Kennedy v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00592-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Kennedy, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 3/1/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $1000
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Tort Claim
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Wicomico
Terminated 7/6/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING the case pursuant to Local Rule 111, either party may, for good cause, move to reopen the case within 30 days if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 7/5/00 ) (c/m & microfilmed 7/7/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Correspondence
    CORRESPONDENCE by United States regarding settlement. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Rule
        Rule 12/56 letter mailed to parties. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION by United States to Dismiss (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER (Marginal) "granting" [8-1] second motion of Defendant to Extend Time to file an answer or other appropriate response for three (3) days; and "directing" Defendant shall have until June 28, 2000 to file an answer or response; and resetting Answer deadline to 6/28/00 for United States . ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 6/8/00 ) (c/m 6/12/00 cmh) (For Pleading #9 - See Pleading #8) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000, Terminated: 6/12/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              SECOND MOTION by Defendant United States to Extend Time to file an answer or other appropriate response for three (3) days . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER "granting" [6-1] motion of Defendant to Extend Time to File an Answer or Other Appropriate Response For Thirty (30) Days reset Answer deadline to 6/7/00 for United States . ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 5/18/00 ) (c/m 5/23/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000, Terminated: 5/19/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION by Defendant United States of America to Extend Time to File an Answer or Other Appropriate Response For Thirty (30) Days . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000 Response
                    RESPONSE by United States to [4-1] order of 3/7/00 regarding service on defendant (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 3/4/00 ) "requiring" Plaintiff to inform this Court of any change of address during the pendency of this action; "directing" Clerk to mail copies or to otherwise withhold service as to the Defendants; and "directing" Defendant to answer Plaintiff's complaint, as therein set forth. (c/m 3/8/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER "granting" [2-1] motion of Plaintiff for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 3/4/00 ) (c/m 3/8/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000, Terminated: 3/7/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                          MOTION by Michael Kennedy to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1-14 filed; (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 54 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?