Chrimar Systems, Inc. v. ADTRAN, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:15-cv-00618

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 22, 2019 at 4:15 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
No Logo Chrimar Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
v.
No Logo Adtran, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder dholt@babc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 888 6855 +1 302 571 1750 kdorsney@morrisjames.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One Federal Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul M. Sykes +1 205 521 8766 psykes@babc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sthreshley, Samuel R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela Holt aholt@babc.com
No Logo Costar Video Systems, LLC , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Ralph Nester +1 202 736 8017 +1 202 736 8711 bnester@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tung Thanh Nguyen +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 tnguyen@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N Tarnay +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 ttarnay@sidley.com

Represented by Zibkoff, Mordecai

No Logo Accton Technology Corporation USA, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Vasquez +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 rvasquez@vbllaw.com
No Logo Advantech Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrence D Garnett +1 310 282 2199 +1 310 282 2200 tgarnett@loeb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald A Miller +1 310 282 2000 +1 310 282 2200 dmiller@loeb.com
No Logo Aerohive Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry Ting-Hsi Pan +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 hpan@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary A. Procaccio-Flowers +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 mprocaccioflowers@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan R. Smith +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 rsmith@wsgr.com
No Logo Allied Telesis, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Corcoran IP Law, P.L.L.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/15/2015 Peter Joseph Corcoran, III +1 903 701 2481 +1 844 362 3291 peter@corcoranip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris James LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 888 6855 +1 302 571 1750 kdorsney@morrisjames.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
No Logo Allworx Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil L. Arney +1 303 297 2400 +1 303 292 7799 neil.arney@kutakrock.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Omaha Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason S Jackson +1 402 346 6000 +1 402 346 1148 jason.jackson@kutakrock.com
No Logo Alpha Networks Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Reed Willis +1 602 351 8000 rwillis@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freelift B.v.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J. Patariu +1 858 720 5726 kpatariu@perkinscoie.com
No Logo BELDEN INC., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W Benisek +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 ebenisek@vbllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Vasquez +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 rvasquez@vbllaw.com
No Logo Belkin International, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Neil Anderson +1 404 253 6944 snanderson@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 msyungwirth@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Augustine Phillips +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 larryphillips@siebman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
No Logo Black Box Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Robert Lamb +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 wrlamb@gillamsmithlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Buffalo Americas, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orville Ricardo Cockings +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ocockings@ldlkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory S. Gewirtz +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ggewirtz@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
No Logo Comtrend Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy R. Hovan +1 650 463 4183 +1 650 463 4199 stacy.hovan@hoganlovells.com

Represented by Ste. 100

No Logo Costar Technologies, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Ralph Nester +1 202 736 8017 +1 202 736 8711 bnester@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tung Thanh Nguyen +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 tnguyen@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N Tarnay +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 ttarnay@sidley.com

Represented by Zibkoff, Mordecai

No Logo D-link Systems, Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "D-Link Systems, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF S. J. CHRISTINE YANG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria Der-Lung Hao , +1 714 641 4022 +1 714 641 2082 vhao@sjclawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dallas William Tharpe +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 dallas@yw-lawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
Dell, Inc. Dell, Inc., Consol Defendant
Unknown Role, Perot Systems Corp
Unknown Role, Quest Software, Inc.

Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan Duncan Davison +1 214 855 8000 +1 214 855 8200 dan.davison@nortonrosefulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deron R Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 ddacus@dacusfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Aaron Kerr +1 903 705 1089 +1 903 705 1117 pkerr@dacusfirm.com
No Logo Eagle Eye Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry Ting-Hsi Pan +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 hpan@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stefani Elise Shanberg +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 sshanberg@wsgr.com
No Logo Edgecore USA Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Vasquez +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 rvasquez@vbllaw.com
No Logo Edimax Computer Company, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stacy R. Hovan +1 650 463 4183 +1 650 463 4199 stacy.hovan@hoganlovells.com

Represented by Ste. 100

No Logo Engenius Technologies, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Represented by Suite 460

No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Consol Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
No Logo Garrettcom, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W Benisek +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 ebenisek@vbllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Vasquez +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 rvasquez@vbllaw.com
No Logo Hirschmann, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W Benisek +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 ebenisek@vbllaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Vasquez +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 rvasquez@vbllaw.com
No Logo Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Consol Defendant

Represented by Lee Tran and Liang APLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dallas William Tharpe +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 dallas@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., Consol Defendant

Represented by Lee Tran and Liang APLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dallas William Tharpe +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 dallas@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Juniper Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Talin Gordnia +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 tgordnia@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Kagan jkagan@irell.com
No Logo Korenix USA Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Seidl +1 612 349 8468 caseidl@rkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
No Logo Leviton Manufacturing Company, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Moxa Americas Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TechKnowledge Law Group LLP - Redwood Shores

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hsiang James H. Lin +1 650 517 5200 +1 650 226 3133 jlin@tklg-llp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Sack +1 650 517 5200 +1 650 226 3133 dsack@tklg-llp.com
No Logo Netgear, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Neil Anderson +1 404 253 6944 snanderson@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 msyungwirth@duanemorris.com

Represented by Suite 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dallas William Tharpe +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 dallas@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Phihong Usa Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmond R. Bannon +1 212 641 2315 +1 212 258 2291 bannon@fr.com
No Logo Rockwell Automation, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Neil Anderson +1 404 253 6944 snanderson@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 msyungwirth@duanemorris.com
No Logo Ruckus Wireless, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Neil Anderson +1 404 253 6944 snanderson@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 msyungwirth@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Augustine Phillips +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 larryphillips@siebman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com

Represented by Suite 1000

No Logo Smc Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by VASQUEZ BENISEK & LINDGREN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Treadwell Lindgren +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 jlindgren@vbllaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Vasquez +1 925 627 4250 +1 925 403 0900 rvasquez@vbllaw.com
No Logo StarTech.com USA L.L.P., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo TP-Link USA Corporation, Consol Defendant

Represented by Lee Tran and Liang APLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dallas William Tharpe +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 dallas@yw-lawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Transition Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindquist & Vennum, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark R Privratsky +1 612 371 3211 +1 612 371 3207 mprivratsky@lindquist.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Christopher Ryan Sullivan +1 612 371 3211 csullivan@lindquist.com
No Logo TRENDnet International Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell, Debbie L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jen-feng Lee +1 626 810 7200 +1 626 810 7300 jflee@ltpacificlaw.com
No Logo Tycon Systems Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo VP Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Watchguard Technologies, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Alan Rutherford +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 krutherford@blankrome.com

Represented by Suite 460

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (786) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Stay
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Sealed Patent Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 1/15/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 1/15/2017, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 1/15/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 1/15/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 1/15/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER denying 788 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on January 13, 2017. (jml)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 1/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 1/2/2017, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 1/1/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 1/1/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 12/31/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 12/31/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 12/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 12/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 12/3/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER DENYING 457 MOTION to Stay -Dell's and Aerohive's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Reviews filed by Dell Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/29/2016. (gsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the constructions as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/17/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Markman Hearing held on 6/9/2016. (Court Reporter Shawna Hicks) (srb) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 446 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in Case No. 6:15-cv-627 by Plaintiffs against Defendant Eagle Eye are dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/02/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 447 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed through 6-30-2016 for Defendant Allworx only. Parties are ORDERED to submit closing documents no later than 6-30-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/02/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 448 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. Additional Briefing for VP Networks in Response to 434 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cohen, Justin) Modified on 6/3/2016 (mll, ). (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Allworx Corporation, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Eagle Eye Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that Plaintiffs Chrimar Systems, Inc., et al. and Defendant Allworx Corporation submit closing documents no later than 6-30-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/31/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 5/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Yang on behalf of D-Link Systems, Incorporated (Yang, Christine) (Entered: 05/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Mediation by William Cornelius. Mediation result: SETTLED-ALLWORX CORPORATION(Cornelius, William) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Claim Construction Chart Under P.R. 4-5(d) by All Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 433 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in Case No. 6:15-cv-622 are dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/23/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to 403 Claim Construction Brief filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H -- Chrimar I Markman Transcript Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit I -- Avaya IP Deskphone Manual Excerpts)(Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 437 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for 40 days for Defendant Advantech only. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 6-29-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/23/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/20/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Advantech Corporation, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2016 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawna Hicks,Telephone number: (903) 276-1090. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2016. (tlh, ) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 286 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that Chrimar shall submit the additional briefing/evidence (not to exceed five pages of briefing) on damages and fees within 14 days from the issuance of this Order. This submission is Chrimar's final opportunity to provide a record sufficient for the entry of a default judgment in its favor against VP Networks. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/18/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Black Box Corporation, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***CORRECTED FILING. REPLACES 431 .***DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by ADTRAN, Inc., Accton Technology Corporation, Advantech Corporation, Aerohive Networks, Inc., Allworx Corporation, Belden, Inc., Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC, D-Link Systems, Incorporated, Dell Inc., Eagle Eye Networks, Inc., Edgecore USA Corporation, EnGenius Technologies, Inc., Garrettcom, Inc., Hirschmann, Inc., Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., TP-Link USA Corporation, TRENDnet International Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit Exh. D, # 5 Errata Exh. E, # 6 Exhibit Exh. F, # 7 Exhibit Exh. G, # 8 Exhibit Exh. H, # 9 Exhibit Exh. I, # 10 Exhibit Exh. J, # 11 Exhibit Exh. K, # 12 Exhibit Exh. L)(Lindgren, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/13/2016 (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED FILING 432 .***DEFENDANTS RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by ADTRAN, Inc., Accton Technology Corporation, Advantech Corporation, Aerohive Networks, Inc., Allworx Corporation, Belden, Inc., Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC, D-Link Systems, Incorporated, Dell Inc., Edgecore USA Corporation, EnGenius Technologies, Inc., Garrettcom, Inc., Hirschmann, Inc., Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., TP-Link USA Corporation, TRENDnet International Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit Exh. D, # 5 Exhibit Exh. E, # 6 Exhibit Exh. F, # 7 Exhibit Exh. G, # 8 Exhibit Exh. H, # 9 Exhibit Exh. I, # 10 Exhibit Exh. J, # 11 Exhibit Exh. K, # 12 Exhibit Exh. L)(Lindgren, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/13/2016 (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. re 424 Motion Hearing, Chrimar's Additional Briefing in Support of Its Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant VP Networks, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 427 Motion to Stay Deadlines. ORDERED that all pending deadlines are stayed for thirty (30) days from the date of this order for Defendant Eagle Eye only. It is further ORDERED that the Parties are to submit closing documents no later than June 9, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/11/2016. (gsg) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 426 Motion to Substitute Party. All claims against Accton Technology Corporation USA and SMC Networks, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Accton Technology Corporation added (as consolidated defendant 6:15cv616). Accton Technology Corporation USA (Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv616) and SMC Networks, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv616) terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/10/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Eagle Eye Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Substitute Party and to Dismiss by Accton Technology Corporation USA, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., SMC Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patel, Vishal) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Charles Wood on behalf of TRENDnet International Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv644) (Wood, Eric) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2016 re 354 MOTION for Default Judgment as to VP Networks, Inc. d/b/a ValuePoint Networks, Inc. filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. (Court Reporter, Shauna Hicks.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 407 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas N Tarnay terminated as counsel for Defendants Costar Technologies, Inc. and Costar Video Systems, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/3/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 410 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tung Thanh Nguyen terminated as counsel for Defendants Costar Technologies, Inc. and Costar Video Systems, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/3/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 408 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian R. Nester terminated as counsel for Defendants Costar Technologies, Inc. and Costar Video Systems, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/3/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 409 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Wonjoo Suh terminated as counsel for Defendants Costar Technologies, Inc. and Costar Video Systems, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/3/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Buffalo Americas, Inc. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Cockings, Orville) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Buffalo Americas, Inc. (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Gewirtz, Gregory) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER appointing David Keyzer as technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/2/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert S McArthur on behalf of Costar Video Systems, LLC (McArthur, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen C Steinberg on behalf of Costar Video Systems, LLC (Steinberg, Stephen) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Lindgren on behalf of Costar Video Systems, LLC (Lindgren, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric W Benisek on behalf of Costar Video Systems, LLC (Benisek, Eric) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Vasquez on behalf of Costar Video Systems, LLC (Vasquez, Richard) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Buffalo Americas, Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv625) (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Weber, Robert) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Tung T. Nguyen by Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC. (Tarnay, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2016: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Wonjoo Suh by Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC. (Tarnay, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2016: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian R. Nester by Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC. (Tarnay, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2016: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas N. Tarnay by Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC. (Tarnay, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2016: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc., Accton Technology Corporation USA, Advantech Corporation, Aerohive Networks, Inc., Allworx Corporation, Belden, Inc., Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC, D-Link Systems, Incorporated, Dell Inc., Eagle Eye Networks, Inc., Edgecore USA Corporation, EnGenius Technologies, Inc., Garrettcom, Inc., Hirschmann, Inc., Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., SMC Networks, Inc., TP-Link USA Corporation, TRENDnet International Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Lindgren, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 404 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in Case No. 6:15-cv-625 are dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/27/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Buffalo Americas, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 401 Motion to Extend Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed until 5-18-2016 for the Black Box defendants only. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 5-18-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/19/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Extend Stay of All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Black Box Corporation, Black Box Corporation of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jay C Chiu (Chiu, Jay) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 396 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in Case No. 6:15-cv-636 between Plaintiffs and Defendant Phihong USA Corporation are dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/13/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 397 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for an additional 14 days for Defendant Buffalo only. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 4-25-2016. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/13/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay (to Extend the Current Stay) by Buffalo Americas, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Phihong USA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 354 Motion for Default Judgment be GRANTED. The Court SETS this case for an evidentiary hearing on damages on 5-05-2016 before the Honorable John D. Love at 9:30 A.M. Chrimar shall be prepared to present admissible evidence in support of the statutory damages it requests. The Court will also take up the matter of requested attorneys' fees. Any additional briefing or evidence as to damages should be filed no later than 4-25-2016, with any response due by 5-02-2016. Chrimar is further ORDERED to immediately serve a copy of this Report and Recommendation (and any additional briefing) on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/08/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 369 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (ADTRAN's Counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 367 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Allworx's Counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 365 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (TRENDnet's counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 363 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Dell's Counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Belkin International, Inc. to Terminate Electronic Notice (Smith, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 387 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for an additional 10 days from the date of this order for Defendant Phihong only. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 4-14-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/05/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: 4/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Moxa Americas Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Lin, Hsiang James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay (to Extend the Current Stay) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Phihong USA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Allied Telesis, Inc. Requesting Termination of Electronic Notices (Dorsney, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert S McArthur on behalf of Costar Technologies, Inc. (McArthur, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen C Steinberg on behalf of Costar Technologies, Inc. (Steinberg, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Lindgren on behalf of Costar Technologies, Inc. (Lindgren, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric W Benisek on behalf of Costar Technologies, Inc. (Benisek, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard C Vasquez on behalf of Costar Technologies, Inc. (Vasquez, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 377 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in Case No. 6:15-cv-650 by Plaintiffs against Defendant Belkin International, Inc. are dismissed with prejdice, with all attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/31/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 376 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in Case No. 6:15-cv-633 between Plaintiffs and Defendant MOXA Americas, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, and with all attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/31/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 374 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in Case No. 6:15-cv-652 by Plaintiffs against Defendant Allied Telesis, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, with all attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/31/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: 3/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Belkin International, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Moxa Americas Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 371 Motion to Stay All Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs ChrimarSystems Inc. d/b/a CMS Technologies and Chrimar Holding Company, LLC and Defendant Buffalo Americas, Inc. Deadlines are stayed for 14 additional days. Parties are to submit closing documents by 4/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/29/16. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Allied Telesis, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vishal Hemant Patel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patel, Vishal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrienne Elizabeth Dominguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dominguez, Adrienne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay (Extend the Current Stay) by Buffalo Americas, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (Second) and Affirmative Defenses by D-Link Systems, Incorporated.(Hao, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ADTRAN, Inc..(Sykes, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc..(Auyang, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Allworx Corporation.(Jackson, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TRENDnet International Inc.. (Lee, Jen-Feng)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC by TRENDnet International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lee, Jen-Feng)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Advantech Corporation.(Garnett, Terrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC by Dell Inc..(Greene, Gilbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by TP-Link USA Corporation.(Auyang, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of All Deadlines for an additional seven days for Defendant Belkin only. The parties have until 3/30/2016 tosubmit closing documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/24/16. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC. (Tarnay, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by Aerohive Networks, Inc..(Smith, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Joint Motion to Extend Stay of All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yungwirth, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 356 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for 30 days from the date of this order for the Black Box Defendants only. Partiesare to submit closing documents no later than 4-18-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/21/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Black Box Corporation, Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Default Judgment as to VP Networks, Inc. d/b/a ValuePoint Networks, Inc. by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Justin S. Cohen, # 2 Exhibit 2 - ValuePoint Letter July 23, 2015, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Datasheet, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Webpage Screenshot, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Ceiling AP Webpage July 9, 2015, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Ceiling AP Webpage August 9, 2015, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Standards Guide, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Datasheet, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Chrimar Letter July 30, 2015, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Chrimar Letter September 3, 2015, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Chrimar Letter January 8, 2016, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Cotiguala on behalf of Advantech Corporation (Cotiguala, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 346 Motion for Extension of Time. All pending deadlines are stayed for an additional 14 days for Defendant Belkin only. The parties shall have up to and including 3-23-2016, to submit closing documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/08/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 302 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (TRENDnet's Counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Complaint Answer & Counterclaims 310 (Eagle Eye Network's Counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 295 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Dell's Counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 300 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (ADTRAN's Counterclaims) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 313 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Joint Motion to Extend Stay of All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yungwirth, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 343 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for 30 days from the date of this order for Defendant Phihong only. The Parties are tosubmit closing documents no later than 4-04-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/04/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 341 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for 30 days from the date of this order as to Defendant Allied Telesis Inc. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 3-31-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/03/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Phihong USA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by TRENDnet International Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv644) of Compliance re PR 4-2 (Lee, Jen-Feng)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Allied Telesis, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Tarnay, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Advantech Corporation Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Garnett, Terrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., TP-Link USA Corporation Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Auyang, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Sykes, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Black Box Corporation, Black Box Corporation of Pennsylvania Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Lamb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Allied Telesis, Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Bunt, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Accton Technology Corporation USA, Belden, Inc., Edgecore USA Corporation, Garrettcom, Inc., Hirschmann, Inc., SMC Networks, Inc. Defendants Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Vasquez, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by EnGenius Technologies, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 323 Motion to Stay Deadlines. ORDERED that all pending deadlines are stayed for an additional thirty (30) days for Defendant MOXA only. It is further ORDERED that the Parties are to submit closing documents no later than March 30, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/29/2016. (gsg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Phihong USA Corporation(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv636) of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Bannon, Edmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Allworx Corporation Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Bunt, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Compliance with Local P.R. 4-2 (Greene, Gilbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by D-Link Systems, Incorporated of Compliance with Local P.R. 4-2 (Hao, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Eagle Eye Networks, Inc. of Compliance with Local P.R. 4-2 (Shanberg, Stefani)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Aerohive Networks, Inc. of Compliance with Local P.R. 4-2 (Smith, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 322 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for 30 days from the date of this order for Defendant Buffalo only. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 3-28-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/26/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay (Extend the Current Stay) by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Moxa Americas Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Buffalo Americas, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 320 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and First Set of Common Interrogatories to 3-10-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/24/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 254 Amended Complaint and First Set of Common Interrogatories by Allied Telesis, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Black Box Corporation of Pennsylvania. (Lamb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Black Box Corporation of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent Black Box Corporation, Other Affiliate BBox Holding Company for Black Box Corporation of Pennsylvania. (Lamb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: 2/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by Black Box Corporation of Pennsylvania.(Lamb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TP-Link USA Corporation. (Auyang, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc.. (Auyang, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. by WatchGuard Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (SECOND) by Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc..(Auyang, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (SECOND) by TP-Link USA Corporation.(Auyang, Heather)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by Eagle Eye Networks, Inc..(Shanberg, Stefani)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EnGenius Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint 254 Second Amended Complaint Against Consolidated Defendants and Demand for Jury Trial by Allworx Corporation.(Jackson, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by EnGenius Technologies, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (Second) by Advantech Corporation.(Garnett, Terrence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint Belden Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Consolidated Defendants and Demand for Jury Trial by Belden, Inc., Garrettcom, Inc., Hirschmann, Inc..(Vasquez, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (Second) and Affirmative Defenses by D-Link Systems, Incorporated.(Hao, Victoria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint Accton Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Consolidated Defendants and Demand for Jury Trial by Accton Technology Corporation USA, Edgecore USA Corporation, SMC Networks, Inc..(Vasquez, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC by TRENDnet International Inc..(Lee, Jen-Feng)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by Black Box Corporation.(Lamb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. by ADTRAN, Inc..(Sykes, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by Aerohive Networks, Inc..(Smith, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. by Buffalo Americas, Inc..(Cockings, Orville)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint by Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC.(Tarnay, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Phihong USA Corporation.(Bannon, Edmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 254 Amended Complaint (second), COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC by Dell Inc..(Greene, Gilbert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc., Accton Technology Corporation USA, Advantech Corporation, Aerohive Networks, Inc., Allied Telesis, Inc., Allworx Corporation, Belden, Inc., Black Box Corporation, Buffalo Americas, Inc., Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC, D-Link Systems, Incorporated, Dell Inc., Eagle Eye Networks, Inc., Edgecore USA Corporation, EnGenius Technologies, Inc., Garrettcom, Inc., Hirschmann, Inc., Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., Phihong USA Corporation, SMC Networks, Inc., TP-Link USA Corporation, TRENDnet International Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-1 (Vasquez, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 288 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/09/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 290 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their response to Allied Telesis, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue is extended to 3-01-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/09/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: 2/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by ADTRAN, Inc., Accton Technology Corporation USA, Advantech Corporation, Aerohive Networks, Inc., Allied Telesis, Inc., Allworx Corporation, Belden, Inc., Black Box Corporation, Buffalo Americas, Inc., Costar Technologies, Inc., Costar Video Systems, LLC, D-Link Systems, Incorporated, Dell Inc., Eagle Eye Networks, Inc., Edgecore USA Corporation, EnGenius Technologies, Inc., Garrettcom, Inc., Hirschmann, Inc., Huawei Enterprise USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., Phihong USA Corporation, SMC Networks, Inc., TP-Link USA Corporation, TRENDnet International Inc., WatchGuard Technologies, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-4 (Vasquez, Richard) Modified on 2/10/2016 (sm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on Allied Telesis, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 287 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for 30 days from the date of this order for Defendant Belkin only. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 3-07-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/08/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 254 Amended Complaint and respond to First Set of Common Interrogatories by Allied Telesis, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Settlement by Belkin International, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Justin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 282 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in the above-captioned matters pertaining to Defendant Fortinet, Inc. shall be stayed for 30 days, until transfer is completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER transferring Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv651 to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 278 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines are stayed for 30 days from the date of this order for Defendant MOXA only. Parties are to submit closing documents no later than 2-29-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/16. (mll, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Fortinet, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending Transfer)(Holmes, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 280 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California, or Alternatively, to join Defendants Aerohive and Dell's Motion to Transfer Venue to the ND of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 to Hao's Declaration)(Yarbrough, Herbert) Modified on 1/29/2016 (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 280 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California, or Alternatively, to join Defendants Aerohive and Dell's Motion to Transfer Venue to the ND of California by D-Link Systems, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Wang Declaration, # 2 Hao Declaration, # 3 Hao Exhibit 1, # 4 Hao Exhibit 2, # 5 Hao Exhibit 3A, # 6 Hao Exhibit 3B, # 7 Hao Exhibit 4, # 8 Hao Exhibit 5, # 9 Hao Exhibit 6 (sealed), # 10 Hao Exhibit 7, # 11 Hao Exhibit 8, # 12 Hao Exhibit 9, # 13 Hao Exhibit 10, # 14 Hao Exhibit 11, # 15 Hao Exhibit 12, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) Modified on 1/29/2016 (mjc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 131 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,, - Belkin's Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order With Respect to the Deadline for Belkin to File a Motion to Transfer Venue by Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed DCO)(Yungwirth, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 301 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?