Vega v. USAir, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:94-cv-01917
District Judge Alfred V. Covello, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leslie Vega, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Donald Nolan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Nolan

Toggle Switch Represented by gansandreynolds.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Myrna E. Gans +1 866 668 8396 +1 203 331 8929 dgans@gansandreynolds.com
v.
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Boeing Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis H. Morrison, III +1 860 275 8100 +1 860 275 8101 fmorrison@axinn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica J. Mitchell +1 860 275 0100

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Elliott +1 860 275 0100 +1 860 275 0343 djelliott@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Duplan Campbell +1 206 359 8414 +1 206 359 9000 bcampbell@perkinscoie.com
No Logo HANNIFIN CORP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANK A. SILANE +1 310 557 2030 + 310 557 1299 fsilane@condonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall Seth Turner +1 212 490 9100 +1 212 370 4453 mturner@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siegel, O'Connor, O'Donnell & Beck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George J. Kelly, Jr. +1 860 727 8900 +1 860 527 5131 gkelly@siegeloconnor.com
No Logo Usair Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo U S Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry B. Goddard, Jr. +1 202 965 6100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dane B Jaques +1 703 336 8709 +1 703 336 8750 djaques@dglitigators.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. McKinnon +1 202 965 6100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Warren Ryan, III +1 703 336 8800 +1 703 336 8750 cryan@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brock Thomas Dubin +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 bdubin@ddnctlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Brandi Leiby, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Riscassi & Davis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Everett Howard Madin +1 860 522 1196 +1 860 246 5847 smadin@riscassidavis.com
No Logo Edwin Vega, Jr., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Riscassi & Davis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Everett Howard Madin +1 860 522 1196 +1 860 246 5847 smadin@riscassidavis.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 315 - Personal Injury: Airplane Product Liability
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None
Clerk's disbursement of funds in the amount of $ 3,273,333.34 to Estate of Edwin Vega c/o First Union National Bank pursuant to [56-1] order dated 04/25/01 (Carfora, C.) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None
    Clerk's disbursement of funds in the amount of $ 700,000.00 to Gans & Reynolds pursuant to [56-1] order dated 04/25/01 (Carfora, C.) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None
      Clerk's disbursement of funds in the amount of $ 35,000.00 to Leslie Vega pursuant to [56-1] order dated 04/25/01 (Carfora, C.) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None
        Clerk's disbursement of funds in the amount of $ 66,666.66 to Kemper Insurance Company c/o Atty Andrew Hern pursuant to [56-1] order dated 04/25/01 (Carfora, C.) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None
          Clerk's disbursement of funds in the amount of $ 90,000.00 to Flight 427 PSC Attorney's Fee Fund c/o Atty. Jay Feldstein pursuant to [56-1] order dated 04/25/01 (Carfora, C.) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None
            Clerk's disbursement of funds in the amount of $ 85,000.00 to PSC Expense Fund c/o Atty Jay H. Feldstein pursuant to [56-1] order dated 04/25/01 (Carfora, C.) (Entered: 04/27/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
              Cash BOND in the amount of $ 4,250,000.00 per Judge Covello verbal order during conference Receipt # H003132 by USAir, Inc. (Carpenter, M.) (Entered: 04/25/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Boeing Co. -- David J. Elliott (Blue,A.) (Entered: 04/17/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: None
                  Status Conference held ( AVC) (Wiggins, M.) Modified on 04/17/2001 (Entered: 04/17/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: None
                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for USAir, Inc. -- Brock Thomas Dubin (Blue,A.) (Entered: 04/16/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: None
                      REPLY by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby to response to [59-1] motion to Intervene (Blue,A.) (Entered: 04/10/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: None
                        JOINDER & OBJECTION by Hannifin Corp to [63-1] motion for Contempt, [63-2] motion for Sanctions by Leslie Vega (2 of 2 parts) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 04/10/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: None
                          MOTION by Boeing Co. for Reconsideration of [56-1] order dated 3/15/01 re: [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (Brief Due 4/25/01 ) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 04/10/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM by USAir, Inc. in opposition to [63-1] motion for Contempt by Leslie Vega, [63-2] motion for Sanctions by Leslie Vega (Walker, J.) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM by Boeing Co. in support of [73-1] objection to [63-1] motion for Contempt, [63-2] motion for Sanctions (Former Employee) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: None
                                Objection to [63-1] Motion for Comtempt and [63-2] for sanctions by Leslie Vega & MOTION by Boeing Co. to Vacate [56-1] order [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds by Leslie Vega (part 2 of 2) (Brief Due 4/25/01 ) (Former Employee) Modified on 04/05/2001 (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM by Leslie Vega in opposition to [61-1] motion for Reconsideration of [56-1] order dated 3/15/01 re: [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds by Brandi Leiby, Edwin Vega Jr. (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM by Leslie Vega in opposition to [59-1] motion to Intervene by Brandi Leiby, Edwin Vega Jr. (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM by USAir Group, Inc. in support of [69-1] objection re: [63-1] motion for Contempt, [63-2] motion for Sanctions (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/27/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None
                                        OBJECTION & MOTION by Boeing Co. to Vacate [56-1] order [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds by Leslie Vega (Brief Due 4/16/01 ) (2 of 2 parts) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/27/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None
                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by USAir, Inc. in support of [65-1] motion for Reconsideration of [56-1] order dated 3/15/01 re: [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/27/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by Boeing Co. for Joinder of USAirways Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting the Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement & to Compel Payment of Settlement Funds (Brief Due 4/16/01 ) (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM by USAir, Inc. in support of [65-1] motion for Reconsideration of [56-1] order dated 3/15/01 re: [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                MOTION by USAir, Inc. for Reconsideration of [56-1] order dated 3/15/01 re: [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (Brief Due 4/13/01 ) (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM by Leslie Vega in support of [63-1] motion for Contempt, & [63-2] motion for Sanctions (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by Leslie Vega for Contempt , & for Sanctions (Brief Due 4/12/01 ) (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 03/23/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby in support of [61-1] motion for Reconsideration of [56-1] order dated 3/15/01 re: [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/22/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby for Reconsideration of [56-1] order dated 3/15/01 re: [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (Brief Due 4/12/01 ) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/22/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby -- Everett Howard Madin (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/22/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby to Intervene (Brief Due 4/10/01 ) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby for Robert Guilford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                OBJECTIONS by Boeing Co. to [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Grady, B.) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, granting [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds ( signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby for Robert E. Guilford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/15/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby in opposition to [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Leslie Vega (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/14/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of RobertE. Guilford by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby Re [51-1] motion for Robert E. Guilford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandi Leiby, Edwin Vega Jr. (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Everett H. Madin by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby Re [51-1] motion for Robert E. Guilford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brandi Leiby, Edwin Vega Jr. (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION by Edwin Vega Jr., Brandi Leiby for Robert E. Guilford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/13/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              Document returned to filer for failure to comply with rules - see endorsement this date (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 03/16/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY by Leslie Vega to response to [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (Blue,A.) (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE by USAir Group, Inc., USAir, Inc. to [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Leslie Vega, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds by Leslie Vega (Wiggins, M.) (Entered: 02/22/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION & MEMORANDUM by Leslie Vega in support of [47-1] motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, [47-2] motion to Compel payment of settlement funds (2 of 2 parts) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 02/21/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      JUDGMENT re: reported settled ( signed by Clerk ) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 01/23/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION by Leslie Vega to Extend Time to 1/22/01 to submit closing documents (Sprong, R.) (Entered: 12/26/2000)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE to Counsel Regarding Rule 16(b) Settlement. Case reported settled on 11/22/00 Dismissal due 12/22/00 ( Signed by Clerk ) (Wiggins, M.) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY by Leslie Vega to response to [27-1] motion for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint re: Parker-Hannifin Corp. by Leslie Vega (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/26/2000)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY by Leslie Vega to response to [27-1] motion for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint re: USAIRWAYS, Inc. by Leslie Vega (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/26/2000)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY by Leslie Vega to response to [27-1] motion for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint re: Boeing Co.by Leslie Vega (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/26/2000)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION by Leslie Vega to Extend Time to 10/26/00 to file a brief in further support of amended complaint (Montgomery, C.) (Entered: 10/19/2000)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION by USAir, Inc. for Charles Ryan III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/11/2000)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Boeing Co. in opposition to [27-1] motion for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint by Leslie Vega (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/06/2000)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Hannifin Corp to [27-1] motion for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint by Leslie Vega (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/06/2000)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USAir, Inc. to [27-1] motion for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint by Leslie Vega (Blue,A.) (Entered: 10/05/2000)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USAir, Inc. of appearances docs. 31-34 (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 10/03/2000)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for USAir, Inc. -- Mark A. Dombroff (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 10/03/2000)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for USAir, Inc. -- Dane B. Jacques (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 10/03/2000)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE of Attorney for USAir, Inc. -- Mark E. McKinnon (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 10/03/2000)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE of Attorney for USAir, Inc. -- Henry B. Goddard, Jr. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 10/03/2000)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by Hannifin Corp to Modify [25-1] motion for Scheduling Order by Leslie Vega (Brief Due 10/19/00 ) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 09/28/2000)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE of Attorney for Boeing Co. -- Jessica J. Mitchell (Blue,A.) (Entered: 09/18/2000)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Leslie Vega in support of [27-1] motion for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 09/01/2000)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION by Leslie Vega for Leave to File 4th amended [1-1] complaint (Brief Due 9/21/00 ) (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 09/01/2000)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to file 4th Amended Complaint & Memorandum in Support by Leslie Vega (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 08/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION by Leslie Vega for Scheduling Order (Brief Due 9/18/00 ) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/28/2000)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Settlement Conference held ( TPS) (Former Employee) (Entered: 08/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USAir, Inc. for Mark Dombrofe, Henry B. Goddard Jr., Dane B. Jaques & Mark E. McKinnon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 08/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Boeing Co. -- Bruce D. Campbell (Blue,A.) (Entered: 07/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Letter MOTION by Boeing Co., USAir Group, Inc., USAir, Inc., Hannifin Corp to Vacate the pretrial order pending a settlement conference (Brief Due 8/1/00 ) (Montgomery, C.) (Entered: 07/12/2000)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE of Attorney for Hannifin Corp -- Marshall S. Turner (Blue,A.) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER of referral to Mag. Judge Thomas P. Smith for settlement conference (signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Blue,A.) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for Leslie Vega -- Donald J. Nolan (Warren, C.) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE of Attorney for Hannifin Corp -- George J. Kelly, Jr. (Warren, C.) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference held ( AVC) (Wiggins, M.) (Entered: 06/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL ORDER setting Filing of Trial Memorandum by 7/26/00 ( signed by Chief Judge Alfred V. Covello ) (Wiggins, M.) Modified on 06/27/2000 (Entered: 06/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Bruce D. Campbell by Boeing Co. Re [13-1] motion for Bruce D. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 06/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Boeing Co. for Bruce D. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 06/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Hannifin Corp for Frank A. Silane & Marshall S. Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Blue,A.) (Entered: 06/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Leslie Vega for Donald Nolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Former Employee) (Entered: 06/02/2000)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE of Attorney for USAir, Inc. -- Patrick M. Noonan, Mark A. Dombroff (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 12/14/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                COMBINED ANSWER to Complaint by USAir, Inc., USAir Group, Inc. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 12/14/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by USAir Group, Inc. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 12/14/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint by Boeing Co. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 12/13/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE of Attorney for Boeing Co. -- Francis H. Morrison III (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 12/13/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed on 11/22/94 as to USAir Group, Inc. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 12/12/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed on 11/22/94 as to USAir, Inc. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 12/12/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed on 11/22/94 as to Boeing Co. (D'Onofrio, B.) (Entered: 12/12/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on Pretrial Deadlines handed to counsel. Discovery cutoff 5/16/95 ; Dispositive Motions due 6/22/95 Amended Pleadings due 01/24/95 Motions to Dismiss due 02/24/95 (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 11/14/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT w/ Jury Trial Demand, filed. Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 132921 (Lopez, B.) (Entered: 11/14/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?