 7020 +1 813 426 8580 Robin.trupp@gmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gardiner B. Davis +1 816 292 8227 +1 816 474 3216 gdavis@spencerfane.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gardiner B. Davis +1 816 292 8227 +1 816 474 3216 gdavis@spencerfane.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Lynn Elliott +1 816 474 8100 +1 816 474 3216 kelliott@spencerfane.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Lynn Elliott +1 816 474 8100 +1 816 474 3216 kelliott@spencerfane.com
v.
No Logo Birch Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspoon Marder, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Sneddon Trupp +1 813 769 7020 +1 813 426 8580 Robin.trupp@gmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spencer Fane Britt & Browne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gardiner B. Davis +1 816 292 8227 +1 816 474 3216 gdavis@spencerfane.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Lynn Elliott +1 816 474 8100 +1 816 474 3216 kelliott@spencerfane.com
No Logo Patent Asset Licensing, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P Griffin +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 rgriffin@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P Griffin +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 rgriffin@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Vecchione +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 anthony@nelbum.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Vecchione +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 anthony@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siber Law LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andres Felipe Arrubla +1 212 858 9945 +1 646 417 7045 aarrubla@siberlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andres Felipe Arrubla +1 212 858 9945 +1 646 417 7045 aarrubla@siberlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanna Madbak +1 212 858 9942
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanna Madbak +1 212 858 9942
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Siber +1 212 858 9942
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor Siber +1 212 858 9942

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Hulsey & Busey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Arthur Bolling +1 904 359 7700 +1 904 359 7708 jbolling@smithhulsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Arthur Bolling +1 904 359 7700 +1 904 359 7708 jbolling@smithhulsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Busey +1 904 359 7700 +1 904 359 7708 busey@smithhulsey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Busey +1 904 359 7700 +1 904 359 7708 busey@smithhulsey.com
  Entries (92) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Supplement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None *Order pdf
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Substitute Party
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Proof of Service
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Third Party Complaint
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER resolving pending motions and setting pre-trial deadlines. By 3/2/16, the parties shall: (1) file reports setting forth the agreed deadlines for the remainder of their cases; and (2) notify the Court of their plans regarding mediation. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/18/2016. (SEJ) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY. Proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2016. Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop. (MD) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER. The Court directs the Clerk to terminate Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense and to Dismiss Counterclaims 19 , pursuant to the Joint Response to Order of October 23, 2015 46 , in which Plaintiff agreed to withdraw that motion upon the filing of Defendant's amended pleading, and the subsequently filed Amended Answer 48 . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/4/2015. (SEJ) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None *Order pdf
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant will file its reply no later than 10/26/15. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 10/19/2015. (SEJ) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 37 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff may file a reply to 34 motion to appear pro hac vice and 35 motion to appear pro hac vice on or before 10/23/2015. The reply shall not exceed five pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/13/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 30 Unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall have up to and including 9/18/2015 to file a response to 19 motion to strike affirmative defense and dismiss counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/16/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Extend Time
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 28 Unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall have up to and including 9/15/2015 to file a response to 19 motion to strike affirmative defenses and dismiss counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/14/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Case Management Report
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Case Management Report. The parties shall have up to and including 9/7/2015 to submit their Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/3/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 21 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting 22 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Messrs. Griffin and Vecchione have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/2/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting 13 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Messrs. Elliott and Davis have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/27/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before 8/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/16/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Case reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. New case number: 3:15cv746-J-32MCR. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (AET) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order reassigning case to another judge w/in division
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Mr. Bumgardner has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/26/2015. (MEH) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE: Based upon the parties' filings, the Court is satisfied of the existence of subject matter jurisdiction over this action. (MHM) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued as to Birch Communications, Inc.. (CKS) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Birch Communications, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX16654) filed by Patent Asset Licensing, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(CKS) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?