Powers v. Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10238
District Judge William Young, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 12:07 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Powers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Swartz & Swartz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P. Angueira +1 617 742 1900 +1 617 367 7193 dangueira@swartzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward M. Swartz +1 617 742 1900 +1 617 367 7193 attorney@swartzlaw.com
v.
Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lecomte, Emanuelson and Doyle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip M. Howe +1 617 328 1900 +1 617 328 2030 phowe@lecomtelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Wade Perkins +1 617 328 1900 +1 617 328 2030 mperkins@lecomtelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company. (Howe, Philip) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 52 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
      Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Robert Powers.(Angueira, David) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION to Amend the Complaint and File the Second Amended Complaint by Robert Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Angueira, David) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
          MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Motion# 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Memorandum)(Howe, Philip) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
            Opposition re 47 MOTION to Compel Further Deposition of William Chapman filed by Robert Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Angueira, David) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 47 MOTION to Compel Further Deposition of William Chapman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Howe, Philip) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 47 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION to Compel Further Deposition of William Chapman by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group.(Howe, Philip) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None
                  Opposition to Defendant's Emergency Cross Motions to Compel Records and Deposition of Dorothy Buck, PH.D. and Deposition Testimony of Plainitff, by Robert Powers. (Angueira, David) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/28/07 to Complete Discovery and for a Preliminary Injunction Restraining the Medical Information Bureau from Disclosing Robert Powers' Medical Records and Information - Reply to Defendant's Opposition (Filed by Hard Copy) filed by Robert Powers. (Angueira, David) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Philip Howe re 42 Sealed Document, 43 Sealed Document by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                        Defendant's Emergency Cross Motions to Compel Records and Deposition of Dorothy Buck, PH.D. and Deposition Testimony of Plainitff filed as a Sealed Document due to confidential information. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                          Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order.Filed as Sealed Document due to confidential information. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/28/07 to Complete Discovery and for a Preliminary Injunction Restraining the Medical Information Bureau from Disclosing Robert Powers' Medical Records and Information by Robert Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Angueira, David) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Protective Order and Proposed Order by Robert Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Angueira, David) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 39 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
                                PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Robert Powers, Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Angueira, David) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                  Opposition re 37 MOTION to Strike 36 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Robert Powers. (Angueira, David) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Strike 36 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group.(Howe, Philip) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                      Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Errata M# 14 Exhibit N)(Angueira, David) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/1/2007, Entered: None
                                        Opposition re 32 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2007 to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Howe, Philip) (Entered: 07/01/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Amend Complaint and File First Amended Complaint filed by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT re 32 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2007 to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment Rule 56(f) of David P. Angueira by Robert Powers. (Angueira, David) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                              Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2007 to File Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment by Robert Powers.(Angueira, David) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                Emergency MOTION to Strike 24 Affidavit, 30 Affidavit in Support From Public Record by Robert Powers.(Angueira, David) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (MEDICAL RECORD ATTACHMENT FILED UNDER SEAL: # 1 Exhibit)(Perkins, Matthew) Modified on 6/27/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group.(Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trialFinal Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.(Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Liz Hickman re 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Philip M. Howe re 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. ( MEDICAL RECORD ATTACHMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Errata 1)(Perkins, Matthew) Modified on 6/27/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Amend Complaint and File First Amended Complaint by Robert Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Angueira, David) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Opposition re 18 Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Bennett and Request for Extension of Joint Discovery Plan & Filing of Motions filed by Robert Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Angueira, David) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered re 18 Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Bennett. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 18 Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Bennett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          Emergency MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Bennett by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group.(Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered re 15 MOTION to Compel Records Production and Deposition of Dr. Bennett. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 15 MOTION to Compel Records Production and Deposition of Dr. Bennett. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Compel Records Production and Deposition of Dr. Bennett by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group.(Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group.(Perkins, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Robert Powers.(Angueira, David) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re 11 Joint Statement is SO ORDERED as the Case Management Scheduling Order. DISCOVERY DUE June 29, 2007 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE June 22, 2007. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Proposed Case Managment Schedule. (Angueira, David) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/29/07 before Judge Young. Court Reporter: Womack. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at womack@megatran.com or the Clerk's Office. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            STATE COURT Record. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Howe, Philip) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of David P. Anguiera, Esq. in Support re 6 Opposition re 2 MOTION to Dismiss. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Opposition re 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Powers. (Angueira, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION of the Parties to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Robert Powers. (Angueira, David) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 2 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Howe, Philip) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group. (Howe, Philip) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Insurance & Investment Group.(Howe, Philip) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Essex Superior Court, case number ESCV2006-02122. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nici, Richard) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?