Chrimar Systems, Inc. et al v. Fortinet, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:15-cv-00651

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 11:26 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
No Logo Chrimar Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
v.
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
No Logo Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
No Logo Chrimar Systems, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Change Venue
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Change Venue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues, except venue. Cause No. 6:15cv618 is designated as the LEAD CASE. All parties are instructed to file any future filings except relating to venue in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew M Holmes on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. by Fortinet, Inc..(Neukom, John) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Neukom on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?