BLUMENTHAL v. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01056

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2019 at 1:42 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ELLIOT J. BLUMENTHAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Tania T. Taveras, PHV +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 taveras@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Ronald Judah Aranoff +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 aranoff@bernlieb.com
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Dana Statsky Smith +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 dsmith@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Kit A. Pierson +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 kpierson@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon David Corey +1 213 624 7707 +1 202 538 8100 joncorey@quinnemanuel.com
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Lauren Ashley Weeman +1 202 538 8122 +1 202 538 8100 laurenmisztal@quinnemanuel.com
on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Adam Bryan Wolfson +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 adamwolfson@quinnemanuel.com
v.
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Officer/Director, AMR Corporation
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Denis +1 202 261 3430 +1 202 261 3333 paul.denis@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard G. Parker +1 202 383 5380 +1 202 383 5414 rparker@omm.com
Space Katrina M Robson +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 krobson@omm.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Peter Denvir, III +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 jdenvir@bsfllp.com
Space Michael S. Mitchell +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 mmitchell@bsfllp.com
Southwest Airlines Company Southwest Airlines Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "SOUTHWEST AIRLINES CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alden Lewis Atkins +1 202 639 6613 +1 202 879 8813 aatkins@velaw.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Lacovara +1 212 230 4630 michael.lacovara@freshfields.com
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/13/15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2656) (ztnr) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
        FILINGS from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 schedule of Actions, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11); (documents received via e-mail 8/17/15)(td) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
          FILINGS from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Panel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Errata 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(td) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
            FILINGS Before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL No.: 2656 (td) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
              FILINGS Before The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL No.: 2656 (td) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                Filings Before The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL 2656 (Part 1 Main Document) (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(td) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None ERRATA
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                      LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S); (Exhibit L Main Document) (Part 2 of 2) (30 in 1:15-cv-01056-CKK, 9 in 1:15-cv-01084-CKK, 10 in 1:15-cv-01059-CKK, 7 in 1:15-cv-01126-CKK, 22 in 1:15-cv-01075-CKK) Notice (Other),. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R, # 7 Exhibit S, # 8 Exhibit T, # 9 Exhibit U, # 10 Exhibit V, # 11 Exhibit W, # 12 Exhibit X)(td) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                        FILINGS Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Part 1 of 2) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K)(td) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                      FILINGS Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (td) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                          FILINGS Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Schedule of Related Actions, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21)(td) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Request for Summons to Issue
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?