Blisko v. Opus 360 Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-04070
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 4:21 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Larry Blisko, Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
On Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
v.
No Logo Ari Horowitz, Defendant
No Logo Barry Rubinstein, Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Compucom Systems Inc., Defendant

Represented by Quinn McCabe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Simon Block +1 212 447 5500 +1 212 889 2981 sblock@qmlegal.com
No Logo E-Offering Corp., Defendant
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Irwin Lieber, Defendant
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Officer/Director, Goodrich Petroleum Corp
Officer/Director, Peloton Resources Inc
No Logo James Cannavino, Defendant
No Logo John Halvey, Defendant

Represented by Quinn McCabe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Simon Block +1 212 447 5500 +1 212 889 2981 sblock@qmlegal.com
No Logo John L. Drew, Defendant
No Logo Opus360 Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Richard McCann, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD MILLER, Defendant
No Logo Roger J. Weiss, Defendant
No Logo Safeguard Scientifics, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Compucom Systems Inc.
Officer/Director, Tengion, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nupathe, Inc.

Represented by Quinn McCabe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Simon Block +1 212 447 5500 +1 212 889 2981 sblock@qmlegal.com
No Logo William Nuti, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUNDS. THIS DOCUMENT RELATED TO ALL ACTIONS. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/5/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-02938-JGK-JCF,1:01-cv-03394-JGK,1:01-cv-03482-JGK,1:01-cv-03547-JGK,1:01-cv-03581-JGK, 1:01-cv-03602-JGK,1:01-cv-03947-JGK,1:01-cv-04070-JGK,1:01-cv-04100-JGK,1:01-cv-05426-JGK, 1:01-cv-05488-JGK(jsa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
    Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge John G. Koeltl . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Simon Block, Mel E. Lifshitz . (dle) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 11/13/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
        Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge John G. Koeltl . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Simon Block, Mel E. Lifshitz . (gmo) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION and ORDER, the time for defts Safeguard Scientifics, Compu Com, and John Halvey to answer the Complaint is hereby extended to and including 30 days after the later of: (1) the appointment by the Court of the lead plntf; the approval of the Court of counsel to represent the putative class; and the filing and service of a consolidated complaint ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum ) (cd) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Safeguard, Compucom Systems, John Halvey by Simon Block. Received in night deposit on 5/29/01 at 4:59 p.m. (kkc) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time within which defts may respond to the complaint ; reset answer due for 7/30/01 for Compucom Systems, for Safeguard, for E-Offering Corp., for J.P. Morgan, for Bear Stearns & Co., for Fleet Boston, for Roger J. Weiss, for Barry Rubinstein, for William Nuti, for Irwin Lieber, for John Halvey, for John L. Drew, for James Cannavino, for Richard Miller, for Richard McCann, for Ari Horowitz, for Opus 360 Corporation . ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum ) (kg) (Entered: 05/30/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) record: Mel E. Lifshitz. (db) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None
                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 405687. (jco) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 132 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?