Coach Services, Inc. et al v. Sophisticuts Salon and Spa et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01176
District Judge Joe Billy McDade, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Joe Billy McDade
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 4:58 AM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-100, Defendant

Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L. Kramer +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 hkramer@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Anthony LeMoine +1 312 876 1700 +1 312 876 1155 clemoine@dykema.com
No Logo Mary Reinbeck, Defendant

Represented by Ali Law Practice LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tawfiq Innas Ali +1 312 546 5081 tali@alilawpractice.com

Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L. Kramer +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 hkramer@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Anthony LeMoine +1 312 876 1700 +1 312 876 1155 clemoine@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy K. Sendek +1 312 627 2138 tsendek@dykema.com
No Logo Sophisticuts Salon and Spa, Defendant

Represented by Ali Law Practice LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tawfiq Innas Ali +1 312 546 5081 tali@alilawpractice.com

Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L. Kramer +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 hkramer@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Anthony LeMoine +1 312 876 1700 +1 312 876 1155 clemoine@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy K. Sendek +1 312 627 2138 tsendek@dykema.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/18/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy K Sendek on behalf of Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa (Sendek, Timothy) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2011 at 10:30 AM in chambers in Peoria before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Agreed Proposed discovery plan is to be filed by 10/25/11. See written order. Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 9/9/11. (WW, ilcd) (Entered: 09/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa.(LeMoine, Charles) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (refiled per text order) (unopposed) by Defendants Does 1-100, Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa. Responses due by 8/22/2011 (LeMoine, Charles) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 8/3/11 TEXT ORDER. Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (unopposed motion) by Defendants Does 1-100, Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa. Responses due by 8/19/2011 (Kramer, Heather) Modified on 8/3/2011 (SW, ilcd). (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Defendants Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa. (Ali, Tawfiq) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Defendants Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa. (Ali, Tawfiq) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa. (Ali, Tawfiq) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tawfiq I Ali on behalf of Mary Reinbeck, Sophisticuts Salon and Spa (Ali, Tawfiq) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Mary Reinbeck on 05/31/11, filed by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Sophisticuts Salon & Spa on 05/31/11, filed by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED Summons Sophisticuts Salon & Spa (RP, ilcd) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED Summons for Mary Reinbeck (RP, ilcd) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Mary Reinbeck. (RP, ilcd) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Sophisticuts Salon and Spa. (RP, ilcd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/19/2011) (RP, ilcd). Modified on 5/19/2011: Redacted summons filed. (RP, ilcd). (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven Patrick McKey on behalf of Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Donald A Cole on behalf of Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Sophisticuts Salon and Spa et al ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0753-1144378.), filed by Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cole, Donald) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 48 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?