Butler v. U.S. Dep. of Justice
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00920-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James A. Butler, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States Department Of Justice, Criminal Division"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 3/31/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County Allegany
Terminated 12/14/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Remark
Case transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [29-1] motion of plaintiff To Reopen Case; DIRECTING Clerk to re-open the action and to place on the active docket; denying as moot [12-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss; and DIRECTING Clerk to transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia. (signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 1/29/02) (c/m & microfilmed 1/31/02 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002, Terminated: 1/29/2002 Motion to Reopen Case
      MOTION by James A. Butler To Reopen Case (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Filing Fee Paid
        Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ .42 RECEIPT # 1175434 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Correspondence
          CORRESPONDENCE from Financial Officer and Financial Statement. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Filing Fee Paid
            Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 12.64 RECEIPT # 1174454 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Filing Fee Paid
              Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 28.64 RECEIPT # 1173775 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Filing Fee Paid
                Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 30.32 RECEIPT # 1173029 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Filing Fee Paid
                  Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 6.72 RECEIPT # 1172209 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER GRANTING Motion of plaintiff to Administratively Close Complaint; DIRECTING the Clerk to place the complaint on the Inactive Docket and to Administratively Close this case. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 12/13/00 ) (c/m & microfilmed 12/14/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Terminated Case
                      Case closed (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        MOTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Reopen . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Filing Fee Paid
                          Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 5.80 RECEIPT # 1171668. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER "granting" [24-1] motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time; "directing" that Plaintiff shall file his response in opposition to Defendant's dispositive motion on or before December 13, 2000; and "directing" that if Plaintiff is unable to comply with the December 13 deadline, this case shall be administratively closed subject to re-opening on motion of Plaintiff. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 11/20/00 ) (c/m 11/21/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 11/9/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 11/20/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              MOTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Extend Time . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [22-1] motion of plaintiff to Extend Time to file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 10/20/00 ) (c/m 10/20/00 chambers) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000, Terminated: 10/20/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                  MOTION by James A. Butler to Extend Time (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 Filing Fee Paid
                                    Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 13.24 RECEIPT # 1170324 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER "granting" [20-1] motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to file a response to Defendant's dispositive motion; and "directing" that Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendant's dispositive motion on or before October 27, 2000. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 9/19/00 ) (c/m 9/19/00 by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000, Terminated: 9/19/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by James A. Butler to Extend Time to file a response to defendant's dispositive motion (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Filing Fee Paid
                                          Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 7.48 RECEIPT # 1169641. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER "granting" [14-1] motion of Plaintiff to Extend Time to File a Memorandum of Law in Opposition of Defendant's Memorandum of Law to Dismiss for the Lack of Jurisdiction; and "directing" that Plaintiff shall file his Response to Defendant's dispositive motion on or before September 15, 2000. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 8/28/00 ) (c/m 8/29/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000, Terminated: 12/14/2000 Response
                                              RESPONSE by plaintiff James A. Butler to [17-1] response reply by U.S. Dep. of Justice (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by U.S. Dep. of Justice in support of [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by U.S. Dep. of Justice. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Response in Opposition
                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiff James A. Butler in opposition to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Complaint to be Moved to Proper Forum by Defendant U.S. Dep. of Justice. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000 Affidavit
                                                    DECLARATION OF INTENTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Acquire New Domicile. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/31/2000, Terminated: 8/28/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Extend Time to File a Memorandum of Law in Opposition of Defendant's Memorandum of Law to Dismiss for the Lack of Jurisdiction . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Filing Fee Paid
                                                        Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 15.51 RECEIPT # 1168482 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Rule
                                                          Rule 12/56 Letter Mailed To Parties. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Defendant U.S. Dep. of Justice to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction , and Exhibit No. 1. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying [9-1] response/Motion of plaintiff to Stay Compliance. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 6/19/00 ) (c/m: 6/20/00 chambers) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/19/2000 Response
                                                                RESPONSE by Plaintiff James A. Butler to [7-1] Order Dated 5/24/00. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000, Terminated: 6/20/2000 Response
                                                                  RESPONSE by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Court's [7-1] Order in Reference to the Provision of 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A) as Amended April 26, 1996. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/9/2000 Correspondence
                                                                    CORRESPONDENCE from the U.S. Attorney's Officer ACCEPTING service as to defendant U.S. Department of Justice, Criminal Division. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to forward to the Clerk $15.12 as an initial partial filing fee within 20 days and to make monthly payments of 20% of each preceding month's income credited to his account as continued partial payments on the remainder of the $150.00 filing fee; and granting [3-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 5/24/00 ) (c/m: 5/25/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: 5/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to inform this Court and all counsel of any change of address; DIRECTING Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and DIRECTING defendants to answer the complaint. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 5/24/00 ) (c/m: 5/25/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Response
                                                                          RESPONSE by Robert C. Young, Controller at F.C.I.-Cumberland to [4-1] Order Regarding Plaintiff's Financial Certificate, and Financial Certificate Attached. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 5/2/00 ) "directing" the Controller at FCI Cumberland to file an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of Plaintiff's incarceration, within twenty (20) days; and "directing" the Controller shall also file a certificate, as indicated and as therein set forth. (c/m 5/5/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000, Terminated: 5/24/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff James A. Butler to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 4/4/00 ) "granting" Plaintiff an additional twenty (20) days to provide this Court the $150.00 civil filing fee or, in the alternative, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis or else dismissal of his complaint may result without further notice from this Court. (c/m 4/5/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                                  PETITION for writ of habeas corpus, and Attachments; (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?