Nelson v. United States, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00613-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Virginia Lois Nelson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Henault and Sysko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emile J Henault, Jr +1 410 768 9300 +1 410 553 0498
v.
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Defense"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Michael A DiPietro +1 410 209 4816 +1 410 962 9947 michael.dipietro@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gwendolyn C. Hoyt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Michael A DiPietro +1 410 209 4816 +1 410 962 9947 michael.dipietro@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Michael A DiPietro +1 410 209 4816 +1 410 962 9947 michael.dipietro@usdoj.gov
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Michael A DiPietro +1 410 209 4816 +1 410 962 9947 michael.dipietro@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Michael A DiPietro +1 410 209 4816 +1 410 962 9947 michael.dipietro@usdoj.gov
No Logo William Hamill, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Michael A DiPietro +1 410 209 4816 +1 410 962 9947 michael.dipietro@usdoj.gov
No Logo William S. Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Michael A DiPietro +1 410 209 4816 +1 410 962 9947 michael.dipietro@usdoj.gov
Office Baltimore
Filed 3/2/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Tort Claim
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 10/26/2000
Origin 4
Reopened 8/22/2000
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTED Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/26/00 ) (c/i 10/26/00) (MICROFILMED 10/26/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/26/00 ) (c/i 10/26/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by United States, William S. Cohen to Plaintiff's Opposition to their [4-1] motion to Dismiss and Exhibits 1-2,A-C. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING [17-1] motion of Defendants for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion to Dismiss to 10/9/00. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 9/8/00 ) (c/i 9/8/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000, Terminated: 9/8/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
            UNOPPOSED MOTION by United States, William S. Cohen, et al for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion to Dismiss . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000, Terminated: 10/26/2000 Response in Opposition
              RESPONSE by Virginia Lois Nelson in opposition to [4-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants; Memorandum and Exhibits 47-48. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Gwendolyn C. Hoyt 7/17/00 Answer due on 9/17/00 for Gwendolyn C. Hoyt (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to William Hamill 5/13/00 Answer due on 7/13/00 for William Hamill (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to United States, William S. Cohen, Department Defense, National Security, Michael V. Hayden 3/21/00 Answer due on 5/21/00 for United States, for William S. Cohen, for Department Defense, for National Security, for Michael V. Hayden (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER WITHDRAWING the Memorandum and Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss entered on 8/16/00 as having been improvidently entered. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 8/22/00 ) (c/i 8/22/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Case Reopened
                        Case reopened (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000, Terminated: 8/22/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION by Virginia Lois Nelson to Rescind the Court's Order and Memorandum of 8/16/00 . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER GRANTING [4-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss and DISMISSING with prejudice. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 8/16/00 ) (c/m 8/16/00-mec) (MICROFILMED 8/16/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                              MEMORANDUM ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 8/16/00 ) (c/m 8/16/00-mec) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Terminated Case
                                Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING [7-1] motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to Answer, Move or otherwise plead to Motion to Dismiss to 8/28/00. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/13/00 ) (c/i 7/13/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000, Terminated: 7/13/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by Virginia Lois Nelson to Extend Time to Answer, Move or otherwise plead to Motion to Dismiss . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER GRANTING [5-1] motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Plead in Answer to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to 7/17/00. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 6/12/00 ) (c/i 6/12/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000, Terminated: 6/12/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by Virginia Lois Nelson to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise Plead in Answer to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000, Terminated: 8/16/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by United States, William S. Cohen, Department Defense, National Security, Gwendolyn C. Hoyt, William Hamill, Michael V. Hayden to Dismiss and Attachments 1-7,A-B (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Local Rule
                                            Local Rule 103.3 Certification by Virginia Lois Nelson. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000 Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued 60 days for United States, William S. Cohen, Michael V. Hayden, Department Defense, National Security, Gwendolyn C. Hoyt, William Hamill (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/3/2000 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1-46 filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1164834 (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/03/2000
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?