Deep Green Wireless LLC v. NEC Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01186

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 2:18 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Deep Green Wireless LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Wizenfeld +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 charles.wizenfeld@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
NEC Corporation NEC Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
NEC Corporation Of America NEC Corporation Of America, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
v.
NEC Corporation NEC Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
NEC Corporation Of America NEC Corporation Of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo Deep Green Wireless LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Wizenfeld +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 charles.wizenfeld@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo David Folsom, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Folsom +1 903 255 3251 +1 903 255 3266 dfolsom@jw.com
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?