Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Gamero
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Western District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-02135

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2018 at 5:53 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER granting in part denying in part as to 23 Motion for Attorney Fees and costs as set forth. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 29, 2016. (lw)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Disclosure Sheet
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Final Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Order to Show Cause
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?