Wilder et al v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-08953
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2018 at 1:03 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Free Network Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Korenbaum +1 212 587 0018
No Logo Isaac Wilder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Korenbaum +1 212 587 0018
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John Doherty, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his individual capacity as former Sanitation Department Commissioner Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his individual capacity as former Mayor of the City of New York Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his individual capacity as former Police Department Commissioner Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), plaintiff Free Network Foundation hereby dismisses this action and its claims, with prejudice, as against all defendants that are or could be named, their successors or assigns, and any entity represented by the herein named defendants from all claims for attorneys' fees, costs or disbursements that were or could have been alleged in the instant action; it is further stipulated and agreed, that the action by Isaac Wilder shall remain ongoing. SO ORDERED. Free Network Foundation terminated., Case reopened. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/12/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Settlement and proposed order of dismissal. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: The parties having notified the Court that they have reached a resolution of this action, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned action be, and the same hereby is, discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, counsel for either side may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned if the settlement is not effected, in which event the action will be restored. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/27/2015) (kko) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 15 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq. dated June 22, 2015 re: request to adjourn the June 29, 2015, settlement conference. Document filed by Free Network Foundation, Isaac Wilder. ENDORSEMENT: Settlement conference adjourned to July 23, 2015, at 2:30 p.m. Submissions due July 17, 2015. So Ordered. (Settlement Conference set for 7/23/2015 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/22/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq. dated June 22, 2015 re: request to adjourn the June 29, 2015, settlement conference. Document filed by Free Network Foundation, Isaac Wilder.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Scott A. Korenbaum dated 5/11/2015 re: Adjournment of the Settlement Conference. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Submissions due June 23. SO ORDERED. (Settlement Conference set for 6/29/2015 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/11/2015) (kl) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for May 22, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6-B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, and as further set forth. (Settlement Conference set for 5/22/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/6/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The date by which plaintiff will supply its pre-trial order matters to defendants; Pre-trial order to be supplied by plaintiff by November 27, 2015, or 30 days after a ruling on any Motion for Summary Judgment (or 9/17 if no expert). The date by which the parties will submit a pre-trial order in a form conforming with the Court's instructions together with trial briefs and either 1) proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law for a non-jury trial, or 2) proposed voir dire questions and proposed jury instructions for a jury trial; either 10/1 or 12/11. Anticipated length of trial and whether to court of jury; 3-4 day Jury trial. Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2015. Expert Discovery due by 11/13/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/4/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/4/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 9 Letter filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Request denied. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/2/2015) (tro) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Andrew Lucas dated 3/2/15 re: request to adjourn 3/4/15 conference on consent. Document filed by City of New York.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joseph Lucas on behalf of Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 5 Letter request regarding an adjournment of the February 3, 2015, Initial Rule 16 Conference, filed by Free Network Foundation, Isaac Wilder. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' request is granted. The conference is adjourned to March 4, 2015 at 4:30 pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/30/2015) (kl) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Scott A. Korenbaum, Esq. dated January 30, 2015 re: Adjournment of February 3, 2015 Rule 16 Conference. Document filed by Free Network Foundation, Isaac Wilder.(Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, Courtroom 15C, on February 3, 2015 at 4:30 p.m., for an initial pretrial conference. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/3/2015 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/12/2015) (ama) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 1/7/2015, answer due 1/28/2015. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck, Service Window Clerk. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Isaac Wilder; Free Network Foundation. (Korenbaum, Scott) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, John Doherty, Raymond Kelly. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401109614)Document filed by Isaac Wilder, Free Network Foundation.(cde) (lcu). (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (cde) (lcu). (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 110 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?