Crosslin et al v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-02702
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2020 at 1:06 PM ST (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sherry Crosslin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@corywatson.com
No Logo William Crosslin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@corywatson.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corp. , Defendant
No Logo Stryker Ireland Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Stryker Ireland Limited"
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Stryker - Order for Dismissal ADI
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
    Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (LPH) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W Frank per MDL list referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel. Please use case number 15-cv-2702 DWF/FLN. (LPH) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4455900.) Filed by William Crosslin, Sherry Crossling. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dellaccio, Douglas) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 72 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?