Opus360 Corp. Sec., et al v. , et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02938
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 5:57 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Charles Bland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosen Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY LAURENCE M. ROSEN +1 973 313 1887 +1 212 202 3827 lrosen@rosenlegal.com
v.
No Logo Ari Horowitz, Defendant
No Logo Barry Rubenstein, Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Cashman, Defendant
No Logo Compucom Systems Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William K Dodds +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 william.dodds@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn McCabe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Simon Block +1 212 447 5500 +1 212 889 2981 sblock@qmlegal.com
No Logo E-Offering Corp., Defendant
No Logo Irwin Lieber, Defendant
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Officer/Director, Goodrich Petroleum Corp
Officer/Director, Peloton Resources Inc
No Logo James Cannavino, Defendant
No Logo John Drew, Defendant
No Logo John Halvey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY William K Dodds +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 william.dodds@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Eli Nachman +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 david.nachman@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andre K. Cizmarik +1 212 308 4411 +Pleaseu sea validnu acizmarik@eapdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn McCabe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/08/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Simon Block +1 212 447 5500 +1 212 889 2981 sblock@qmlegal.com
No Logo Opus360 Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Richard McCann, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD MILLER, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Roger Weiss, Defendant
No Logo Safeguard Scientifics, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Compucom Systems Inc.
Officer/Director, Tengion, Inc.
Officer/Director, Nupathe, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William K Dodds +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 william.dodds@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn McCabe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Simon Block +1 212 447 5500 +1 212 889 2981 sblock@qmlegal.com
No Logo William Nuti, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Allen, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Clifford Young, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Dewey Yesner, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bernard M Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Deborah R. Gross +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 debbie@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo G. Raymond Doucet, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Maria E Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Jonathan Adenuga, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Larry Blisko, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Michael Silverman, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Maria E Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230
No Logo Peter Gianoukas, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara A Podell +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 bpodell@bm.net
No Logo Rachel Silverman, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Maria E Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230
No Logo Raymond Litwin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Robert Bean, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Russ Bissonnette, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Maria E Perez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Gerald Levy +1 212 561 5896 +1 212 631 1150 levylevylaw@aol.com
No Logo The Steinberg Family Partnership, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUNDS. THIS DOCUMENT RELATED TO ALL ACTIONS. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/5/2004) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-02938-JGK-JCF,1:01-cv-03394-JGK,1:01-cv-03482-JGK,1:01-cv-03547-JGK,1:01-cv-03581-JGK, 1:01-cv-03602-JGK,1:01-cv-03947-JGK,1:01-cv-04070-JGK,1:01-cv-04100-JGK,1:01-cv-05426-JGK, 1:01-cv-05488-JGK(jsa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
    AFFIDAVIT of Francisco R Garzon in Support re: 78 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Disbursement of Funds. Document filed by Jonathan Adenuga, Bruce Allen, Robert Bean, Russ Bissonnette, Charles Bland, Larry Blisko, G. Raymond Doucet, Peter Gianoukas, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman, Rachel Silverman, The Steinberg Family Partnership, Dewey Yesner, Clifford Young. (ps, ) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Laurence Rosen in Support re: 78 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Disbursement of Funds.. Document filed by Jonathan Adenuga, Bruce Allen, Robert Bean, Russ Bissonnette, Charles Bland, Larry Blisko, G. Raymond Doucet, Peter Gianoukas, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman, Rachel Silverman, The Steinberg Family Partnership, Dewey Yesner, Clifford Young. (ps, ) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
        MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Disbursement of Class Settlment Fund. Document filed by Jonathan Adenuga, Bruce Allen, Robert Bean, Russ Bissonnette, Charles Bland, Larry Blisko, G. Raymond Doucet, Peter Gianoukas, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman, Rachel Silverman, The Steinberg Family Partnership, Dewey Yesner, Clifford Young. (ps, ) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Address by Laurence Matthew Rosen on behalf of Charles Bland. New Address: The Rosen Laws Firm P.A., P.C., 350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5508, New York, NY, 10118, 212-686-1060. (djc, ) (Entered: 02/19/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT. For the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated October 13, 2003, the final settlement in this action is approved and the pending motion to dismiss is denied as moot; accordingly, the case is closed; (signed by J. Michael McMahon, Clerk of the Court); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 10/23/03. (djc) (Entered: 10/23/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, that purs to and in accordance with the requirements of Rule 23, the Settlement as set forth in the Stipulation is approved as fair, reasonable and adequate, and in the best interest of the Class, as further set forth in this document. The action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs as against the OPUS360 defts, the Underwriter defts, Carlos Cashman, Safeguard Scientifics, CompusCom Systems, Admiral, Artemis, Artemis Management Systems, Proha, and each of their past or present subsidiaries, as further set forth in this document ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 10/17/03. (cd) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER, that the Court having approved the final settlement of this action, the pending [57-1] motion to dismiss is denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to enter the Final Judgment and to close this case on the active docket of the Court . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); Forwarded document to Judgment Clerk. (tp) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Laurence Rosen in support of proposed class settlement and plaintiffs' counsels' joint petition for fees and reimbursement of expenses. (jco) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles Bland in support of [71-1] motion for an Order finally approving the class action settlement and entering final judgment in this styled class action, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 23. (jco) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Charles Bland; for an Order finally approving the class action settlement and entering final judgment in this styled class action, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 23 . Return Date not indicated. Proposed Order attached. (jco) Modified on 09/23/2003 (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Koeltl from Laurence M. Rosen, dated 7/30/03: Granting the extension of the motion hearing deadline for final approval of the Class action settlement in this action for 4:30 p.m. 10/10/03 . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ). (tp) (Entered: 08/06/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of change of address by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman . (yv) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                            PRELIMINARY ORDER IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS , for the purposes of effectuating the Settlement only, a plaintiff class is hereby certified pursuant to FRCP 23(a) and (b)(3) consisting of all persons or entities that acquired one or more shares of OPUS360 common stock during the period from 4/7/00 through 3/20/01, inclusive , the Settlement as set forth in the Stipulation is preliminarily approved for the purpose of sending Notice to the Class , a hearing pursuant to FRCP 23(e) is hereby scheduled to be held before the Court on 9/25/03 at 4:30 p.m. for the purposes further set forth in this Order , the Court approves the form, substance and requirements of the Notice of Pendency of Class Action, Class Certification Proposed Settlement, Settlement Fairness Hearing and Right to Share in Settlement Fund, the Summary Notice and the Proof of Claim and Release form , plaintiffs' counsel are hereby authorized to retain FRG Information Systems Corp. to supervise and administer the notice procedure as well as the processing of claims as more fully set forth in this Order . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); (yv) (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Koeltl from Claude M. Millman, dated 5/29/03: Granting defendants' request for extension of time to submit their reply brief in support of their [57-1,2] motion to dismiss until 6/6/03 . ( by Judge John G. Koeltl ). (tp) (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Koeltl from Chaude M. Millman, dated 5/8/03; dft's reply to response to motion reset for 5/30/03 re: [57-1] motion dismissing the second consolidated amended class action complaint, for 5/30/03 re: [57-2] motion awarding costs and attorney's fees . ( signed by Judge G. Koeltl ); (pl) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Koeltl from Claude M. Millman, dated 4/24/03; Counsel for defendant writes to request that the due date for defendants' reply brief be adjourned to enable the parties to submit the settlement. Time to file reply brief extneded to 5/12/03. So Ordered . signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ) (jco) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Koeltl from Claude M. Millman, dated 4/2/03: Time to submit reply brief extended to 4/25/03 . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ). (tp) (Entered: 04/18/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Koeltl from Andre K. Cizmarik, dated 2/26/03: Defendant Opus360 Corp.'s time to file the reply brief is extended to 4/4/03 . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ). (tp) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Memorandum to Docket Clerk: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/26/03 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV .. (yv) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None
                                          Plaintiffs and the Class' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in opposition to [57-1] motion dismissing the second consolidated amended class action complaint. (djc) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 3; the time withing which pltffs shall serve their answering papers by 2/12/03 re: [57-1] motion dismissing the second consolidated amended class action complaint ; the time within which defts shall serve their reply papers is hereby extended until 3 weeks after the date of the settlement conference with Mag. Judge Francis. ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ) (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              CONSENT ORDER; that Solomon, Zauderer, Ellenhorn, Frischer & Sharp be substituted in the place and stead of Dechert as attorneys of record for defendant John Halvey . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); (jco) Modified on 01/14/2003 (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ari Horowitz, Richard McCann, Richard Miller, Carlos Cashman, James Cannavino, John Drew, John Halvey, Irwin Lieber, William Nuti, Barry Rubenstein, Roger Weiss, Bear Stearns & Co., J.P. Morgan, E-Offering Corp. in support of their motion to dismss the second consolidated amended class action complaint; (djc) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Opus 360 Corporation, Ari Horowitz, Richard McCann, Richard Miller, James Cannavino, John Drew, John Halvey, Irwin Lieber, William Nuti, Barry Rubenstein, Roger Weiss dismissing the second consolidated amended class action complaint ; awarding costs and attorney's fees ; Return Date not indicated; Attached is Affidavit of Andre K. Cizmark in support (djc) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER NO. 2, the time within which defendants shall answer or move with respect to the second consolidated amended class action complaint is hereby extended until 12/31/02 for FleetBoston, for Compucom Systems, for Safeguard, for E-Offering Corp., for J.P. Morgan, for Bear Stearns & Co., for Roger Weiss, for Barry Rubenstein, for William Nuti, Irwin Lieber, for John Halvey, for John Drew, for James Cannavino, for Carlos Cashman, for Richard Miller, for Richard McCann, for Ari Horowitz, for Opus360 Corporation , in the event that defendants move with respect to the complaint, plaintiffs shall serve their responsive papers by 1/31/03 and defendants shall serve reply papers, if any by 2/21/03 . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ) Copy faxed to counsel for defendants on 11/12/02 by Chambers. (yv) (Entered: 11/22/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles Bland (Answer due 11/12/02 for FleetBoston, for Compucom Systems, for Safeguard, for E-Offering Corp., for J.P. Morgan, for Bear Stearns & Co., for Roger Weiss, for Barry Rubenstein, for William Nuti, for Irwin Lieber, for John Halvey, for John Drew, for James Cannavino, for Carlos Cashman, for Richard Miller, for Richard McCann, for Ari Horowitz, for Opus360 Corporation ) amending [1-1] complaint . Summons issued. (yv) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        OPINION AND ORDER #87521, OPUS' motion to dismiss the sec. 12(a)(2) claims is denied. The Selling Shareholders' motion to dismiss is granted w/ respect to both the sec. 11 and sec. 12(a)(2) claims. Finally, the Underwriters' motion to dismiss the sec. 12(a)(2) claims is denied as moot . The plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint w/in 30 days . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); Copies Mailed by Chambers. (ae) (Entered: 10/09/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge John G. Koeltl for the date(s) of 1/18/02. (laq) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER; the law firm of Berger & Montague, P.C. is substituted for the dissolved law firm of Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan,P.C. as counsel for Lead Plaintiff Peter Gianoukas and as one of the co-lead counsel in this action ; ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 04/24/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER; granting [48-1] motion for an order permitting lead plaintiff to substitute the now dissolved Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan, P.C. with Berger & Montague, P.C. as his cousel . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); Copies mailed. (pl) Modified on 03/25/2002 (Entered: 03/25/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Peter Gianoukas by Peter Gianoukas in support Re: [48-1] motion for an order permitting lead plaintiff to substitute the now dissolved Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan, P.C. with Berger & Montague, P.C. as his cousel . (db) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Peter Gianoukas in support of [48-1] motion for an order permitting lead plaintiff to substitute the now dissolved Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan, P.C. with Berger & Montague, P.C. as his cousel . (db) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE) by Peter Gianoukas for an order permitting lead plaintiff to substitute the now dissolved Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan, P.C. with Berger & Montague, P.C. as his cousel . Proposed order attached. No Return date indicated. (db) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      DUPLICATE ORIGINAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Safeguard, Compucom Systems in support of [46-1] motion for an Order dismissing all the claims asserted against Safeguard and Compucom in the consolidated amended class action complaint , purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP. (jp) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        DUPLICATE ORIGINAL NOTICE OF MOTION (not filed on service date) by Safeguard, Compucom Systems; for an Order dismissing all the claims asserted against Safeguard and Compucom in the consolidated amended class action complaint , purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP . Return date not indicated. (jp) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          DUPLICATE ORIGINAL RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Safeguard, Compucom Systems. (jp) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER, granting [23-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of this Court for Steven B. Feirson, Michael S. Doluisio, Stuart T. Steinberg, and Susan R. Schnell to practice pro hac vice in these proceedings on behalf of Defendants, with the consent of all parties. ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); Copies mailed. [Forwarded to the Atty Admission Clerk] (sac) (Entered: 12/27/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM in further support of the Motion to dismiss of Safeguard Scientifics, Inc., and Compucom Systems, Inc. (jco) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by John Halvey in further support of the Motion to dismiss of John K. Halvey. (jco) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by Opus360 Corporation and certain individual defendants in further support of their motion to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint. (moc) (Entered: 12/15/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by Bear Stearns & Co., J.P. Morgan, E-Offering Corp., FleetBoston in support of: [19-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) of the FRCP granting defendants' motion to dismiss all claims against them (moc) (Entered: 12/15/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by E-Offering Corp. (moc) (Entered: 12/15/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Bear Stearns & Co. . (moc) (Entered: 12/15/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by FleetBoston . (moc) (Entered: 12/15/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan . (moc) (Entered: 12/15/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman re: [25-1] cross motion for an Order, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and Federal Rule of Evidence 201 (b) striking Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants, [25-2] cross motion Denying the request of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants for judicial notice of Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants (yv) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Opus360 Corporation and Certain Individual Defendants in opposition to [25-1] cross motion for an Order, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) Federal Rule of Evidence 201 (b) striking Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants, [25-2] cross motion Denying the request of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants for judicial notice of Exhibits 11 through 32 of the of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants. (jco) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Laurence M. Rosen by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman in support of [32-1] opposition memorandum . (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman in opposition to the motion to dismiss of Defendants Safeguard Scientifics, Inc. and Compucom Systems, Inc. (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Laurence M. Rosen by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman in support of [30-1] opposition memorandum . (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman in opposition to motions to dismiss the complaint by defendants OPUS360 Corporation and certain individual defendants. (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Laurence M. Rosen by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman in support of [28-1] opposition memorandum . (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Michael Silverman in opposition to [19-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) of the FRCP granting defendants' motion to dismiss all claims against them . (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Laurence M. Rosen by Charles Bland in support of [25-1] cross motion for an Order, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and Federal Rule of Evidence 201 (b) striking Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants, [25-2] cross motion Denying the request of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants for judicial notice of Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants . (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles Bland in support of [25-1] cross motion for an Order, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and Federal Rule of Evidence 201 (b) striking Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants, [25-2] cross motion Denying the request of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants for judicial notice of Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants . (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION (filed on service date) by Charles Bland for an Order, pursuant to FRCP 12(f) and Federal Rule of Evidence 201 (b) striking Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants , Denying the request of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants for judicial notice of Exhibits 11 through 32 of the Affirmation of Andre Cizmarik, Esq. dated October 24, 2001 submitted in support of the motion to dismiss of OPUS360 Corporation and the Individual Defendants . Return date not indicated. (yv) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Francis from Andre K. Cizmarik, dated 11/20/01: Granting the Opus360 defendants request for slight extension of time--until 11/29/01--to submit their damages calculation . ( signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV ); Copies mailed. (tp) (Entered: 11/27/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Opus360 Corporation, Ari Horowitz, Richard McCann, Richard Miller, Carlos Cashman, James Cannavino, John Drew, John Halvey, Irwin Lieber, William Nuti, Barry Rubenstein, Roger Weiss, Bear Stearns & Co., J.P. Morgan, E-Offering Corp., Safeguard, Compucom Systems, FleetBoston; for an Order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of this Court for Steven B. Feirson, Michael S. Doluisio, Stuart T. Steinberg, and Susan R. Schnell to practice pro hac vice in these proceedings on behalf of Defendants, with the consent of all parties . Return date not indicated. (jco) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Koeltl from Laurence M. Rosen, dated 11/13/01. Counsel for plaintiff requests permission to submit a memorandum of law in opposition to Opus360 Corpoation's motion to dismiss that exceeds the Court's 25 page limit. Plaintiff anticipates that the final brief will be 34 pages in length. Application granted . ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ); Copies mailed. (db) (Entered: 11/20/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address of law firm Donovan Searles LLC. (kkc) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bear Stearns & Co., J.P. Morgan, E-Offering Corp. in support of [19-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) of the FRCP granting defendants' motion to dismiss all claims against them. (yv) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Bear Stearns & Co., J.P. Morgan, E-Offering Corp. for an Order pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) of the FRCP granting defendants' motion to dismiss all claims against them . Return date not indicated. Declaration of Erik S. Groothuis in support of motion attached. (yv) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge John G. Koeltl . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Simon Block, Laurence Matthew Rosen . (dle) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Robert Bean, Peter Gianoukas, Dewey Yesner, Steinberg Family, Raymond Litwin, Rachel Silverman, Michael Silverman (Answer due 10/9/01 for Opus360 Corporation, for Ari Horowitz, for Richard McCann, for Richard Miller, for Carlos Cashman, for James Cannavino, for John Drew, for Irwin Lieber, for William Nuti, for Barry Rubenstein, for Roger Weiss ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (dcap) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 11/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER,... that all cases involving Opus360 in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-03394, 1:01-cv-03482, 1:01-cv-03547, 1:01-cv-03581, 1:01-cv-03602, 1:01-cv-03947, 1:01-cv-04070, 1:01-cv-04100, 1:01-cv-05426 and 1:01-cv-05488) shall be consoldiated into case number 01 Civ. 2938. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 2938 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-02938 Document No. 16. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-03394; 1:01-cv-03482; 1:01-cv-03547; 1:01-cv-03581; 1:01-cv-03602; 1:01-cv-03947; 1:01-cv-04070; 1:01-cv-04100; 1:01-cv-05426; 1:01-cv-05488] (dcap) (Entered: 11/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 1,... The above captioned putative securities class actions (1:01-cv-02938, 1:01-cv-03394, 1:01-cv-03482, 1:01-cv-03547, 1:01-cv-03581, 1:01-cv-03602, 1:01-cv-03947, 1:01-cv-04070, 1:01-cv-04100, 1:01-cv-05426 and 1:01-cv-05488)...are hereby consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The actions hereby consolidted, and those which hereinafter may be consolidated herewith, are collectively referred to as 01-CV-2938 . A Master Docket is hereby established for the consolidated pretrial and other proceedings of the Class Actions, consolidated herein, and for all other putative class action cases which arise out of similar facts and circumnstances filed in or transferred to this Court and consolidated herewith for pretrial and all other purposes... The Clerk shall file all pleadings in the Master File ,... Defendants need not answer or move with respect to any complaint or amended complaint heretofore filed in any of the Class Actions. Within thirty (30) days of the entry of an order appointing lead plaintiff or plaintiffs, lead plainitff or plaintiffs shall file an serve a consolidated amended complaint on counsel for the defendants. Defendants shall answer or move with respect to the consolidated amended complaint within thirty (30) days after its service ,... This consolidated action is hereby assigned to Magistrate Judge Francis for settlement and any other matter as to which there is a specific reference . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) [Original filed in 1:01-cv-02938 Document No. 15. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-03394; 1:01-cv-03482; 1:01-cv-03547; 1:01-cv-03581; 1:01-cv-03602; 1:01-cv-03947; 1:01-cv-04070; 1:01-cv-04100; 1:01-cv-05426; 1:01-cv-05488] (dcap) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER,... the above-captioned actions (1:01-cv-02938, 1:01-cv-03394, 1:01-cv-03482, 1:01-cv-03547, 1:01-cv-03581, 1:01-cv-03602, 1:01-cv-03947, 1:01-cv-04070, 1:01-cv-04100) are consolidated in accordance with the Stipulation and Pre-Trial Order No. 1 and collectively referred to as "In re OPUS360 Corp. Securities Litigation," Master File No. 01-cv-2938 . Peter Gianoukas is appointed Lead Plaintff for the Class in this consolidated action pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the 1933 Act, 15 U.S.C. 77z-1(a)(3)(B) . The Rosen Law Firm P.A.P.C. and Savett, Frutkin, Podell & Ryan P.C. are appointed Co-Lead Counsel in the consolidated action pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B)(v) of the 1933 Act, 15 U.S.C. 77-1(a)(3)(B)(v) . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) [Original filed in 1:01-cv-02938 Document No. 14. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-03394; 1:01-cv-03482; 1:01-cv-03547; 1:01-cv-03581; 1:01-cv-03602; 1:01-cv-03947; 1:01-cv-04070; 1:01-cv-04100] (dcap) Modified on 10/31/2001 (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 08/10/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge John G. Koeltl . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Simon Block, Laurence Matthew Rosen . (gmo) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of [9-1] motion for an order consolidating all related actions such as 01 civ. 2938, 01 civ. 3394, 01 civ. 3482, 01 civ. 3547, 01 civ. 3581, 01 civ. 3602, 01 civ. 3947, 01 civ. 4070 and 01 civ. 4100 for all purposes pursuant to FRCP 42(a), [9-2] motion for an order appointing Movant to serve as lead plaintiff in the consolidated actions, and [9-3] motion for an order approving Movant's selection of The Rosen Law Firm P.A.P.C. as lead counsel for the litigation and subsequently filed related litigations. (kw) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Laurence M. Rosen in support Re: [9-1] motion for an order consolidating all related actions such as 01 civ. 2938, 01 civ. 3394, 01 civ. 3482, 01 civ. 3547, 01 civ. 3581, 01 civ. 3602, 01 civ. 3947, 01 civ. 4070 and 01 civ. 4100 for all purposes pursuant to FRCP 42(a), [9-2] motion for an order appointing Movant to serve as lead plaintiff in the consolidated actions, and [9-3] motion for an order approving Movant's selection of The Rosen Law Firm P.A.P.C. as lead counsel for the litigation and subsequently filed related litigations. (kw) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Peter Gianoukas, for an order consolidating all related actions such as 01 civ. 2938, 01 civ. 3394, 01 civ. 3482, 01 civ. 3547, 01 civ. 3581, 01 civ. 3602, 01 civ. 3947, 01 civ. 4070 and 01 civ. 4100 for all purposes pursuant to FRCP 42(a) ; for an order appointing Movant to serve as lead plaintiff in the consolidated actions ; for an order approving Movant's selection of The Rosen Law Firm P.A.P.C. as lead counsel for the litigation and subsequently filed related litigations . No return date. (kw) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of [6-1] motion for an order appointing Robert Bean as lead plaintiff, and [6-2] motion for an order approving Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan, P.C. as lead counsel for the class and Stull Stull & Brody as liaison counsel for the class. (kw) (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Stuart H. Savett in support Re: [6-1] motion for an order appointing Robert Bean as lead plaintiff, and [6-2] motion for an order approving Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan, P.C. as lead counsel for the class and Stull Stull & Brody as liaison counsel for the class. (kw) (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Robert Bean, for an order appointing Robert Bean as lead plaintiff ; for an order approving Savett Frutkin Podell & Ryan, P.C. as lead counsel for the class and Stull Stull & Brody as liaison counsel for the class . No return date. (kw) (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for defendants Safeguard Scientifcis, Inc., CompuCom Systems, Inc. and Jon Halvey to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action to and including 30 days after the later of: (1) the appointment by the Court of the lead plaintiff; (2) the approval of the Court of counsel to represent the putative class; and (3) the filing and service of a consolidated complaint . ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum ) (ae) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 06/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Safeguard, Compucom Systems, John Halvey by Simon Block. Received in night deposit on 5/29/01 at 5:00 p.m. (kkc) Modified on 11/06/2001 (Entered: 06/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER: reset answer due for 7/30/01 for FleetBoston, for Compucom Systems, for Safeguard, for E-Offering Corp., for J.P. Morgan, for Bear Stearns & Co., for Roger Weiss, for Barry Rubenstein, for William Nuti, for Irwin Lieber, for John Halvey, for John Drew, for James Cannavino, for Carlos Cashman, for Richard Miller, for Richard McCann, for Ari Horowitz, for Opus360 Corporation. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum ) (sac) (Entered: 05/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for jury trial by Charles Bland (sac) (Entered: 04/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 401706. (moc) (Entered: 04/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 363 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?