Stavropoulos v. Patton
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00811

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 1:19 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Status Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Answer and Counterclaim
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint is denied. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Appendix
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Reply Brief in Support of Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Notice - (Do not use this event for a Notice of Appeal)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unpublished Decision
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Disclosure Statement
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Disclosure Statement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Appendix
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?