Allen v. Opus 360 Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-03394
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bruce Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Ari Horowitz, Defendant
No Logo Barry Rubinstein, Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Compucom Systems Inc., Defendant
No Logo E*Offering Corp., Defendant
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Irwin Lieber, Defendant
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Officer/Director, Goodrich Petroleum Corp
Officer/Director, Peloton Resources Inc
No Logo James Cannavino, Defendant
No Logo John Halvey, Defendant
No Logo John L. Drew, Defendant
No Logo Opus360 Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Richard McCann, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD MILLER, Defendant
No Logo Roger J. Weiss, Defendant
No Logo Safeguard Scientifics, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Compucom Systems Inc.
Officer/Director, Tengion, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nupathe, Inc.
No Logo William Nuti, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Allen, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Clifford Young, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Dewey Yesner, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bernard M Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Deborah R. Gross +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 debbie@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo G. Raymond Doucet, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Maria E Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Jonathan Adenuga, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Larry Blisko, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Russ Bissonnette, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Maria E Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Gerald Levy +1 212 561 5896 +1 212 631 1150 levylevylaw@aol.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUNDS. THIS DOCUMENT RELATED TO ALL ACTIONS. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/5/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-02938-JGK-JCF,1:01-cv-03394-JGK,1:01-cv-03482-JGK,1:01-cv-03547-JGK,1:01-cv-03581-JGK, 1:01-cv-03602-JGK,1:01-cv-03947-JGK,1:01-cv-04070-JGK,1:01-cv-04100-JGK,1:01-cv-05426-JGK, 1:01-cv-05488-JGK(jsa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, that a judgment having been entered in the lead action 01cv2938(JGK) on 10/15/03, the Clerk is directed to close the related case numbers [01cv3394(JGK), 01cv3482(JGK), 01cv3581(JGK), 01cv3602(JGK), 01cv3947(JGK), 01cv4070(JGK), 01cv4100(JGK), 01cv5426(JGK), 01cv5488(JGK)] from the active docket of the Court. ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ) (tp) Modified on 11/04/2003 (Entered: 11/04/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge John G. Koeltl . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Andrei V. Rado, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman . (dle) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
        Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 02/26/2002 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to E-Offering Corp. by Lloyd Feller on 5/14/01 . Answer due on 6/4/01 for E-Offering Corp. . (djc) (Entered: 07/11/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
            Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge John G. Koeltl . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Andrei V. Rado, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman . (gmo) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time within which defts may respond to the complaint ; reset answer due for 7/30/01 for Compucom Systems, for Safeguard, Inc., for E-Offering Corp., for J.P. Morgan Inc., for Bear Stearns & Co., for Fleet Robertson, for Roger J. Weiss, for Barry Rubinstein, for William Nuti, for Irwin Lieber, for John Halvey, for John L. Drew, for James Cannavino, for Richard Miller, for Richard McCann, for Ari Horowitz, for Opus 360 Corporation . ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum ) (kg) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 06/01/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Andrei V. Rado, Samuel H. Rudman, Steven G. Schulman. (tp) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                  INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: a pretrial conference will be held at 4:15 on 6/12/01, in courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, NY, NY. ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz ) (kg) (Entered: 04/30/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: None
                    CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 404053. (db) (Entered: 04/24/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 169 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?